Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 15:29:59 (UTC).

FABULOUS HOMES OF MARIN, INC. VS. HENRY CHAN et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2009 FABULOUS HOMES OF MARIN, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HENRY CHAN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6176

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

FABULOUS HOMES OF MARIN, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CHAN, JUDY

CHAN, HENRY

DEEM SUM INTERNATIONAL INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA YANK SING

DOES 1 THRU 10, INCL.

Cross Defendants

ROES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

FABULOUS HOMES OF MARIN, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CASON, CHERYL

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

CASON, CHERYL AN IND.

MOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WARE, SAMUEL GILMORE

Attorney at KNIGHT BOLAND & RIORDAN

700 Larkspur Landing Circle, #199

Larkspur, CA 94939

BRADLEY, VERNON LESTER

DIWIK, JAMES P

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

STROJ, ROBERT J.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FABULOUS HOMES OF MARIN, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT CHAN, HENRY CHAN, JUDY DEEM SUM INTERNATIONAL INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA YANK SING DOES 1 THRU 10, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-14-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-15-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-30-2009 (Fee:365.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT TO CROSS COMPLAINANT CHAN, HENRY DEEM SUM INTERNATIONAL INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA YANK SING

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY CROSS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY SERVED JUL-22-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON CROSS DEFENDANT CASON, CHERYL AN IND.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-28-2009 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) JUDY CHAN. THE AUG-14-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT CHAN, JUDY

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MEDIATION SET FOR MAY-26-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT PER ORDER CROSS DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS ROE 1 TO BE CASON, CHERYL

ORDER

ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

ORDER

ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL, SET FOR: 6/10/10 AT 10:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 610; OPPOSITION DUE: 6/8 BY 4 P.M., REPLY IS WAIVED

Notice of Non-Payment of Jury Fees

NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF JURY FEES

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CASON, CHERYL (Fee:370.00)

MINUTES FOR JULY 9, 2010 AT 3:30 PM

MINUTES FOR JULY 9, 2010 AT 3:30 PM FOR DEPT 611

MINUTES FOR JULY 29, 2010 AT 4:00 PM

MINUTES FOR JULY 29, 2010 AT 4:00 PM FOR DEPT 611

MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-23-2010 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR

MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-23-2010 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON OCT-12-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 PER EX PARTE ORDER. (206)

MINUTES FOR AUGUST 20, 2010 AT 11:00 AM

MINUTES FOR AUGUST 20, 2010 AT 11:00 AM DEPT 611

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-04-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-12-2010 - CASE SETTLED. (K. SHAW, 611)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD 8/27/10 - CASE SETTLED, TERMS PLACED ON THE RECORD, SEE REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT FOR DETAILS. ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 212 ON JANUARY 4, 2011 AT 10:00 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. JUDGE JEFFREY ROSS, NO CLERK, REPORTER LINDA FORSTER CSR #13286. (611)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD 8/20/10 - NO SETTLEMENT REACHED - FURTHER CONFERENCE SET FOR AUGUST 27, 2010 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 611. JUDGE JEFFREY ROSS, CLERK KARISSA SHAW, NOT REPORTED. (611)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR AUGUST 20, 2010 AT 11:00 AM DEPT 611

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD 7/29/10. FURTHER CONFERENCE SET FOR AUGUST 20, 2010 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 611, COUNSEL CONFIRMED VIA E-MAIL. JUDGE JEFFREY ROSS, CLERK KARISSA SHAW, NOT REPORTED. (611)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CHAN, HENRY DEEM SUM INTERNATIONAL INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA YANK SING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-23-2010 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON OCT-12-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 PER EX PARTE ORDER. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES.

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2009
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: WARE, SAMUEL GILMORE SUBSTITUTED FOR BRADLEY, VERNON LESTER AS ATTORNEY FOR FABULOUS HOMES OF MARIN, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FABULOUS HOMES OF MARIN, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT FABULOUS HOMES OF MARIN, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT FABULOUS HOMES OF MARIN, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION CASON, CHERYL AN IND. MOES 1 TO 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT TO CROSS COMPLAINANT CHAN, HENRY DEEM SUM INTERNATIONAL INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA YANK SING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CHAN, HENRY DEEM SUM INTERNATIONAL INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA YANK SING AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT FABULOUS HOMES OF MARIN, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY ROES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CHAN, HENRY DEEM SUM INTERNATIONAL INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA YANK SING (Fee:730.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FABULOUS HOMES OF MARIN, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT CHAN, HENRY CHAN, JUDY DEEM SUM INTERNATIONAL INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA YANK SING DOES 1 THRU 10, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-14-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-15-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-30-2009 (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant