This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 11:42:51 (UTC).

EVON BELL VS. REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2013 EVON BELL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0379

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELL, EVON

Defendants

BEATTIE, JOHN

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

DOES 1 TO 30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STONICH JOHN A

STONICH, JOHN ANTHONY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. STONICH

79 Devine Street, Suite 100

San Jose, CA 95110

Defendant Attorneys

FOSTER, MICHAEL WILLIAM

Attorney at FOSTER EMPLOYMENT LAW

3000 Lakeshore Avenue

Oakland, CA 94610

KIRN, CONANT GAYLYNN

Attorney at LOMBARDI, LOPER & CONANT, LLPLAKE MERRIT PLAZA

1999 Harrison St. Ste 2600

Oakland, CA 94612-3541

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELL, EVON AS TO DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA BEATTIE, JOHN DOES 1 TO 30 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-04-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-04-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-20-2013 (Fee:450.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA (Fee:EXEMPT)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-04-2013 CONTINUED TO OCT-16-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Sanction Order

SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $400.00 AGAINST JOHN ANTHONY STONICH, ESQ. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: APR-29-2014, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE MAY-16-2014. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL

DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 56634181) FILED BY DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Notice of Entry of Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES AND DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 15103105) FILED BY DEFENDANT BEATTIE, JOHN

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES AND DOCUMENTS

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-17-2014 CONTINUED TO SEP-16-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) JOHN BEATTIE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-16-2014 CONTINUED TO NOV-18-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) JOHN BEATTIE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELL, EVON SERVED SEP-08-2014, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT BEATTIE, JOHN

Defendants Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56599075) FILED BY DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Defendants Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Responses and Docu

DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES AND DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 15096130) FILED BY DEFENDANT BEATTIE, JOHN

Defendant John Beatties Notice of Motion and Motion to Continue Trial

DEFENDANT JOHN BEATTIES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 15179083) FILED BY DEFENDANT BEATTIE, JOHN HEARING SET FOR JUL-28-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:60.00)

Declaration of Michael W. Foster In Support of Defendant John Beatties

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL W. FOSTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JOHN BEATTIES MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 15179083) FILED BY DEFENDANT BEATTIE, JOHN

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT JOHN BEATTIE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58699419) FILED BY DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 58741287) FILED BY DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58699419) FILED BY DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT JOHN BEATTIES MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 15210053) FILED BY DEFENDANT BEATTIE, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT JOHN BEATTIE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-02-2015 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON MAY-16-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • MASTER MOTION CALENDAR ON JUL-28-2015 IN 206, DEFENDANT JOHN BEATTIE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE. NO OPPOSITION FILED. THE COURT GRANTED DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL. THE TRIAL DATE OF 11/2/15 IS CONTINUED TO 5/16/16 AT 9:30AM IN DEPT. 206 PER AGREEMENT OF PARTIES. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: JOHN K. STEWART; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • FILING FEE OF STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; AND PROPOSED ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 15187078) FILED BY DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA BEATTIE, JOHN (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF MICHAEL W. FOSTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JOHN BEATTIES MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 15179083) FILED BY DEFENDANT BEATTIE, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JOHN BEATTIES MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 15179083) FILED BY DEFENDANT BEATTIE, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT JOHN BEATTIES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 15179083) FILED BY DEFENDANT BEATTIE, JOHN HEARING SET FOR JUL-28-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-25-2014 CONTINUED TO APR-29-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) JOHN BEATTIE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-25-2014 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-26-2013 CONTINUED TO FEB-25-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) JOHN BEATTIE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-26-2013 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-26-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) JOHN BEATTIE. THE OCT-16-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-04-2013 CONTINUED TO OCT-16-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BELL, EVON AS TO DEFENDANT REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA BEATTIE, JOHN DOES 1 TO 30 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-04-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-04-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-20-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less