Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/20/2019 at 19:14:31 (UTC).

EVAN MINTON VS. DIGNITY HEALTH ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/19/2017 EVAN MINTON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DIGNITY HEALTH. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN, TERI L. JACKSON and SUZANNE R. BOLANOS. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8259

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

TERI L. JACKSON

SUZANNE R. BOLANOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

MINTON, EVAN

Defendants and Respondents

DIGNITY HEALTH

DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

DAWSON, RUTH

Attorney at ACLU FOUNDATION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

1313 West Eighth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

SAUNDERS, CHRISTINE R.

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

One Front Street 35 Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

GOAD, ARMANDA C.

Attorney at ACLU FOUNDATION OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

1313 West Eighth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

GILL, ELIZABETH O

Attorney at ACLU FOUNDATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC.

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

BARNHART, LINDSEY

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 700

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LANDSBERG, BARRY S

Attorney at MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS LLP

11355 West Olympic Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60890549) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MINTON, EVAN

Plaintiff Evan Mintons Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposit

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTHS DEMURRERS TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60890549) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MINTON, EVAN

Notice of Association of Attorney

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY (TRANSACTION ID # 60831278) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MINTON, EVAN

Defendant Dignity Healths Notice Of Demurrer To Verified Complaint

NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60805706) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant Dignity Health Dba Mercy San Juan Medical Centers Demurrers

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60805706) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER HEARING SET FOR JUL-26-2017 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

Defendant Dignity Health Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Suppo

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60805706) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER

Declaration of Craig S Rutenberg

DECLARATION OF CRAIG S RUTENBERG (TRANSACTION ID # 60805706) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER

Certificate of Service

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60805706) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

CERTIFICATION NOTICE

CERTIFICATION NOTICE

CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD

CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO RESPONDENT, ESTIMATED COST $350.00

CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD

CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO APPELLANT, ESTIMATED COST $600.00 [$700.00 LESS $100.00 APPEALS FILING FEE]

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61680607) FILED BY APPELLANT MINTON, EVAN

Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal (Unlimited Civil Case)

NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 61680607) FILED BY APPELLANT MINTON, EVAN

Defendants Certification Pursuant to California Rule of Court 3.1312

CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1312 (TRANSACTION ID # 61401841) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER

Notice of Entry of Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 61380165) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant Dignity Healths Reply Brief in Support of Demurrers to First

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61344245) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER

Plaintiff Evan Mintons Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Oppos

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT(TRANSACTION ID # 61320009) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MINTON, EVAN

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • Payment : COSTS ON PREPARING APPEAL; Amount : $350; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W2818507A002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Payment : COSTS ON PREPARING APPEAL; Amount : $600; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W2818507A001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Payment : REPORTERS COSTS DEPOSITED; Amount : $160; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R0618226A002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Payment : ADMINISTER TRUST ACCT; Amount : $50; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R0618226A001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Payment : NOTICE OF APPEAL - CLERKS DEPOSIT; Amount : $100; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8718201A001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R4717A25R010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R4717A25M009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1417710R004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1417710F003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $300; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0817419F015

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY (TRANSACTION ID # 60831278) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MINTON, EVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 60805706) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER (Fee:$30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60805706) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60805706) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER HEARING SET FOR JUL-26-2017 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60805706) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF CRAIG S RUTENBERG (TRANSACTION ID # 60805706) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60805706) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60805706) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MINTON, EVAN AS TO DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DIGNITY HEALTH DBA MERCY SAN JUAN MEDICAL CENTER SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-20-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-19-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-28-2017 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Landsberg, Barry S