Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/16/2016 at 10:56:29 (UTC).

ESTATE OF CECILIA ET AL VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/11/2015 ESTATE OF CECILIA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7310

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF CECILIA

LAM, JOSEPH

LAM, SHUT FAN

Defendants

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASPER, NICHOLAS JAMES

Attorney at CASPER, MEADOWS, SCHWARTZ AND COOK

2121 N California Blvd, Ste 1020

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorney

HERRERA, DENNIS JOSE

1390 Market Street,Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESTATE OF CECILIA LAM, SHUT FAN LAM, JOSEPH AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1 TO 25 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-13-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-13-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-21-2015 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100006532), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESTATE OF CECILIA LAM, SHUT FAN LAM, JOSEPH SERVED SEP-16-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Defendant City and County of San Franciscos Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58024929) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

Defendant City and County of San Franciscos Request for Trial By Jury

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 58024929) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Defendant City and County of San Franciscos Objection to Judge Pro Tem

OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AS TRIAL JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 58024929) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58315916) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100011299) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAM, SHUT FAN LAM, JOSEPH JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-09-2017 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-13-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Stipulated Ex Parte Application for trial date continuance

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR TRIAL DATE CONTINUANCE - STIPULATED (TRANSACTION ID # 100017616) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESTATE OF CECILIA LAM, SHUT FAN LAM, JOSEPH (Fee:60.00)

Declaration of nick Casper in support of Ex Parte Application for tria

DECLARATION OF NICK CASPER IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL DATE CONTINUANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 100017616) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESTATE OF CECILIA LAM, SHUT FAN LAM, JOSEPH

Stipulation for leave to file first amended complaint

STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100017616) FILED BY ESTATE OF CECILIA LAM, SHUT FAN LAM, JOSEPH

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100017616) FILED BY ESTATE OF CECILIA LAM, SHUT FAN LAM, JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NICK CASPER IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRIAL DATE CONTINUANCE (TRANSACTION ID # 100017616) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESTATE OF CECILIA LAM, SHUT FAN LAM, JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR TRIAL DATE CONTINUANCE - STIPULATED (TRANSACTION ID # 100017616) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESTATE OF CECILIA LAM, SHUT FAN LAM, JOSEPH (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-09-2017 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-13-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100011299) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF LAM, JOSEPH (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100011299) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LAM, SHUT FAN LAM, JOSEPH JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58315916) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AS TRIAL JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 58024929) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 58024929) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58024929) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100006532), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESTATE OF CECILIA LAM, SHUT FAN LAM, JOSEPH SERVED SEP-16-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ESTATE OF CECILIA LAM, SHUT FAN LAM, JOSEPH AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1 TO 25 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-13-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-13-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-21-2015 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City and County of San Francisco is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERRERA, DENNIS JOSE