This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/06/2019 at 01:35:34 (UTC).

ESPERANZA GONZALEZ VS. THE KROGER CO ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 ESPERANZA GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER CO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9003

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ, ESPERANZA

Defendants

M704 KROGER WEST

FOOD 4 LESS

FOODS CO

THE KROGER CO

DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EISON, OWILI K.

Attorney at BANAFSHEH, DANESH & JAVID, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

9701 Wilshire Blvd. 12Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GONZALEZ, ESPERANZA AS TO DEFENDANT THE KROGER CO M704 KROGER WEST FOOD 4 LESS FOODS CO DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-05-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-04-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-13-2020

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1019904F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GONZALEZ, ESPERANZA AS TO DEFENDANT THE KROGER CO M704 KROGER WEST FOOD 4 LESS FOODS CO DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-05-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-04-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-13-2020 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******9003
Case Title:ESPERANZA GONZALEZ VS. THE KROGER CO ET AL
Court Date:MAR-15-2022 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion For An Order Compelling Responses To Form Interrogatories, Specially Prepared Interrogatories, And Request For Production Of Documents, Sets No. One; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; And Supporting Declaration Of Diana G. Meekay
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Tuesday, March 15, 2022, Line 1, DEFENDANT BAY AREA WAREHOUSE STORES DBA FOODS CO.'s Motion For An Order Compelling Responses To Form Interrogatories, Specially Prepared Interrogatories, And Request For Production Of Documents, Sets No. One.Pro Tem Judge Scott Borrowman, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling:Motion to compel GRANTED. No timely opposition filed. Verified responses to the form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and requests for production of documents are to be served within 20 days of notice of entry of this order. CCP 2030.290, 2031.300. For the 9:00 a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to sborrowman@gmail.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******9003
Case Title:ESPERANZA GONZALEZ VS. THE KROGER CO ET AL
Court Date:FEB-23-2022 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion For An Order Compelling Responses To Form Interrogatories, Specially Prepared Interrogatories, And Request For Production Of Documents, Sets No. One; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; And Supporting Declaration Of Diana G. Meekay
Rulings:Discovery Calendar for Wednesday, February 23, 2022, Line 2,DEFENDANT BAY AREA WAREHOUSE STORES DBA FOODS CO.'s Motion For An Order Compelling Responses To Form Interrogatories, Specially Prepared Interrogatories, And Request For Production Of Documents, Sets No. One:Continued to March 15, 2022 on the court's motion. =(302)


Case Number:*******9003
Case Title:ESPERANZA GONZALEZ VS. THE KROGER CO ET AL
Court Date:NOV-23-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel
Rulings:Matter on the Law & Motion Calendar for Monday, November 23, 2020, Line 2, Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel Re: Plaintiff Esperanza Gonzalez.Grant. No opposition filed.Counsel for the movant is required to prepare a proposed order on the mandatory Judicial Council form which states that the motion was not opposed and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing. =(302/EPS)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M704 KROGER WEST is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Foods Co #371 is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant