This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/12/2016 at 19:59:15 (UTC).

ERNESTO MEDINA VS. ROBERT G. DOERING

Case Summary

On 11/26/2012 ERNESTO MEDINA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ROBERT G DOERING. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6321

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDINA, ERNESTO

Defendant

DOERING, ROBERT G.

Other

CHRISTINE BAKER, DIRECTOR OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE UNINSURED EMPLOYERS BENEFITS TRUST FUND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATZ, MILTON

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MILTON KATZ

369 Pine Street, Suite 820

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorney

JAGARD, CHRISTPER `

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS

1515 Clay Street, Ste 701

Oakland, CA 94162

 

Court Documents

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-20-2014 CONTINUED TO AUG-19-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. THE MAY-20-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-19-2014 CONTINUED TO NOV-18-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-24-2015 CONTINUED TO JUL-21-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-21-2015 CONTINUED TO OCT-27-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-27-2015 CONTINUED TO JAN-26-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, (TRANSACTION ID # 58093394) SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF MEDINA, ERNESTO AS TO DEFENDANT DOERING, ROBERT G.

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, (TRANSACTION ID # 58262316) SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF MEDINA, ERNESTO AS TO DEFENDANT DOERING, ROBERT G.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-26-2016 CONTINUED TO MAR-29-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. THE JAN-26-2016 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, (TRANSACTION ID # 58426506) SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF MEDINA, ERNESTO AS TO DEFENDANT DOERING, ROBERT G.

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEDINA, ERNESTO AS TO DEFENDANT DOERING, ROBERT G. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-01-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-25-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-16-2013 (Fee:450.00)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

REQUEST FOR NOTICE FILED BY OTHER CHRISTINE BAKER, DIRECTOR OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE UNINSURED EMPLOYERS BENEFITS TRUST FUND

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-24-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE AUG-14-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-07-2014 CONTINUED TO APR-08-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-18-2014 CONTINUED TO MAR-24-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Declaration

DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57594547) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEDINA, ERNESTO

Request for Entry of Default

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $525.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 (TRANSACTION ID # 58429366) AS TO DEFENDANT DOERING, ROBERT G.

DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF MEDINA, ERNESTO RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT DOERING, ROBERT G. $310,125.00 PRINCIPAL, $525.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $310,650.00, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Case Ordered Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-29-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF MEDINA, ERNESTO (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-29-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF MEDINA, ERNESTO RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT DOERING, ROBERT G. $310,125.00 PRINCIPAL, $525.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $310,650.00, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • UNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF MAR-10-2016, REQUEST FOR DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER. MILTON KATZ, ESQ., APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF, ERNESTO MEDINA. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFAULTED DEFENDANT ROBERT G. DOERING. JUDGE: REBECCA WISEMAN, CLERK: A. MOK. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY CSR: MITCH LYON, CSR#6840. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-10-2016 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 58429366) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEDINA, ERNESTO (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $525.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 (TRANSACTION ID # 58429366) AS TO DEFENDANT DOERING, ROBERT G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 58429366) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEDINA, ERNESTO AS TO DEFENDANT DOERING, ROBERT G. HEARING SET FOR MAR-10-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, (TRANSACTION ID # 58426506) SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF MEDINA, ERNESTO AS TO DEFENDANT DOERING, ROBERT G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-26-2016 CONTINUED TO MAR-29-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. THE JAN-26-2016 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-24-2013 CONTINUED TO JAN-07-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-24-2013 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-24-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE AUG-14-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-12-2013 CONTINUED TO AUG-14-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR NOTICE FILED BY OTHER CHRISTINE BAKER, DIRECTOR OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE UNINSURED EMPLOYERS BENEFITS TRUST FUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR LIEN FILED BY OTHER CHRISTINE BAKER, DIRECTOR OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE UNINSURED EMPLOYERS BENEFITS TRUST FUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEDINA, ERNESTO JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-01-2013 CONTINUED TO JUN-12-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MEDINA, ERNESTO AS TO DEFENDANT DOERING, ROBERT G. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-01-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-25-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-16-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less