This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/07/2016 at 14:24:36 (UTC).

ERIN MESTER VS. ABTIN ROSTAMIAN

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 ERIN MESTER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ABTIN ROSTAMIAN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8713

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MESTER, ERIN

San Diego, CA 92129

Respondent

ROSTAMIAN, ABTIN

Pasadena, CA 91106

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2014
  • JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS APR-09-2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • DECLARATION RE: COURT'S CONTACT WITH ATTORNEY/MEDIATOR AND SERVICE AT "IN CARE OF" ADDRESS FILED BY RESPONDENT ROSTAMIAN, ABTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • DECLARATION RE: COURT'S CONTACT WITH ATTORNEY/MEDIATOR AND SERVICE AT "IN CARE OF" ADDRESS FILED BY PETITIONER MESTER, ERIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) AS TO RESPONDENT ROSTAMIAN, ABTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT ROSTAMIAN, ABTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT - CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE ATTACHED FILED BY PETITIONER MESTER, ERIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RESPONDENT ROSTAMIAN, ABTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER MESTER, ERIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: FEB-08-2013, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE: FEB-12-2013 FILED BY PETITIONER MESTER, ERIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT RECEIVED SUBMITTED BY: ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER MESTER, ERIN AS TO RESPONDENT ROSTAMIAN, ABTIN SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less