This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:37:31 (UTC).

ERIKA MILLER VS. A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 ERIKA MILLER filed an Other lawsuit against A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON and GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1480

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER, ERIKA

Defendants

MALONEY, JANICE

DOES 1 TO 20000000

A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. D/B/A ROVER

A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. DBA ROVER.COM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIDRICK, STEVE

Attorney at THE TIDRICK LAW FIRM

1300 Clay Street, Suite 600

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorney

LECRONE, JOHN P.

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP

865 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MILLER, ERIKA AS TO DEFENDANT A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. D/B/A ROVER MALONEY, JANICE DOES 1 TO 20000000 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-24-2019 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-22-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-02-2019

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR CIVIL PENALTIES UNDER THE LABOR CODE PRIVATE ATT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62760878) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MILLER, ERIKA AS TO DEFENDANT A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. D/B/A ROVER MALONEY, JANICE DOES 1 TO 20000000

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-24-2019 CONTINUED TO JUN-05-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-16-2019 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE JUN-05-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DEFENDANT A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. DBA ROVER.COMS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100073822) FILED BY DEFENDANT A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. DBA ROVER.COM

Notice to State Court and Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT(TRANSACTION ID # 100073533) FILED BY DEFENDANT A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. DBA ROVER.COM

Proof of Service re Notice to State Court and to Adverse Parties of Re

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 100073621) FILED BY DEFENDANT A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. DBA ROVER.COM

Case Ordered Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-16-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : X4519606F001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0918B20F022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-16-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 100073621) FILED BY DEFENDANT A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. DBA ROVER.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT(TRANSACTION ID # 100073533) FILED BY DEFENDANT A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. DBA ROVER.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100073822) FILED BY DEFENDANT A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. DBA ROVER.COM (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-16-2019 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE JUN-05-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-24-2019 CONTINUED TO JUN-05-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62760878) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MILLER, ERIKA AS TO DEFENDANT A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. D/B/A ROVER MALONEY, JANICE DOES 1 TO 20000000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MILLER, ERIKA AS TO DEFENDANT A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. D/B/A ROVER MALONEY, JANICE DOES 1 TO 20000000 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-24-2019 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-22-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-02-2019 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A PLACE FOR ROVER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LECRONE JOHN P. ESQ.