Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 22:25:18 (UTC).

ERIC GRUBER VS. YELP, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 ERIC GRUBER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against YELP, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN, TERI L. JACKSON, MARY E. WISS and ANDREW Y. S. CHENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4784

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

TERI L. JACKSON

MARY E. WISS

ANDREW Y. S. CHENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

GRUBER, ERIC INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

YELP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

DA VEGA, MATTHEW

Attorney at DA VEGA FISHER MECHTENBERG, LLP

232 E. Anapamu St

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

ZELENSKI, DAVID

Attorney at JAURIGUE LAW GROUP

300 West Glenoaks Boulevard, Suite 300

Glendale, CA 91202

ZELENSKI, ABIGAIL

Attorney at JAURIGUE LAW GROUP

300 West Glenoaks Boulevard, Suite 300

Glendale, CA 91202

JAURIGUE, MICHAEL J

Attorney at JAURIGUE LAW GROUP

300 West Glenoaks Boulevard, Suite 300

Glendale, CA 91202

JALTOROSSIAN, ZAREH A.

Attorney at DAKESSIAN LAW, LTD

445 S. Figueroa St., Ste. 2210

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorney

BRIONES, JOSHUA

Attorney at MINTZ LEVIN COHN FERRIS GLOVSKY AND POPEO P.C.

2029 Century Park East, Suite 1370

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Ryan Flannigan in Support of Motion for Summary Judgmen

DECLARATION OF RYAN FLANNIGAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60313233) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP, INC.

Declaration of Zachary Spector in Support of Motion for Summary Judgme

DECLARATION OF ZACHARY SPECTOR IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60313233) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP, INC.

Declaration of Spencer Fossen in Support of Motion for Summary Judgmen

DECLARATION OF SPENCER FOSSEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60313233) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP, INC.

Declaration of Nicholas Cunningham in Support of Motion for Summary Ju

DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS CUNNINGHAM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60313233) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP, INC.

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants Motion for Summar

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 60313233) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP, INC.

Defendant Yelp Inc. Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 60313233) (TRANSACTION ID # 60313233) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP, INC.

Defendant Yelp Inc. Documentary Evidence in Support of Its Motion for

DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 60313233) (TRANSACTION ID # 60313233) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP, INC.

Defendant Yelp Inc. Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 60313233) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP, INC.

Defendant Yelp Inc. Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment o

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 60313233) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP, INC. HEARING SET FOR MAY-26-2017 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

CERTIFICATION NOTICE

CERTIFICATION NOTICE

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT'S REQUESTED COSTS (TRANSACTION ID #62113009)

Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION TO PRESERVE ELECTRONIC EVIDENCE; AND SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (TRANSACTION ID # 61791787) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP, INC.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FOR PRODUCTION AND FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 61579748) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRUBER, ERIC INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Notice of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Productio

NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 60712705) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRUBER, ERIC INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED HEARING SET FOR JUL-13-2017 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 305

ORDER

ORDER AFTER APRIL 26, 2017, INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANS# 60526914)

Joint Case Management Conference Statement

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 60503425) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRUBER, ERIC INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRUBER, ERIC INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT YELP, INC. DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-15-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-12-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-21-2017 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 613; Judge Name: ANDREW Y. S. CHENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER MODIFYING OPINION AND DENYING REHEARING; NO CHANGE IN JUDGMENT A155063 DIV 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS Off Calendar Oct-22-2020 Continued To Feb-22-21 At 10:00 A.M. In Dept 613; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 613; Judge Name: ANDREW Y. S. CHENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCOMPLEX LITIGATION, DEPT. 613, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-26-2020 CONTINUED TO FEB-22-2021 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 613 PURSUANT TO OCT-22-2020 ORDER (613/AYSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CONTINUING OCTOBER 26, 2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 66047638)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-23-2020 CONTINUED TO OCT-26-2020 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 613, PER WRITTEN ORDER FILED ON 5.26.20. (613)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CONTINUING APRIL 23, 2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS Off Calendar May-26-2020 Continued To Oct-26-20 At 09:00 A.M. In Dept 613; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 613; Judge Name: ANDREW Y. S. CHENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS Off Calendar Jan-27-2020 Continued To Apr-23-20 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 613; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 613; Judge Name: ANDREW Y. S. CHENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STATUS REPORT (TRANSACTION ID # 65570995) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRUBER, ERIC INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT YELP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
209 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100010865) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100007775) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO DEC-19-2016; STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO FILE ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4916B16F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketFEE PAID ON: STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO FILE ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 16319036) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELP, INC. (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100024278), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRUBER, ERIC INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED OCT-19-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT YELP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRUBER, ERIC INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R7716A12F003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRUBER, ERIC INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT YELP, INC. DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-15-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-12-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-21-2017 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YELP INC. is a litigant