This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/14/2020 at 20:55:02 (UTC).

EMILY GRACE DOTEGOWSKI, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH VS. ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2010 EMILY GRACE DOTEGOWSKI, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHERINE FEINSTEIN, CYNTHIA M. LEE, TERI L. JACKSON, LORETTA GIORGI, KEVIN M. MCCARTHY, JOHN E. MUNTER, CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD, ARLENE T. BORICK, JOHN K. STEWART and CURTIS KARNOW. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6794

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

KATHERINE FEINSTEIN

CYNTHIA M. LEE

TERI L. JACKSON

LORETTA GIORGI

KEVIN M. MCCARTHY

JOHN E. MUNTER

CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD

ARLENE T. BORICK

JOHN K. STEWART

CURTIS KARNOW

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EMILY GRACE DOTEGOWSKI, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARY ANNE DOTEGOWSKI

DOTEGOWSKI, MARYANNE , INDIVIDUALLY

Defendants

MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION

ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.

DOES 1 THORUGH 500, INCLUSIVE

Other

WILLIAMS, JOHN EDDIE, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOUNDAS, JOHN T.

Attorney at WILLIAMS KHERKHER HART BOUNDAS LLP

8441 Gulf Freeway, Suite 600

Houston, TX 77017

BRAHMBHATT, SEJAL K.

Attorney at WILLIAMS KHERKHER HART BOUNDAS LLP

8441 Gulf Freeway, Suite 600

Houston, TX 77017

GRUBER, DANIEL S.

Attorney at GRUBER & GRUBER

15165 Ventura Blvd.,Ste 400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

ROSEMOND, G. ERICK

Attorney at THE ROSEMOND LAW GROUP, P.C.

8441 Gulf Freeway, Ste 200

Houston, TX 77017

SNYDER, HOWARD A

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HOWARD SYNDER

15165 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

TREVINO, MARGOT G.

Attorney at WILLIAMS KHERKHER HART BOUNDAS LLP

8441 Gulf Freeway, Suite 600

Houston, TX 77017

Defendant Attorneys

BALL, DAN H.

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LLP

One Metropolitan Square, 211 North Broadway, Suite 3600

St Louis, MO 63102

GRAY, DAVID S.

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 East Pratt St, Suite 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

GRAY, JAMES E.

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 East Pratt St, Suite 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

MACWILLIAMS, MICHAEL B.

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 East Pratt St, Suite 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

MARSHALL, STEPHEN E.

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 East Pratt Street, Ste 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

MOONEY, BRIAN J

Attorney at GORDON & REES

275 Battery St #2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

NEUMAN, FARLEY JAY

Attorney at JENKINS GOODMAN NEUMAN & HAMILTON LLP

417 Montgomery Street, 10Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94104

POIROT, THOMASINA E.

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 East Pratt St, Suite 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

ROBERTS, MICHAELA F.

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 East Pratt St, Suite 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

ROSE, JASON C.

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 East Pratt St, Suite 900

Baltimore, MD 21210

SANGIAMO, DINO S.

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 East Pratt St, Suite 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

STRAIN, PAUL F.

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 East Pratt St, Suite 900

Baltimore, CA 21202

KLATT, MICHAEL R.

Attorney at GORDON & REES

816 Congress Ave, Suite 1510

Austin, TX 78701

Other Attorney

MCMONIGLE, JOSEPH PATRICK

Attorney at LONG & LEVIT LLP

465 California Street, 5Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Tabs 17-19 to Abbott Laboratories Inc.s Table of Out-of-State Authorities in Support of Its Reply Memorandum of Points adn Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudiction, Tabs 1-24

TABS 17-19 TO ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC.S TABLE OF OUT-OF-STATE AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS ADN AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICTION, TABS 1-24 (TRANSACTION ID # 55989457) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.

Plaintiffs Separate Statement of Disputed and Undisputed Facts in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Summary Adjudication Part 2

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (DISPUTED AND UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS) IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC'S MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - PART 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 55951043) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EMILY GRACE DOTEGOWSKI, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARY ANNE DOTEGOWSKI DOTEGOWSKI, MARYANNE , INDIVIDUALLY

Exhibits 31 through 34 to Declaration of Brian J. Mooney in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Summary Adjudication

EXHIBITS 31 THROUGH 34 TO DECLARATION OF BRIAN J. MOONEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 55405194) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.

JUDGMENT ON VERDICT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ON VERDICT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. RECOVER FROM PLAINTIFF EMILY GRACE DOTEGOWSKI, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARY ANNE DOTEGOWSKI DOTEGOWSKI, MARYANNE , INDIVIDUALLY (SEE SCANNED JUDGMENT) (TRANSACTION #57802866)

Tabs 6-10 to Abbott Laboratories Inc.s Table of Out-of-State Authorities in Support of Its Reply Memorandum of Points adn Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudiction, Tabs 1-24

TABS 6-10 TO ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC.S TABLE OF OUT-OF-STATE AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS ADN AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICTION, TABS 1-24 (TRANSACTION ID # 55989457) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.

Abbotts Response to Plaintiffs Separate Statement of Disputed and Undisputed Material Facts--Part I

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (RESPONSE TO) IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION - PART I (TRANSACTION ID # 55989457) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.

Exhibits 87 Through 96 to Declaration of John T. Boundas in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Summary Adjudication (Redacted)

EXHIBITS 87 THROUGH 96 TO DECL OF JOHN T. BOUNDAS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION **REDACTED** (TRANSACTION ID # 55957275) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EMILY GRACE DOTEGOWSKI, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARY ANNE DOTEGOWSKI DOTEGOWSKI, MARYANNE , INDIVIDUALLY

Plaintiffs Table of Out of State Authorities in Support of Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Summary Adjudication, Tabs 23-26

TABLE OF OUT OF STATE AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, TABS 23-26 (TRANSACTION ID # 55951067) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EMILY GRACE DOTEGOWSKI, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARY ANNE DOTEGOWSKI DOTEGOWSKI, MARYANNE , INDIVIDUALLY

Plaintiffs Table of Out of State Authorities in Support of Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Summary Adjudication, Tabs 17-19

TABLE OF OUT OF STATE AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, TABS 17-19 (TRANSACTION ID # 55951067) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EMILY GRACE DOTEGOWSKI, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARY ANNE DOTEGOWSKI DOTEGOWSKI, MARYANNE , INDIVIDUALLY

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JOHN T. BOUNDAS TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY MAR-22-2017

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY STEPHEN E. MARSHALL TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY JUN-22-2016

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY DAN H. BALL TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY MAY-25-2016

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY THOMASINA E. POIROT TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY MAY-25-2016

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY KATHLEEN SULLIVAN HARDWAY TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY MAY-25-2016

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JAMES E. GRAY TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY MAY-25-2016

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY MICHAEL B. MACWILLIAMS TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY MAY-25-2016

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY MICHAELA F. ROBERTS TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY MAY-25-2016

COMPLAINT

PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT TRANSFERRED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED BY PLAINTIFF EMILY GRACE DOTEGOWSKI, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARY ANNE DOTEGOWSKI AS TO DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION DOES 1 THORUGH 500, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-03-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-28-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-19-2011 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:410.00)

634 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketATTORNEY JOHN T. BOUNDAS INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE PAID FOR ATTORNEY JOHN T. BOUNDAS Off Calendar Mar-27-2017 Inactivate Attorney; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JOHN T. BOUNDAS TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY MAR-22-2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY JOHN T. BOUNDAS Off Calendar Feb-09-2017 Continued To Mar-22-17 At 09:00 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DocketATTORNEY STEPHEN E. MARSHALL INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE PAID FOR ATTORNEY STEPHEN E. MARSHALL Off Calendar Jun-27-2016 Inactivate Attorney; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: JOHN K. STEWART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketATTORNEY DAN H. BALL INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketATTORNEY THOMASINA E. POIROT INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketATTORNEY KATHLEEN SULLIVAN HARDWAY INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketATTORNEY JAMES E. GRAY INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
927 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. (Fee:$960.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $960; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W2011128F020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION (Fee:$960.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • DocketFILING FEES OF $410 PAID BY DEFENDANT--ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • DocketCASE IS COMPLEX LITIGATION, FILING FEES OF $550 PAID BY PLAINTIFF IN LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREGISTER OF ACTION FILINGS FROM LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT FROM 7/28/10 THROUGH 11/16/10. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF EMILY GRACE DOTEGOWSKI, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARY ANNE DOTEGOWSKI AS TO DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION DOES 1 THORUGH 500, INCLUSIVE COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $410; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W3210C29F001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT TRANSFERRED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED BY PLAINTIFF EMILY GRACE DOTEGOWSKI, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARY ANNE DOTEGOWSKI AS TO DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION DOES 1 THORUGH 500, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-03-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-28-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-19-2011 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6794
Case Title:EMILY GRACE DOTEGOWSKI, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH VS. ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. et al
Court Date:JUL-18-2011 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Rulings:Set for hearing on Monday, July 18, 2011, line 6, DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION, MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. GRANTED, NO OPPOSITION FILED. =(302/LMG)


Case Number:*******6794
Case Title:EMILY GRACE DOTEGOWSKI, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH VS. ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC. et al
Court Date:SEP-19-2011 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion To Compel Further Responses To Written Discovery
Rulings:Set for hearing on Monday, September 19, 2011, line 1, DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION, Motion To Compel Further Responses To Written Discovery. OFF CALENDAR PER MOVING PARTY. =(302/CWW)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Abbott Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where McKesson Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. McMonigle