Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 20:19:11 (UTC).

ELWOOD EBBINGHAUSEN VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2007 ELWOOD EBBINGHAUSEN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4109

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

THE WILLIAM POWELL CO.

DIAMOND INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

THE WM. POWEL COMPANY

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORP.

AGCO CORPORATION

LUPPEN & HAWLEY, INC.

BONDEX INTERNATIONAL, INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.

SPECIAL MATERIALS, INC.- WISCONSIN

RPM, INC.

RILEY POWER INC.

D/C DISTRIBUTION LLC, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO D/C DISTRIBUTION CORPORATION

TYCO INTERNATIONAL (US) INC.

GRINNELL LLC (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS GRINNELL CORPORATION)

ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, FORMERLY KNOWN AS ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.

HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC., FKA KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION AND KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

69 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BUTY, MADELINE L

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

Other Attorneys

MA, LILLIAN C

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

One Market Street, Steuart Tower, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94105

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

POLLACK, DEAN

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119 (Zip Code 94604), 1901 Harrison St, 11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94612

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

KRAUSE, NANDOR BURTON

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St. - Ste. 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

SHARP, GARY D

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive, Ste 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

REYNOLDS, RICHARD LEROY

Attorney at BENNETT, SAMUELSEN, REYNOLDS & ALLARD

1301 Marina Village Parkway, Suite 300

Alameda, CA 94501-1084

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

35 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATIONS OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COUR

DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATIONS OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 14727512) FILED BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION ON BEHALF OF ITS FORMER CHICAGO AND PEERLESS PUMP BUSINESSES, INCORRECTLY NAMED AS FMC CORPORATION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT DC DISTRIBUTION LLC TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14802863) FILED BY DEFENDANT D/C DISTRIBUTION LLC, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO D/C DISTRIBUTION CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14820391) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

EBBINGHAUSEN DWOP as to DW Nicholson Corp

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT , WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 18613000) AS TO DEFENDANT D.W. NICHOLSON CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF JUSTIN S. FISH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF FMC CORPORATION?S PERSON(S) MOST QUALIFIED AND CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OR OTHER QUALIFIED PERSONS

DECLARATION OF JUSTIN S. FISH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF FMC CORPORATIONS PERSON(S) MOST QUALIFIED AND CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OR OTHER QUALIFIED PERSONS (TRANSACTION ID # 19925837) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EBBINGHAUSEN, ELWOOD

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED ISSUES RE: PRODUCTION OF FMC CORPORATION?S CUSTODIAN(S) OF RECORDS AND PERSON(S) MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF FMC CORPORATION'S PERSON(S) MOST QUALIFIED AND CUSTODIAN(S) OF RECORDS OR OTHER QUALIFIED PERSONS(TRANSACTION ID # 19925837) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EBBINGHAUSEN, ELWOOD

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION - PEERLESS PUMPS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL; SEPARATE STATEMENT, PART A TO D IN SUPPORT & DECL IN SUPPORT THEREOF (TRANSACTION ID # 20139767) FILED BY DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION ON BEHALF OF ITS FORMER CHICAGO AND PEERLESS PUMP BUSINESSES, INCORRECTLY NAMED AS FMC CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal (re: Special Electric Company)

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21869456) AS TO DEFENDANT SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.

DEFENDANT DIAMOND INTERNATIONAL CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF AND INDEX TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE

DEFENDANT DIAMOND INTERNATIONAL CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF AND INDEX TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 24913801) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIAMOND INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

General Electric Companys Answer to Complaint for Damages (Asbestos)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14964306) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal As to Defendant Maytag Corporation

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16085816) AS TO DEFENDANT MAYTAG CORPORATION

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 17320728) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

DEFENDNAT NIBCO INC.S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS OFFER TO COMPROMISE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 998

OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S OFFER TO COMPROMISE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 998 (TRANSACTION ID # 18456593) FILED BY DEFENDANT NIBCO INC.

Request for Dismissal (as to Luppen & Hawley, Inc.)

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22535293) AS TO DEFENDANT LUPPEN & HAWLEY, INC.

Request for Dismissal as to Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT FILED, WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 22961302) AS TO DEFENDANT VIKING PUMP, INC.

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 24944359) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EBBINGHAUSEN, ELWOOD

Request for Dismissal of Complaint with prejudice as to Garlock Sealing Technologies and Coltec Industries Inc. only

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28175433) AS TO DEFENDANT GARLOCK SAEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC COLTEC INDUSTRIES INC.

Request for Dismissal (Re: Emerson Electric Co., only)

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31665830) AS TO DEFENDANT EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.

378 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2016
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-03-2016 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-02-2017 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. GEOFF SLONIKER, ESQ. APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: GARRETT WONG; CLERK: JIROQUE; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF JUN-18-2015 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON MAR-03-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION, CASE RESOLVED PER PLAINTIFF. ANDREW CHEW APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. NO APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT RPI (PLANT INSULATION CO.). JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (877)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-11-2014 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-18-2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 503. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: TARA WILLIAMS, CSR#13428 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON AUG-28-2014 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-11-2014 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: E. BURA; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR# 5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (877)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-19-2014 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON AUG-28-2014 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, ORIN NOAH. COUNSEL JENNIFER BERKE APPEARING FOR DEFENDANT RPI AND COUNSEL EVANTHIA SPANOS FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL FOR BERRY & BERRY. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: E. BURA; COURT REPORTER: LETICIA A. RALLS, CSR# 10070 FROM AIKEN WELCH (877) 451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-19-2014 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: CINDY GARIS, CSR#9402 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO SEP-02-2015 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF EBBINGHAUSEN, ELWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO REPORT TO THE COURT HOW MUCH TIME TOLLED AND DATES IN WHICH THE 5-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATION HAS BEEN EXTENDED. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
413 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 14626977) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14626977) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 14626977) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14626977) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14569595) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14554358) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14548243) FILED BY DEFENDANT CARRIER CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF EBBINGHAUSEN, ELWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF EBBINGHAUSEN, ELWOOD AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WM. POWEL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SPECIAL MATERIALS, INC.- WISCONSIN is a litigant

Latest cases where SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RPM, INC. is a litigant