Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:50:29 (UTC).

ELIZABETH MARTINEZ VS. HORIZON COACH LINES PAYMASTER LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 ELIZABETH MARTINEZ filed an Other lawsuit against HORIZON COACH LINES PAYMASTER LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8485

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ, ELIZABETH OBO HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

HORIZON COACH LINES PAYMASTER LLC DBA HORIZON COACH LINES

TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., (INCORRECTLY IDENTIFIED IN THE COMPLAINT AS TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. D/B/A HORIZON COACH LINES)

CUSA FL, LLC D/B/A HORIZON COACH LINES

DOES 1-100

DOES 1 TO 20

TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. D/B/A HORIZON COACH LINES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIDRICK, STEVE

Attorney at THE TIDRICK LAW FIRM

2039 Shattuck Ave., Suite 308

Berkeley, CA 94704

Defendant Attorney

WIMMER, DAVID A.

Attorney at SHERDLOW FLORENCE SANCHEZ SWERDLOW & WIMMER

9401 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 828

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, ELIZABETH OBO HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT HORIZON COACH LINES PAYMASTER LLC DBA HORIZON COACH LINES TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. D/B/A HORIZON COACH LINES CUSA FL, LLC D/B/A HORIZON COACH LINES DOES 1-100

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, ELIZABETH OBO HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT HORIZON COACH LINES PAYMASTER LLC DBA HORIZON COACH LINES DOES 1 TO 20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, ELIZABETH OBO HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., (INCORRECTLY IDENTIFIED IN THE COMPLAINT AS TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. D/B/A HORIZON COACH LINES) (Fee:450.00)

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, ELIZABETH OBO HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED APR-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT HORIZON COACH LINES PAYMASTER LLC DBA HORIZON COACH LINES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, ELIZABETH OBO HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED APR-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. D/B/A HORIZON COACH LINES

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY DEFENDANT TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., (INCORRECTLY IDENTIFIED IN THE COMPLAINT AS TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. D/B/A HORIZON COACH LINES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., (INCORRECTLY IDENTIFIED IN THE COMPLAINT AS TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. D/B/A HORIZON COACH LINES) (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, ELIZABETH OBO HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED APR-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. D/B/A HORIZON COACH LINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, ELIZABETH OBO HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED APR-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CUSA FL, LLC D/B/A HORIZON COACH LINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, ELIZABETH OBO HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED APR-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT HORIZON COACH LINES PAYMASTER LLC DBA HORIZON COACH LINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, ELIZABETH OBO HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, ELIZABETH OBO HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT HORIZON COACH LINES PAYMASTER LLC DBA HORIZON COACH LINES TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. D/B/A HORIZON COACH LINES CUSA FL, LLC D/B/A HORIZON COACH LINES DOES 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINEZ, ELIZABETH OBO HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT HORIZON COACH LINES PAYMASTER LLC DBA HORIZON COACH LINES DOES 1 TO 20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less