This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 17:41:33 (UTC).

ELIZABETH KARNAZES VS. JOHN J. HARTFORD et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2012 ELIZABETH KARNAZES filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against JOHN J HARTFORD. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1174

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

KARNAZES, ELIZABETH

Foster City, CA 94404

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 100

HARTFORD, JOHN J

LEE, ALBERT W

HARTFORD, JOHN J.

LEE, ALBERT W.

San Francisco, CA 94133

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

KARNAZES, ELIZABETH M

P.O. Box 4747

Foster City, CA 94404

KARNAZES ELIZABETH M

Defendant Attorney

LEE, ALBERT W

1640 Stockton Street #330222

San Francisco, CA 94133

 

Court Documents

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-24-2015 CONTINUED TO JUN-16-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). ** NOTICE OF IMPENDING MANDATORY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 583.210 AND 583.250. ** THE FEB-24-2015 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-17-2014 CONTINUED TO OCT-21-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE JUN-17-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS O

SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15295001) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARTFORD, JOHN J. LEE, ALBERT W.

LODGEMENT OF EXHIBITS IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A VE

LODGEMENT OF EXHIBITS IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINST ATTORNEYS CONTAINING ALLEGATIONS OF DAMAGES ARISING FROM CONSPIRACY (TRANSACTION ID # 15291005) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARTFORD, JOHN J. LEE, ALBERT W.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-18-2014 CONTINUED TO JUN-17-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE MAR-18-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Motion and Motion To Quash service of summons on First Amen

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15154031) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARTFORD, JOHN J. LEE, ALBERT W. HEARING SET FOR AUG-07-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:900.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 14.0 DAYS

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CORRECT COURT RECORD, TO PROPERLY FILE PETITION, AND SET HEARING DATE, DECLARATIONS OF ELIZABETH KARNAZES AND TREVOR JOHNSON IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH (Fee:IFP)

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-12-2013 CONTINUED TO JUN-18-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE MAR-12-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUL-13-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF APPEAL. THE MAR-15-2016 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH M ON FEB-08-2016 THROUGH JUN-15-2016 FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CLERK'S/REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT FILED BY APPELLANT KARNAZES, ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT KARNAZES, ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM COA GRANTING APPELLANT'S REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES ONLY AS TO $775. FILING FEE AND ANY ELECTRONIC FILING FEE A146950 DIV 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT KARNAZES, ELIZABETH (Fee:IFP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE, ALL NAMED PARTIES SERVED, AND REQUEST TO COMPEL CORRECT FILING OF DOCUMENTS BU THE CLERK OF THE COURT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH M ON NOV-19-2015 THROUGH FEB-09-2016 FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 14.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-11-2012 CONTINUED TO MAR-12-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE DEC-11-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH M ON DEC-17-2012 THROUGH JAN-21-2013 FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH M ON DEC-17-2012 THROUGH JAN-21-2013 FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 14.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-11-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE OCT-31-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KARNAZES, ELIZABETH AS TO DEFENDANT HARTFORD, JOHN J. LEE, ALBERT W. DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-31-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-30-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-16-2012 (Fee:IFP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

(650) 345-9200 CLERK

BY: Plaintiff in pro per

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

ELIZABETH KARNAZES Case No. CGC-12-521174 Plaintiff, RESPONSE TO JOHN J. HARTFORD’S ) AND ALBERT W. LEE’S MOTION TO Vs ; QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND

JOHN J. HARTFORD, ALBERT W. LEE, | DOES 1-100. g FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) ) Date: August 7, 2015 Defendants. ) Time: 9:30 a.m. Dept. 302

signature by facsimile

TO ALL PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD HEREIN:

PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Plaintiff ELIZABETH KARNAZES (hereinafter referred to as “Plaintiff” or “KARNAZES”) responds to Defendant attorneys JOHN J. HARTFORD’S and ALBER W. LEE’S (hereinafter referred to as “HARTFORD,” “LEE,” and collectively as “defendants”) Motio To Quash Service Of Summons On First Amended Complaint And First Amended Complaint

(hereinafter referred to as “Motion to Quash”) as follows:

DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH KARNAZES

I, ELIZABETH KARNAZES, declare as follows: 1. T am the Plaintiff herein, and I am currently representing myself in this matter. 2. I caused to be filed a verified amended petition, declaration in support thereof, proposed verified

amended complaint, and summons thereon on May 27, 2015.

Resp. OSC Karnazesv. Hartford 1 Case. No. CGC-12-521174

Resp. OSC Karnazesv. Hartford 1 Case. No. CGC-12-521174 (g) This section shall not apply to disclosures and discovery requests, responses, objections, and motions.

(g) This section shall not apply to disclosures and discovery requests, responses, objections, and motions.

(h) A motion for sanctions brought by a party or a party's attorney primarily for an improper purpose, such as to harass or to cause unnecessary delay or needless increase in the cost of litigation, shall itself be subject to a motion for sanctions. It is the intent of the Legislature that courts shall vigorously use its sanctions authority to deter that improper conduct or comparable conduct by others similarly situated.

(i) This section shall apply to a complaint or petition filed on or after January 1, 1995, and any other pleading, written notice of motion, or other similar paper filed in that matter. Cal Code Civ. Proc. § 128.7 (2006).

9. I am experiencing serious physical problems caused by an accident that necessitated emergency

surgery, which led to a serious adverse reaction to the anesthesia, causing me further problems. I am under physician’s orders to be off work completely at least through August 19, 2015, and 1

expect my recovery may take longer due to complications.

. I will provide a true and correct copy of my physician’s order upon request by the court, for

reasons of privacy.

. I am taking prescribed strong pain killers that effect my ability to work think clearly.

. My right arm is my dominant arm, and I cannot use it and must keep it elevated above my head

to eleviate pain.

. I am typing this with fingers on my left hand and with great difficulty. . I am legally indigent, a senior citizen, and I have no secretarial support.

. The hearing on the amended petition is set for August 31, 2015, and this Motion to Quash is a

sham pleading filed to harass me and needlessly increase the cost of this litigation.

The clerk of the court is still having trouble understanding the correct filing procedures for this case.

Despite multiple letters and numerous requests for assistance from the court, the original documents in this case have not been correctly filed.

The Petition was presented for filing and was supposed to be filed as the first paper in this case, hearing set, and after the hearing, the Complaint that was submitted with the Petition would then be filed.

. The clerk of the court apparently improperly filed the Complaint and not the Petition as the first

document in this case.

. T have contacted the court multiple times, but the problem has not been fixed.

. The Petition in this case needs to be filed effective May 28, 2012, when it was submitted for

filing, and a date needs to be set for hearing thereon before the Complaint can be properly filed

Resp. Mot. Quash Karnazes v. Hartford 5 Case. No. CGC-12-521174

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******1174
Case Title:ELIZABETH KARNAZES VS. JOHN J. HARTFORD et al
Court Date:NOV-19-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Verified Petition For Order Granting Leave To File A Verified Amended Complaint Against Attorneys Containing Allegations Of Damages Arising From Civil Conspiracy
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Thursday, November 19, 2015, Line 3. PLAINTIFF ELIZABETH KARNAZES' Verified Petition For Order Granting Leave To File A Verified Amended Complaint Against Attorneys Containing Allegations Of Damages Arising From Civil Conspiracy.Petition for order granting leave to file a verified amended complaint is denied without prejudice. The court denies Plaintiff's petition to file a verified amended complaint, without prejudice, because there is not a reasonable probability that Plaintiff will prevail on the first through tenth causes of action. (See Hung v. Wang (1992) 8 Cal.App.4th 908.) The first through tenth causes of action are barred by collateral estoppel because they are all premised on the allegation that Defendants and Plaintiff reached a settlement agreement and that Defendants subsequently breached the agreement. (First Amended Complaint page 4-23.) The issues of whether Plaintiff and Defendants formed a settlement agreement and whether Defendants breached the agreement were already litigated in the San Mateo Superior Court and were determined against Plaintiff. (Lodgment of Exhibits in Opposition to Petition for Leave to File a Verified Amended Complaint Against Attorneys Containing Allegations of Damages Arising from Conspiracy: Exhibits 14, 17, 18.) Although the eleventh through fourteenth causes of action are based partly on the alleged settlement agreement, those causes of action also raise claims that Defendants filed improper liens against Plaintiff's home. The San Mateo action did not resolve the issue of whether Defendants filed improper liens against Plaintiff's home. Thus, the court denies Plaintiff's petition for order granting leave to file a verified amended complaint, without prejudice. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/EHG)


Case Number:*******1174
Case Title:ELIZABETH KARNAZES VS. JOHN J. HARTFORD et al
Court Date:OCT-30-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Quash Service Of Summons On First Amended Complaint And First Amended Complaint
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Friday, October 30, 2015, Line 5. DEFENDANT'S JOHN HARTFORD, ALBERT LEE'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Quash Service Of Summons On First Amended Complaint And First Amended Complaint.Continued to November 19, 2015 per ex parte order. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. =(302/HEK)


Case Number:*******1174
Case Title:ELIZABETH KARNAZES VS. JOHN J. HARTFORD et al
Court Date:AUG-07-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Quash Service Of Summons On First Amended Complaint And First Amended Complaint
Rulings:Set for hearing on Friday, August 7, 2015, Line 3, DEFENDANT JOHN HARTFORD, ALBERT LEE'S Motion To Quash Service Of Summons On First Amended Complaint And First Amended Complaint is continued to August 31, 2015, on the Courts own motion. =(302/EG)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Albert W. Lee