This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/12/2023 at 14:11:07 (UTC).

EHIOLE AKHIROME VS. HAMILTON YU ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 EHIOLE AKHIROME filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HAMILTON YU. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO and SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0039

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AKHIROME, EHIOLE AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

BEACON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION A BUSINESS ENTITY

DOES 1-20

THE HLW GROUP INC, A BUSINESS ENTITY

YU, HAMILTON AN INDIVIDUAL

BEACON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

THE HLW GROUP, INC.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

BEACON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Cross Defendants and Defendants

THE HLW GROUP INC, A BUSINESS ENTITY

YU, HAMILTON AN INDIVIDUAL

MOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOCKEY, DANIEL

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

MARTINO, REBECCA D.

MINIOZA, JOSEPH J.

D'ARGENIO, MARK J

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MINIOZA, JOSEPH J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR SEP-09-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

DEFENDANT HAMILTON YUS OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL

DEFENDANT HAMILTON YU'S OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 210035688) FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, HAMILTON AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR MAY-10-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAR-25-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY-10-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement (Statements)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210034294) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AKHIROME, EHIOLE AN INDIVIDUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 69829830) (TRANSACTION ID # 69829830) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE HLW GROUP, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement (Statements)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210033981) FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, HAMILTON AN INDIVIDUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Answer (Original) (Answers)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210032558) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT YU, HAMILTON AN INDIVIDUAL

Summons (Summons)

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210029337) TO CROSS COMPLAINANT BEACON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-08-2023 CONTINUED TO MAY-10-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF CROSS COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Cross-Complaint of Beacon Residential Community Association Against Ha

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210029337) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BEACON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT YU, HAMILTON AN INDIVIDUAL THE HLW GROUP INC, A BUSINESS ENTITY MOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE

Case Management Statement (Statements)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210028827) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AKHIROME, EHIOLE AN INDIVIDUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 69150578) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE HLW GROUP, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement (Statements)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210028405) FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, HAMILTON AN INDIVIDUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Order Setting Case Management Conference from Order to Show Cause

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAR-08-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE FEB-07-2023 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Our Ans to Comp 1.4.23

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68799588) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE HLW GROUP, INC.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-07-2023 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) THE HLW GROUP INC, A BUSINESS ENTITY. THE DEC-21-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION (Notices)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 210022132) FILED BY ATTORNEY MINIOZA, JOSEPH J.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100182850) FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, HAMILTON AN INDIVIDUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2024
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2024
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY Off Calendar May-10-2023 Set For Trial On Sep-09-24 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR SEP-09-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR MAY-10-2023 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketOBJECTION HEARING HELD ON MAY-10-2023. JUDGE ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO; CLERK J.LEE NOT REPORTED (610)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): OBJECTION HEARING CALENDAR Off Calendar May-10-2023 Off Calendar MINI MINUTES: Appearances by Rena Fera, Esq. for Defendant Beacon Residential. Appearances by Rebecca D. Martino, Esq. for Defendant Hamilton Yu. Appearances by Nancy A. McPherson, Esq. for Defendant The HLW Group. Jury trial set to Sep-09-2024 at 9:30 am in Dept. 206. JUDGE: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO; Clerk: JLee; Proceedings not reported. (610); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Apr-27-2023 Set For Trial On Mar-25-24 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT HAMILTON YU'S OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 210035688) FILED BY DEFENDANT YU, HAMILTON AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR MAY-10-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAR-25-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY-10-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210034294) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AKHIROME, EHIOLE AN INDIVIDUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): HEARING ORDERED FOR APPLICATION OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES Off Calendar Jul-06-2022 Denied; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMASTER CALENDAR MOTION ON JUN-22-2022 IN DEPT. 206, HEARING ON APPLICANT/PLAINTIFF EHIOLE AKHIROME'S WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS CONTINUED FROM JUN-22-2022 TO JUL-06-2022, 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED APPLICATION DUE BY 07/01/22 WITH A COPY TO BE SENT TO DEPARTMENT 206 VIA THE EMAIL ADDRESS PROVIDED AT THE HEARING. APPEARANCES VIA ZOOM BY APPLICANT WITH COUNSEL, DANIEL YOCKEY, ESQ. JUDGE: GARRETT L. WONG; MATTER NOT REPORTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): HEARING ORDERED FOR APPLICATION OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES Off Calendar Jun-22-2022 Continued To Jul-06-22 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING ORDERED FOR APPLICATION OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AKHIROME, EHIOLE AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR JUN-22-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210008720) TO PLAINTIFF AKHIROME, EHIOLE AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Payment Type: IFP; Receipt Number: R4122607F004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210008720) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AKHIROME, EHIOLE AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketREQUEST PENDING TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (SEALED DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AKHIROME, EHIOLE AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketQUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210008720) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AKHIROME, EHIOLE AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT YU, HAMILTON AN INDIVIDUAL THE HLW GROUP INC, A BUSINESS ENTITY BEACON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION A BUSINESS ENTITY DOES 1-20 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-09-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-17-2022; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less