This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 20:52:46 (UTC).

EDWIN SPURLING VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2007 EDWIN SPURLING filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4192

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

INSUL ACOUSTICS, INC.

PLANT INSULATION CO.

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

FRONTIER BUILDING SUPPLY COMPANY

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,C,H,I

FRONTIER BUILDING SUPPLY, INC.

AMCORD INC

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

THE BOEING COMPANY

ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BENDIX CORPORATION, SUED HEREIN AS HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

DOWMAN PRODUCTS INC

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

DOES 1-8500

CANOGA BUILDERS SUPPLIES

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

MILLER, PAUL DBA SATICOY AUTO PARTS

CALPORTLAND COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY)

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

VALLETTE, KENT LEEDS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KENT VALLETTE

1125 South Las Brisas Place

Placentia, CA 92870

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Ste.1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

ADAMS, BARBARA ROSE

Attorney at ADAMS NYE TRAPANI BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108-4521

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

MCINTIRE, RONALD A.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

1620 26Th Street, South Tower, Sixth Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90404

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

Attorney at STEVENS DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

1910 Olympic Blvd #250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

BUTY, MADELINE L

Attorney at BUTY & CURLIANO LLP

555 12Th Street, Suite 1280

Oakland, CA 94607

CALERO, ANTHONY J.

Attorney at LOMBARDI, LOPER & CONANT, LLP

1999 Harrison St. Ste. 1950

Oakland, CA 94612-3541

BERKES, ROBERT H

Attorney at BERKES CRANE ROBINSON & SEAL

515 S Figueroa St Ste 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

ROSS, BRADLEY D.

SCALI, CHRISTIAN J

Attorney at MANNING, LEAVER, BRUDER & BERBERICH

5750 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 655

Los Angeles, CA 90036-3637

GAMBINO, MARY ELLEN

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94105

BRYDON, JOHN R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

AUBERT, GARTH W.

Attorney at MENDES & MOUNT LLP

445 South Figueroa St. 38Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

THE BOEING COMPANYS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15357697) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Insul Acoustics, Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos; Demand for Jury Trial

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16420424) FILED BY DEFENDANT INSUL ACOUSTICS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice AS TO COMPLT As to Defendant PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION Only

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16798072) AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

Notice Of Change Of Firm Name

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 17523084) FILED BY ATTORNEY ADAMS BARBARA R

DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANG, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19576346) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

DEFENDANT CALPORTLAND COMPANYS SEPARATE OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(TRANSACTION ID # 26862851) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY

PLAINTIFF?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CALPORTLAND COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY)?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 27938970) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPURLING, EDWIN

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Hamilton Materials, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 30632957) AS TO DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC.

Request for Dismissal, With prejudice, as to defendant Mullin Development Co. (fka Mullin Lumber Co.) only. Each party to bear its own costs.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31040047) AS TO DEFENDANT MULLIN DEVELOPMENT CO.(FKA MULLIN LUMBER CO)

Defendant General Motors Corporations Answer to Complaint for Damages

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15324037) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Curtiss-Wright Corporations Answer to Plaintiff Edwin Spurli

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15387298) FILED BY DEFENDANT CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Livingston Pontiac GMC, Inc.s Answer To Complaint for Damages

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16554600) FILED BY DEFENDANT LIVINGSTON PONTIAC GMC, INC. (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16585528) FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

DECLARATION OF HELEN A. CHANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CANOGA BUILDERS SUPPLIES? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF HELEN A. CHANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CANOGA BUILDERS SUPPLIES' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 27788812) FILED BY DEFENDANT CANOGA BUILDERS SUPPLIES

DEFENDANT CALPORTLAND COMPANYS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO RE-OPEN PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO RE-OPEN PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 28663736) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALPORTLAND COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY)

DEFENDANT CALPORTLAND COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING CANCER, FEAR OF CANCER OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A 402 HEARING REGARDING SAME; DECLARATION OF VIIU SPANGLER KHARE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DEFENDANT CALPORTLAND COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY OR ARGUMENT CONCERNING CANCER, FEAR OF CANCER OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A 402 HEARING REGARDING SAME; DECLARATION OF VIIU SPANGLER KHARE IN SUPPORT THEREOF (TRANSACTION ID # 29498709) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALPORTLAND COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL w/o prej as to complt as to deft calportland company, fka california portland cement company

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 30809384) AS TO DEFENDANT CALPORTLAND COMPANY (FKA CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL w/o prej OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33896165)

162 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2010
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-28-2010. DISMISSAL FILED 10/19/10. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33896165)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 RE 25074 FOR TRANSACTION R0910115J020 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON, DOC #1903110630, WARRANT #38200087, DATED SEP-03-2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-29-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-28-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 31293841) FILED BY DEFENDANT MULLIN DEVELOPMENT CO.(FKA MULLIN LUMBER CO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31170055) AS TO DEFENDANT AMCORD, INC., DBA RIVERSIDE CEMENT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31170055) AS TO DEFENDANT HANSON AGGREGATES WEST INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31128028) AS TO DEFENDANT ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BENDIX CORPORATION, SUED HEREIN AS HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31040047) AS TO DEFENDANT MULLIN DEVELOPMENT CO.(FKA MULLIN LUMBER CO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL CALENDAR FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JULY-29-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 FOR FILING OF THE DISMISSAL AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REPORTED TO DEPT. 603 THAT THE MATTER SETTLED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
185 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15374043) FILED BY DEFENDANT AMCORD INC (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15357697) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15339364) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CO. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15324037) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15324037) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15324037) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15324037) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPURLING, EDWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPURLING, EDWIN AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,C,H,I AMCORD INC HANSON AGGREGATES WEST INC BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL LLC DOWMAN PRODUCTS INC DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-17-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less