This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/16/2016 at 13:41:41 (UTC).

EDWIN RONQUILLO VS. ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/28/2015 EDWIN RONQUILLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7661

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RONQUILLO, EDWIN

Defendants

ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY

ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

STEPHENS INSTITUTE

STEPHENS INSTITUTE, INC., DBA ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY (THE "UNIVERSITY")(ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY, ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION, AND STEPHENS INSTITUTE)

STEPHENS INSTITUTE DBA ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNION, KELLY M

Attorney at MANNION & LOWE

655 Montgomery Street, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

VARTAIN, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at VARTAIN LAW GROUP

601 Montgomery St, Ste 780

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR DEC-05-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; (TRANSACTION ID # 58474190) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION STEPHENS INSTITUTE DBA ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY

DECLARATION OF STACEY L. LEASK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF OBJE

DECLARATION OF STACEY L. LEASK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO ORDER SETTING COURT TRIAL; (TRANSACTION ID # 58474190) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION STEPHENS INSTITUTE DBA ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO ORDER SETTING COURT TRIAL

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO ORDER SETTING COURT TRIAL; (TRANSACTION ID # 58474190) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION STEPHENS INSTITUTE DBA ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY

Answer to Complaint for Negligence and Battery by Defendant Stephens I

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16020028) FILED BY DEFENDANT STEPHENS INSTITUTE DBA ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY (Fee:450.00)

Notice of Objection to Order Setting Court Trial

NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO ORDER SETTING COURT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58457194) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RONQUILLO, EDWIN

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR OCT-11-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-27-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58418837) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RONQUILLO, EDWIN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16010061) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION STEPHENS INSTITUTE, INC., DBA ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY (THE "UNIVERSITY")(ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY, ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION, AND STEPHENS INSTITUTE) ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE AND BATTERY BY DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58267474) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION (Fee:450.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE AND BATTERY BY DEFENDANT STEPHENS I

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58029834) FILED BY DEFENDANT STEPHENS INSTITUTE, INC., DBA ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY (THE "UNIVERSITY")(ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY, ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION, AND STEPHENS INSTITUTE) (Fee:450.00)

Proof of Service of summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100005724) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RONQUILLO, EDWIN SERVED SEP-22-2015, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY

Proof of Service of summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100005562), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RONQUILLO, EDWIN SERVED SEP-17-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT STEPHENS INSTITUTE

Proof of Service of summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100005501), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RONQUILLO, EDWIN SERVED SEP-17-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RONQUILLO, EDWIN AS TO DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION STEPHENS INSTITUTE DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-27-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-27-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-04-2016 (Fee:450.00)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR DEC-05-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • OBJECTION HEARING OF JAN-27-2016 HELD. JUDGE JOHN STEWART; CLERK R. WOODS/M. OLOPERNES. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (610)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE; (TRANSACTION ID # 58474190) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION STEPHENS INSTITUTE DBA ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF STACEY L. LEASK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO ORDER SETTING COURT TRIAL; (TRANSACTION ID # 58474190) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION STEPHENS INSTITUTE DBA ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO ORDER SETTING COURT TRIAL; (TRANSACTION ID # 58474190) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION STEPHENS INSTITUTE DBA ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR OBJECTION HEARING HEARING SET FOR JAN-27-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16020028) FILED BY DEFENDANT STEPHENS INSTITUTE DBA ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO ORDER SETTING COURT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58457194) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RONQUILLO, EDWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF RONQUILLO, EDWIN (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR OCT-11-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-27-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 58418837) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RONQUILLO, EDWIN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16010061) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION STEPHENS INSTITUTE, INC., DBA ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY (THE "UNIVERSITY")(ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY, ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION, AND STEPHENS INSTITUTE) ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58267474) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58029834) FILED BY DEFENDANT STEPHENS INSTITUTE, INC., DBA ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY (THE "UNIVERSITY")(ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY, ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION, AND STEPHENS INSTITUTE) (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100005724) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RONQUILLO, EDWIN SERVED SEP-22-2015, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100005562), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RONQUILLO, EDWIN SERVED SEP-17-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT STEPHENS INSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100005501), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RONQUILLO, EDWIN SERVED SEP-17-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RONQUILLO, EDWIN AS TO DEFENDANT ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION STEPHENS INSTITUTE DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-27-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-27-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-04-2016 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******7661
Case Title:EDWIN RONQUILLO VS. ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY ET AL
Court Date:NOV-29-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Depositions, Production Of Documents At Deposition, And A Site Inspection And Request For Sanctions
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON TUESDAY, November 29, 2016, LINE 7PLAINTIFF EDWIN RONQUILLO'S Motion To Compel Depositions, Production Of Documents At Deposition, And A Site Inspection And Request For SanctionsContinued to January 31, 2017 at 9:00 AM to be heard in Department 301 concurrently with other discovery motion. =302/HK


Case Number:*******7661
Case Title:EDWIN RONQUILLO VS. ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY ET AL
Court Date:JAN-31-2017 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Depositions, Production Of Documents At Deposition, And A Site Inspection And Request For Sanctions
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, January 31 2017, Line 2, PLAINTIFF EDWIN RONQUILLO's Motion To Compel Depositions, Production Of Documents At Deposition, And A Site Inspection And Request For Sanctions Pro Tem Judge Roger Mead, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Appearance Required. The parties should be prepared to discuss the current status of the case and outstanding discovery. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to rmead@folgerlevin.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested.=302/jpt


Case Number:*******7661
Case Title:EDWIN RONQUILLO VS. ACADEMY OF ART UNIVERSITY ET AL
Court Date:FEB-21-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Depositions, Production Of Documents At Deposition, And A Site Inspection And Request For Sanctions
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON TUESDAY, February 21, 2017, LINE 4PLAINTIFF EDWIN RONQUILLO'S Motion To Compel Depositions, Production Of Documents At Deposition, And A Site Inspection And Request For SanctionsOff calendar. The parties stipulated to the judge pro tem's decision. =302/HK


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACADEMY OF ART COLLEGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARTAIN, MICHAEL J.