Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 15:33:27 (UTC).

EDWIN A HARDY VS. FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT, A et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2011 EDWIN A HARDY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT, A. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5611

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARDY, EDWIN A AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BAYSIDE SPECIALTY CONSTRUCTION

KENNER-USA INC.

FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MASONRY, DRUMMOND (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS MARK DRUMMOND SIMTH, DBA DRUMMOND MASONRY)

CRISTACURVA A TEXAS CO

VEVERKA, GERALD J DBA VEVERKA ARCHITECTS

VERNIC, FRANJO, AN INDIVIDUAL ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT

San Francisco, CA 94118

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

KRUSE, CLAUDIA AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR FOR THE ESTATE OF GERALD J VEVERKA

SAULOVICH, JAMES B. IND DBA BAYSIDE SPECIALTY CONSTRUCTION

BLISS NORAM A NY CO

GLASS WHOLESALERS, INC.

4822 Southerland

Houston, TX 77092

KRUSE, CLAUDIA L.

ROES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

MOES 1-500

SAULOVICH, JAMES B. AN INDIVIDUAL DBA BAYSIDE SPECIALTY CONSTRUCTION

SF REHABITAT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BAYSIDE SPECIALTY CONSTRUCTION, A DBA OF JAMES B. SAULOVICH

ROES 1 THROUGH 50

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MASONRY, DRUMMOND (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS MARK DRUMMOND SIMTH, DBA DRUMMOND MASONRY)

VEVERKA, GERALD J DBA VEVERKA ARCHITECTS

VERNIC, FRANJO, AN INDIVIDUAL ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT

San Francisco, CA 94118

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JARET, PHILLIP ALLEN

Attorney at JARET & JARET

1016 Lincoln Avenue

San Rafael, CA 94901

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BROWNE, JOHN RUTHERFORD

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN R. BROWN IIIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

50 California St., Suite 3500

San Francisco, CA 94111

MENEKSHE, AYHAN M.

Attorney at MENEKSHE LAW FIRM

950 East Campbell Avenue

Campbell, CA 95008

ESTEP, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY R. WAGNER

1655 Grant Street, Suite 800-B

Concord, CA 94520

FIFE, PAUL DAVID

Attorney at WILD, CAREY & FIFE

100 Montgomery Street, Suite 1410

San Francisco, CA 94104-4317

ABEL, ADAM SCOTT

Attorney at BRADLEY, CURLEY, ASIANO BARABEE & CRAWFORD, PC

1100 Larkspur Landing Cir.#200

Larkspur, CA 94939

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ESTEP, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY R. WAGNER

1655 Grant Street, Suite 800-B

Concord, CA 94520

FIFE, PAUL DAVID

Attorney at WILD, CAREY & FIFE

100 Montgomery Street, Suite 1410

San Francisco, CA 94104-4317

Other Attorneys

SHANAGHER, DENIS FRANCIS

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF HARDY, EDWIN A AN INDIVIDUAL RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $676,727.39 PRINCIPAL, $169,851.00 ATTORNEY FEES, TOTAL JUDGMENT $846,578.39, SEE SCANNED DOC

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT CROSS COMPLAINANT VEVERKA, GERALD J DBA VEVERKA ARCHITECTS RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $115,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $65,178.00 ATTORNEY FEES, TOTAL JUDGMENT $180,178.00, SEE SCANNED DOC [BELOW]

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED POST-TRIAL ORDER RE JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARDY, EDWIN A AN INDIVIDUAL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT VERNIC, FRANJO, AN INDIVIDUAL ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT VERNIC, FRANJO, AN INDIVIDUAL ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARDY, EDWIN A AN INDIVIDUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT VERNIC, FRANJO, AN INDIVIDUAL ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL AND/OR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARDY, EDWIN A AN INDIVIDUAL

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYSIDE SPECIALTY CONSTRUCTION (Fee:450.00)

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT KENNER-USA INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ROES 1-50, INCLUSIVE BLISS NORAM A NY CO SAULOVICH, JAMES B. AN INDIVIDUAL DBA BAYSIDE SPECIALTY CONSTRUCTION

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (OF FRANJO VERNIC) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT KENNER-USA INC.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

DECLARATION RE: EX PARTE NOTICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARDY, EDWIN A AN INDIVIDUAL

ORDER

ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARDY, EDWIN A AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED SEP-30-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT GLASS WHOLESALERS, INC.

EXHIBIT A TO FIFE DECLARATION

EXHIBIT A TO FIFE DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 55350505) FILED BY DEFENDANT VEVERKA, GERALD J DBA VEVERKA ARCHITECTS

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR APR-28-2014 - CASE SETTLED PER PARTIES. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON OCT-21-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT VEVERKA, GERALD J DBA VEVERKA ARCHITECTS

Notice of Change of Address

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 55944669) FILED BY ATTORNEY FIFE, PAUL DAVID

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56341180) AS TO DEFENDANT VEVERKA, GERALD J DBA VEVERKA ARCHITECTS KRUSE, CLAUDIA AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR FOR THE ESTATE OF GERALD J VEVERKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED POST-TRIAL ORDER RE JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARDY, EDWIN A AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT CROSS COMPLAINANT VEVERKA, GERALD J DBA VEVERKA ARCHITECTS RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $115,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $65,178.00 ATTORNEY FEES, TOTAL JUDGMENT $180,178.00, SEE SCANNED DOC [BELOW]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF HARDY, EDWIN A AN INDIVIDUAL RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION $676,727.39 PRINCIPAL, $169,851.00 ATTORNEY FEES, TOTAL JUDGMENT $846,578.39, SEE SCANNED DOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • REMOVED FROM COURT TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-14-2014 - JUDGMENT ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • MASTER COURT CALENDAR OF OCT-14-2014 ASSIGNED TO COURT TRIAL CALENDAR ON OCT-14-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT. 613, JOHN K STEWART. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: D. LOK; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT KENNER-USA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT BLISS NORAM A NY CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 56182319) FILED BY DEFENDANT KRUSE, CLAUDIA AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR FOR THE ESTATE OF GERALD J VEVERKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT SAULOVICH, JAMES B. IND DBA BAYSIDE SPECIALTY CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
130 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT VERNIC, FRANJO, AN INDIVIDUAL ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT SERVED MAR-30-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON CROSS DEFENDANT SMITH, MARK DRUMMOND DBA DRUMMOND MASONRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-06-2012 CONTINUED TO JUN-08-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT(S) TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARDY, EDWIN A AN INDIVIDUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT VERNIC, FRANJO, AN INDIVIDUAL ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT VERNIC, FRANJO, AN INDIVIDUAL ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT SMITH, MARK DRUMMOND DBA DRUMMOND MASONRY ROES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT VERNIC, FRANJO, AN INDIVIDUAL ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT VERNIC, FRANJO, AN INDIVIDUAL ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT BY MAIL ON 11/29/11, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARDY, EDWIN A AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED NOV-28-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARDY, EDWIN A AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT FRANJO VERNIC, AN INDIVIDUAL, DBA SF REHABITAT, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-06-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-03-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-22-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHANAGHER, DENIS F.