This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:46:26 (UTC).

EDWARD MIRZAKHANIAN VS. HOMEOWNER ROE et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 EDWARD MIRZAKHANIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOMEOWNER ROE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8434

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD

Defendants

HOMEOWNER ROE

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHOLZ, RONI

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RONI ROTHOLZ

1870 Olympic Blvd., Suite 120

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-25-2014 CONTINUED TO FEB-03-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-05-2013 CONTINUED TO JUL-17-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-12-2014 CONTINUED TO SEP-30-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Sanction Order

SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $400.00 AGAINST RONI ROTHOLZ, ESQ. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: FEB-11-2014, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE FEB-26-2014. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-30-2014 CONTINUED TO NOV-25-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE SEP-30-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD AS TO DEFENDANT HOMEOWNER ROE DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-21-2013 (Fee:225.00)

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-10-2014 CONTINUED TO AUG-12-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE JUN-10-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-03-2015 CONTINUED TO APR-07-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE FEB-03-2015 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-31-2013 CONTINUED TO FEB-11-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE DEC-31-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Response To OSC

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 15026022) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-29-2013 CONTINUED TO DEC-31-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE OCT-29-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-27-2013 CONTINUED TO OCT-29-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE AUG-27-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

RESPONSE TO OSC RE SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-07-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (610)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-07-2015 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57021812)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-03-2015 CONTINUED TO APR-07-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE FEB-03-2015 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 15026022) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-25-2014 CONTINUED TO FEB-03-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-25-2014 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-30-2014 CONTINUED TO NOV-25-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE SEP-30-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-31-2013 CONTINUED TO FEB-11-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE DEC-31-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-29-2013 CONTINUED TO DEC-31-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE OCT-29-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-27-2013 CONTINUED TO OCT-29-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE AUG-27-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO OSC RE SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-27-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE JUL-17-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-05-2013 CONTINUED TO JUL-17-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIRZAKHANIAN, EDWARD AS TO DEFENDANT HOMEOWNER ROE DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-21-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less