This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 21:01:49 (UTC).

EDWARD HARBOUR VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2007 EDWARD HARBOUR filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4221

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY

GRINNELL LLC

VIKING PUMP, INC.

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

SANTA FE BRAUN, INC., AS SII TO C.F. BRAUN, INC.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD., SUED HEREIN AS DOE #3

CRANE CO.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.

DOES 1-8500

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN & BROOKE, LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Ste 700

Gardena, CA 90247-7468

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

WORDEN, JOHN SPENCER

Attorney at MORGENSTEIN & JUBELIRER

One Market Plaza, Spear Street Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

BUTY, MADELINE L

Attorney at BUTY & CURLIANO LLP

555 12Th Street, Suite 1280

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Def. ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, fka ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.S Demand for Trial by Jury and Estimate of Length of Time.

DEF. ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, FKA ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.S DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TIME. (TRANSACTION ID # 15893397) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, FORMERLY KNOWN AS ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.

Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16010350) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY- ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16026123) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16033956) FILED BY DEFENDANT OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

amendment to complaint

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17054753) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.

Association of Counsel for Defendant Honeywell International Inc.

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, / ASSOCIATION FOR COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 20331190): HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

Answer of Defendant Rapid-American Corporation to Unverified Complaint for Damages (Asbestos)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24415114) FILED BY DEFENDANT RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION (Fee:365.00)

DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 25718575) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR SEP-03-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:200.00)

CRANE CO.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 25761919) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO. HEARING SET FOR SEP-08-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:200.00)

DECLARATION OF MARIA A. CARUANA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

DECLARATION OF MARIA A. CARUANA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES (TRANSACTION ID # 25810656) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD., SUED HEREIN AS DOE #3

DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMAMRY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES (TRANSACTION ID # 25810656)

PROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; EXHIBIT INDEX; SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; DECLARATION OF LAUREN E. POWE IN SUPPORT

PROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; EXHIBIT INDEX; SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; DECLARATION OF LAUREN E. POWE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; EXHIBITS A, B, C, D, E; [PROPOSED] ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 25820678) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

DECLARATION OF ALICE Y. AHN IN SUPPORT OF CRANE CO.?S REPLY BRIEF TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO CRANE CO.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF ALICE Y. AHN IN SUPPORT OF ITS REPLY BRIEF TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 26888229) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

MIL 13: DEFENDANT CRANE CO.?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE CHARACTERIZATION OF DEFENDANT AS AN ?ASBESTOS COMPANY? OR AS PART OF THE ?ASBESTOS INDUSTRY?

MOTION IN LIMINE 13: TO PRECLUDE CHARACTERIZATION OF DEFT AS AN "ASBESTOS COMPANY" OR AS PART OF THE "ASBESTOS INDUSTRY" (TRANSACTION ID # 32310798) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

MIL 16: DEFENDANT CRANE CO.?S PROPOSED TRIAL STIPULATIONS

MIL 16: PROPOSED TRIAL STIPULATIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 32310798) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal & POS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 35020395) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58551015)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

183 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58551015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-04-2016 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, PER REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. PATRICK CAMPBELL APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF WILL PROCEED TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. JUDGE: GARRETT WONG; CLERK: JIROQUE; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-01-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. TIFFANY VIVEROS APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-07-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-01-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-07-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-06-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, BRENDA POSADA. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2014 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON NOV-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: CINDY GARIS, CSR#9402 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO DEC-02-2015 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARBOUR, EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
210 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15893397) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, FORMERLY KNOWN AS ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15877993) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15871918) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 15825857) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15825857) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15788071) FILED BY DEFENDANT SULZER PUMPS (US) INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15788071) FILED BY DEFENDANT SULZER PUMPS (US) INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARBOUR, EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARBOUR, EDWARD AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less