This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 14:23:25 (UTC).

EBONY BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE et al VS. BLUS CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CA CORPORATION et al***TRANSFERRED TO LOS ANGELES***

Case Summary

On 10/20/2011 EBONY BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE filed an Other lawsuit against BLUS CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CA CORPORATION TRANSFERRED TO LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5251

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BURMAN, ALAN R

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ALAN R. BURMAN

6454 Van Nuys Bloulevard, Suite 150

Van Nuys, CA 91401

DUBERCHIN, MICHAEL S

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL S. DUBERCHIN

P O Box 8806

Calabasas, CA 91372

JARDINI, ANDRE E

Attorney at KNAPP PETERSEN & CLARKE

500 N. Brand Blvd. 20Th Flr

Glendale, CA 91203

Defendant Attorney

SULZER, KENNETH D.

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

2029 Century Park East,, 35Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-23-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-19-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-08-2012 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1510.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION

APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:40.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED NOV-23-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED NOV-23-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF CASE AND COORDINATION OF ACTION ; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR DEC-22-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:1920.00)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE AND COORDINATION OF ACTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND/ OR MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE RE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE AND COORDINATION OF ACTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF K.L. MYLES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE AND COORDINATION OF ACTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF NON-=RECIPT OF PLTFS' OPPOS FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF GEORGE GEOGDZHYAN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO DEFT'S OPPOS. TO PLTF'S MTN FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

REPLY

REPLY TO DEFT'S OPPOS. TO PLTF'S MTN FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND REQ. TO HAVE MTNS DEEMED FILED; DEC. OF K.L. MYLES FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

REQ. FOR JUDICIAL NTC IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO DEFT'S OPPOS. TO PLTF'S MTN FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND REQ. TO HAVE MTNS DEEMED FILED FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION (SUPPLEMENTAL) TO DEFT'S MTN TO TRANSFER CASE AND COORDINATION OF ACTION; DEC. OF ANDRE E JARDINI FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

APPENDIX OF NON-PUBLISHED FEDERAL AUTHORITY FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

REPLY

REPLY MEMO OF P&A FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSFER RECEIPT RECEIVED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WITH NEW CASE NUMBER BC481586

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-23-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. CASE TRANSFERRED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • TRANSFER ORDER; FEES PAID, TRANSFERRED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY BY CERT. MAIL NO. 7010 1060 0000 5136 2411 FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • CHANGE OF VENUE TO ANOTHER COURT AND TRANSMITTAL OF PAPERS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-26-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, A R G U E D; THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING: DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AND ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE'S RENEWED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO LOS ANGELES AND REQUEST FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL - MOTION IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 396(B) AND 397(A) AND GOVERNMENT CODE 12965(B). JUDGE SOHIGIAN DID NOT RULE ON THE MERITS OF A MOTION INVOKING SECTION 12965(B) AND THUS THIS MOTION IS NOT SEEKING RECONSIDERATION. DEFENDANTS HAVE SHOWN THAT VENUE IS IMPROPER IN THIS COUNTY PER SECTION 12965(B). ALL REQUESTS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES ARE DENIED. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, REPORTER: LA VENA WARD, CSR # 7077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • APPENDIX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHOROTIES FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • REPLY MEMO OF P&A IN SUPPORT FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOS TO DEFTS RENWED NOTICE OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (VOL 3 OF 3) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND/ OR MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE AND COORDINATION OF ACTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF CASE AND COORDINATION OF ACTION ; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR DEC-22-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:1920.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED NOV-23-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED NOV-23-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE, EBONY AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED PERRY, BETTE AS INDIVIDUALS , ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-23-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-19-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-08-2012 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1510.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5251
Case Title:EBONY BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE et al VS. BLUS CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CA CORPORATION et al***TRANSFERRED TO LOS ANGELES***
Court Date:DEC-22-2011 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion For Transfer Of Case And Coordination Of Action
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, December 22, 2011, Line 11, DEFENDANTs BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE's Motion For Transfer Of Case And Coordination Of Action. Denied. The moving party failed to provide courtesy copies of the moving papers in compliance with San Francisco Local Rule 2.6B. Opposing party failed to provide courtesy copies. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/MJM)


Case Number:*******5251
Case Title:EBONY BRIDEWELL-SLEDGE et al VS. BLUS CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CA CORPORATION et al***TRANSFERRED TO LOS ANGELES***
Court Date:JAN-26-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Renewed Notice Of Motion And Motion To Transfer Venue And Request For An Award Of Attorney'S Fees And Costs Against Plaintiff'S Counsel; Points And Authorities, Declarations Of Jill A Porcaro And Denise Held In Support; Appendix Of Non Published Federal Authority
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, January 26, 2012, Line 21. DEFENDANT BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AND ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE'S Renewed Notice Of Motion And Motion To Transfer Venue And Request For An Award Of Attorney'S Fees And Costs Against Plaintiff'S Counsel.Granted pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 396(b) and 397(a) and Government Code 12965(b). Judge Sohigian did not rule on the merits of a motion invoking section 12965(b) and thus this motion is not seeking reconsideration. Defendants have shown that venue is improper in this county per section 12965(b). All requests for attorney's fees are denied. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. = (302/HEK)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SULZER KENNETH D.