This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/31/2022 at 14:39:53 (UTC).

EBONI WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL VS. MAPLEBEAR, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 EBONI WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MAPLEBEAR, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1761

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EBONI WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendant

MAPLEBEAR, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON, JONAS B.

Attorney at DOVEL & LUNER, LLP

201 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 600

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Defendant Attorney

DONOVAN, JR., WILLIAM P

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 900673206

 

Court Documents

Class Action Complaint

BUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68098547) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EBONI WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT MAPLEBEAR, INC. NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-15-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-14-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-23-2023

Civil Case Cover Sheet

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68098547) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EBONI WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

CLRA Venue Declaration

DECLARATION OF CLRA VENUE DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 68098547) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EBONI WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68098547) TO PLAINTIFF EBONI WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68168536), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EBONI WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED SEP-19-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MAPLEBEAR, INC.

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFT TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT TO 11-21-22

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • FinancialPayment: JURY FEES; Amount: $150; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C5022A26J009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketJURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 68307895) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF EBONI WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED; Fee: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFT TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT TO 11-21-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H2122A17F004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68240105) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAPLEBEAR, INC.; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68168536), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EBONI WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED SEP-19-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MAPLEBEAR, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68098547) TO PLAINTIFF EBONI WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C7122914F007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF CLRA VENUE DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 68098547) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EBONI WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68098547) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EBONI WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68098547) FILED BY PLAINTIFF EBONI WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT MAPLEBEAR, INC. NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-15-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-14-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-23-2023; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAPLEBEAR INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONOVAN WILLIAM PATRICK JR