This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/22/2020 at 01:54:02 (UTC).

EASTON RUHNKE ET AL VS. HUBBELL POWER SYSTEMS, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 EASTON RUHNKE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HUBBELL POWER SYSTEMS, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8413

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUHNKE, KAYLA , INDIVIDUALLY

RUHNKE, EASTON , BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, KAYLA RUHNKE

Defendants

ATLAS FIELD SERVICES, INC.

CANUS CORPORATION

HUBBELL POWER SYSTEMS, INC. , DBA A.B. CHANCE COMPANY

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GERTLER, JONATHAN EDMUND

35 Twin Oaks Ave

San Rafael, CA 94901-1915

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUHNKE, EASTON , BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, KAYLA RUHNKE RUHNKE, KAYLA , INDIVIDUALLY AS TO DEFENDANT HUBBELL POWER SYSTEMS, INC. , DBA A.B. CHANCE COMPANY PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY ATLAS FIELD SERVICES, INC. CANUS CORPORATION DOES 1-50 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-12-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-09-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-19-2021

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • FinancialPayment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1520C21C021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1520C21F020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketFEE PAID FOR APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUHNKE, EASTON , BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, KAYLA RUHNKE RUHNKE, KAYLA , INDIVIDUALLY (Fee:$20.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUHNKE, EASTON , BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, KAYLA RUHNKE RUHNKE, KAYLA , INDIVIDUALLY AS TO DEFENDANT HUBBELL POWER SYSTEMS, INC. , DBA A.B. CHANCE COMPANY PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY ATLAS FIELD SERVICES, INC. CANUS CORPORATION DOES 1-50 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-12-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-09-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-19-2021 (Fee:$450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******8413
Case Title:EASTON RUHNKE ET AL VS. HUBBELL POWER SYSTEMS, INC. ET AL
Court Date:AUG-17-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Leave To Intervene (Motions)
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, August 17, 2022, Line 6,OTHER PAR ELECTRICAL CONTRACTORS, INC.Motion For Leave To Intervene (Motions)Par Electrical Contractors, Inc.'s unopposed "motion for leave to intervene" is granted.Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which states that the motion was not opposed and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing.=(302/RBU)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hubbell Power Systems Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CANUS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Gas and Electric Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GERTLER, JONATHAN E