This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 06:51:30 (UTC).

EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS. ACE IRON, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/16/2011 EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ACE IRON, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8269

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

ACE IRON, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

SARESHWALA, ANJUM AN INDIVIDUAL

Dublin, CA 94568

SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AN INDIVIDUAL

Dublin, CA 94568

SARESHWALA, ANJUM AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST MAY 3. 1999;

7172 Regional St #232

Dublin, CA 94568

SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST MAY 3. 1999;

7172 Regional St #232

Dublin, CA 94568

Others

THE HARTFORD

SHAW, ERIC (RECEIVER)

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KELLER, IVO

Attorney at BUCHALTER NEMER

55 Second St 17Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105-3493

SMITH, SCOTT O

1000 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorney

ELLAHIE, JAVED INAM

Attorney at ELLAHIE & FAROOQUI LLP

12 South First St Ste 600

San Jose, CA 95113

Other Attorney

FELTON, JAMES R.

Attorney at GREENBERG & BASS LLP

16000 Ventura Blvd., Ste.1000

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ACE IRON, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AN INDIVIDUAL SARESHWALA, ANJUM AN INDIVIDUAL SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999; SARESHWALA, ANJUM AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999; $4,025,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $24,396.05 ATTORNEY FEES, $750,391.11 INTEREST, $4,109.83 COSTS, $90,331.58 SEE ATTACHMENT 6 TO THE JUDGMENT., TOTAL JUDGMENT $4,894,228.57, SEE SCANNED DOC

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FIELD BY PLTF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ; APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND FOR ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED FEB-25-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ACE IRON, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ; APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND FOR ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED FEB-25-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999;

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED FEB-25-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ; APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND FOR ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED FEB-25-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SARESHWALA, ANJUM AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999;

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AN INDIVIDUAL SARESHWALA, ANJUM AN INDIVIDUAL SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999; SARESHWALA, ANJUM AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999; (Fee:1640.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ACE IRON, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:410.00)

ORDER

ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN AID OF RECEIVER

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-09-2011 CONTINUED TO DEC-28-2011 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

AMENDED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY DEFENDANT SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999; SARESHWALA, ANJUM AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999;

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-27-2012 - COURTROOM CLOSED. IF A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE DISPOSITIVE OF THE CASE, THE PARTIES MAY REQUEST ONE AT TIME OF TRIAL.

Notice of Non-Payment of Jury Fees

NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF JURY FEES

STIPULATION

STIPULATION REGARDING AUTHENICITY OF LOAN DOCUMENTS FILED BY EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AN INDIVIDUAL SARESHWALA, ANJUM AN INDIVIDUAL SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999; SARESHWALA, ANJUM AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999;

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY DEFENDANT ACE IRON, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AN INDIVIDUAL SARESHWALA, ANJUM AN INDIVIDUAL SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999; SARESHWALA, ANJUM AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999;

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEFENDANT ACE IRON, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AN INDIVIDUAL SARESHWALA, ANJUM AN INDIVIDUAL SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999; SARESHWALA, ANJUM AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999;

Case Ordered Off Calendar

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-08-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR - TRIAL DATE PENDING. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

FINAL REPORT FILED BY OTHER SHAW, ERIC (RECEIVER)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFENDANT SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • ORDER FOR EXAMINATION ON MAY-30-2012 OFF CALENDAR - NO APPEARANCES & NO PROOF OF SERVICE. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • ORDER FOR EXAMINATION ON MAY-30-2012 OFF CALENDAR - NO APPEARANCES & NO PROOF OF SERVICE. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FIELD BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AN INDIVIDUAL OEX HEARING SET FOR MAY-30-2012 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AN INDIVIDUAL SARESHWALA, ANJUM AN INDIVIDUAL SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999; SARESHWALA, ANJUM AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999; (Fee:1640.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOS TO APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND FOR ISSUANCE OF PRELIM INJUNCTION IN AID OF RECEIVER FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ; APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND FOR ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED FEB-25-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SARESHWALA, ANJUM AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ; APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND FOR ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED FEB-25-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SARESHWALA, ANJUM AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED FEB-25-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ; APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND FOR ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED FEB-25-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ; APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND FOR ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SERVED FEB-25-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ACE IRON, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • NTC OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND FOR ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN AID OR RECEIVER, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR MAR-30-2011 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF EAST WEST BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT ACE IRON, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AN INDIVIDUAL SARESHWALA, ANJUM AN INDIVIDUAL SARESHWALA, AEJAZ AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999; SARESHWALA, ANJUM AS TRUSTEE OF THA AEJAZ AND ANJUM SARESHWALA REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 3. 1999; DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-22-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-18-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-07-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Hartford is a litigant

Latest cases where EAST WEST BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant