This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 17:49:56 (UTC).

DUSTIN K. HENDERSON VS. BIOMATRIX INC. DBA BIOMATRIX INTERNATIONAL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2012 DUSTIN K HENDERSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BIOMATRIX INC DBA BIOMATRIX INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1259

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENDERSON, DUSTIN K.

Defendants

BIOMATRIX INC DBA BIOMATRIX INTERNATIONAL

BIOMATRIX INC. DBA BIOMATRIX INTERNATIONAL

BIOMATRIX, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HELLAND, MATTHEW C

Attorney at NICHOLS KASTER & ANDERSON, LLP

One Embarcadero Center, Ste 720

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

SABHARWAL, SUNENA

Attorney at SABHARWAL LAW OFFICES

1816 Fifth Street

Berkeley, CA 94710

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HENDERSON, DUSTIN K. AS TO DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX INC. DBA BIOMATRIX INTERNATIONAL SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-31-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-30-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-16-2012 (Fee:410.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR STAY OR DISMISS

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR STAY OR DISMISS / NTC OF MO & MO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COMPLT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, AND PRECLUSION BY CHOICE OF LAW PROVISION FILED BY DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX, INC. HEARING SET FOR JUL-31-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:410.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND/OR TO STRIKE COMPLT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, PRECLUSION BY CHOICE OF LAW PROVISION FILED BY DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX, INC.

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF GUY MILLER IN SUPPORT OF MO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COMPLT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, AND PRECLUSION BY CHOICE OF LAW PROVISION FILED BY DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX, INC.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

MEMO OF LAW AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOS. TO DEFT'S MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HENDERSON, DUSTIN K.

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF DUSTIN K HENDERSON FILED BY PLAINTIFF HENDERSON, DUSTIN K.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS OF MEMO OF LAW AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOS. TO DEFT'S MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COMPLAINT AND DEC FILED BY PLAINTIFF HENDERSON, DUSTIN K.

REPLY

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS TO DISMISS AND/STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX, INC.

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF (SUPPLEMENTAL) GUY MILLER IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS TO DISMISS AND/STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX, INC.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF GUY MILLER IN SUPPORT OF MO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COMPLT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, AND PRECLUSION BY CHOICE OF LAW PROVISION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND/OR TO STRIKE COMPLT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, PRECLUSION BY CHOICE OF LAW PROVISION; NTC OF MO & MO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COMPLT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, AND PRECLUSION BY CHOICE OF LAW PROVISION FILED BY DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX, INC.

ORDER

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND OR STRIKE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION (COPY OF ORDER IN DEPT. 301 OUTBOX)

STIPULATION

STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY HENDERSON, DUSTIN K.

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-31-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-31-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY HENDERSON, DUSTIN K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND OR STRIKE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION (COPY OF ORDER IN DEPT. 301 OUTBOX)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-14-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, THE MATTER WAS ARGUED. RULING: THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX, INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, AND PRECLUSION OF LAW PROVISION IS DENIED. THE PORTION OF THE RUTTER GROUP CITED BY DEFENDANT, WHEN READ IN CONTEXT, DOES NOT STAND FOR THE PROPOSITION THAT A CHOICE-OF-LAW CLAUSE IS THE SAME THING AS A FORUM-SELECTION CLAUSE AND THERE IS NO LEGAL AUTHORITY FOR THIS POSITION. THERE IS NO FORUM-SELECTION CLAUSE BETWEEN THE PARTIES. PLAINTIFF HAS PRESENTED EVIDENCE SUFFICIENT TO ESTABLISH SPECIFIC PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER DEFENDANT. (PREVAILING PARTY TO PREPARE A MORE SPECIFIC FORM OF ORDER.) JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; COURT REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER CSR # 5976

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF GUY MILLER IN SUPPORT OF MO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COMPLT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, AND PRECLUSION BY CHOICE OF LAW PROVISION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND/OR TO STRIKE COMPLT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, PRECLUSION BY CHOICE OF LAW PROVISION; NTC OF MO & MO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COMPLT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, AND PRECLUSION BY CHOICE OF LAW PROVISION FILED BY DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, RULING - DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX, INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR STAY OR DISMISS IS CONTINUED TO AUGUST 14, 2012. JUDGE: CURTIS KARNOW, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; COURT REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER CSR # 5976

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-31-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF (SUPPLEMENTAL) GUY MILLER IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS TO DISMISS AND/STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS TO DISMISS AND/STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • POS OF MEMO OF LAW AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOS. TO DEFT'S MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COMPLAINT AND DEC FILED BY PLAINTIFF HENDERSON, DUSTIN K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DUSTIN K HENDERSON FILED BY PLAINTIFF HENDERSON, DUSTIN K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMO OF LAW AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOS. TO DEFT'S MTN TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HENDERSON, DUSTIN K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF GUY MILLER IN SUPPORT OF MO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COMPLT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, AND PRECLUSION BY CHOICE OF LAW PROVISION FILED BY DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND/OR TO STRIKE COMPLT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, PRECLUSION BY CHOICE OF LAW PROVISION FILED BY DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR STAY OR DISMISS / NTC OF MO & MO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE COMPLT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, AND PRECLUSION BY CHOICE OF LAW PROVISION FILED BY DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX, INC. HEARING SET FOR JUL-31-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HENDERSON, DUSTIN K. AS TO DEFENDANT BIOMATRIX INC. DBA BIOMATRIX INTERNATIONAL SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-31-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-30-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-16-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less