This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/22/2016 at 21:15:39 (UTC).

DOUGLAS SIMPSON VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2008 DOUGLAS SIMPSON filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4683

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC.

CONDIOTTI ENTERPISES, INC.

FORMOSA PLASTICS CORPORATION U.S.A.

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

A-1 INSULATION, INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.,FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL,INC. SII TO THE BENDIX CORP.

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

THE OLYMPIC GLOVE & SAFETY COMPANY, INC.

TOYOTA MOTORS SALES, U.S.A., INC.

DOES 1-8500

NOVATO ROOFING COMPANY

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY

COLLINS & MARLOWE SUPPLY CO

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

VOGL, DAVID ROBERT

Attorney at VOGL AND MEREDITH

456 Montgomery St., 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

STORM, LUCINDA L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM

610A Third Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

LOVE, MARK A

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other Attorneys

POLLACK, DEAN

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119 (Zip Code 94604), 1901 Harrison St, 11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94612

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

ALLISON, STEVEN D

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

38 Technology Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

BUTY, MADELINE L

Attorney at BUTY & CURLIANO LLP

555 12Th Street, Suite 1280

Oakland, CA 94607

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

JUDIN, JENNIFER

Attorney at DEHAY & ELLISTON LLP

1300 Clay Street, Ste 840

Oakland, CA 94612

MA, LILLIAN C

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

135 Main Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

HILL, RODERICK D.

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Defendant Flowmaster, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment [CCP 437(c)]

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 27382109) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWMASTER, INC. HEARING SET FOR DEC-21-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:200.00)

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Flowmaster, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment [CCP 437(c)]

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 27382109) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWMASTER, INC.

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Flowmaster, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment [CRC 3.1350 and CCP 437(c)]

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 27382109) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWMASTER, INC.

Defendant Flowmaster, Inc.s Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 27382109) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWMASTER, INC.

Declaration of Steven D. Allison in Support of Defendant Flowmaster, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment

DECLARATION OF STEVEN D. ALLISON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 27382109) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWMASTER, INC.

Declaration of Lee Thompson in Support of Defendant Flowmaster, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment

DECLARATION OF LEE THOMPSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 27382109) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWMASTER, INC.

Declaration of John Bellman in Support of Defendant Flowmaster, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment

DECLARATION OF JOHN BELLMAN IN SUPPORT OF MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 27434427) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOWMASTER, INC.

Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 27995508) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC. HEARING SET FOR FEB-08-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 220 (Fee:200.00)

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(TRANSACTION ID # 27995508) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC.

ORDER

ORDER STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS

Defendant Condiotti Enterprises, Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20698519) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONDIOTTI ENTERPISES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20764687) FILED BY DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION, N.A., INC. (Fee:335.00)

General Electric Companys Answer To Complaint For Personal Injury

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20902647) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Notice of Change of Address

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 23007550) FILED BY ATTORNEY KANNETT, MARK SIMON

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (TRANSACTION ID # 26714332) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIMPSON, DOUGLAS AS TO DEFENDANT A-1 INSULATION, INC.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 28521416) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 5 TO BE J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO US STEEL CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31345488) AS TO DEFENDANT UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION (FKA USX CORPORATION)

Request for Dismissal without prejudice as to the complaint on behalf of defendant Formosa Plastics Corporation, USA

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33206183) AS TO DEFENDANT FORMOSA PLASTICS CORPORATION U.S.A.

157 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2016
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-04-2016 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. PATRICK CAMPBELL APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF WILL PROCEED TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. JUDGE: GARRETT WONG; CLERK: JIROQUE; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-01-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. TIFFANY VIVEROS APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-07-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-01-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-07-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-04-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MICHAEL LEVINSON. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-02-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-04-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. COUNSEL BRENDA D. PASADA APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR OF JUL-10-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-02-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, OREN NOAH. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-03-2014 TO JUL-10-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-05-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-03-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: RVELUZ/EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF JUN-20-2013 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON DEC-05-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
195 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 20520710) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20520710) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20520710) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 20515311) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOYOTA MOTORS SALES, U.S.A., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20515311) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOYOTA MOTORS SALES, U.S.A., INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20510334) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20348554) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2008
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIMPSON, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIMPSON, DOUGLAS AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-18-2009 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less