Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:52:27 (UTC).

DOROTHY MAE WILLIAMS VS. AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 DOROTHY MAE WILLIAMS filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3073

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, DOROTHY MAE

San Francisco, CA 94112

Defendant

AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA AND UTAH

1900 Powell Street Ste. 1200

Emeryville, CA 94608

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-07-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA AND UTAH

Small Claims Order of Dismissal of Entire Action L.R. 18.0

THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,000.00 FILED BY WILLIAMS, DOROTHY MAE AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA AND UTAH ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-08-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:IFP)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: SMALL CLAIMS DISMISSAL, SENT TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-07-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA AND UTAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, DOROTHY MAE AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA AND UTAH (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, DOROTHY MAE ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,000.00 FILED BY WILLIAMS, DOROTHY MAE AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, NEVADA AND UTAH ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-08-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less