This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:48:51 (UTC).

DONALD LEONARD BAAS et al VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2007 DONALD LEONARD BAAS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4450

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAAS, JANE AREY, AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DONALD LEONARD BAAS, DECEASED

BAAS, DONALD LEONARD

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

CRANE CO.

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, G, H, I

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

DOES 1-8500

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

C.H. MURPHY/CLARK-ULLMAN, INC.

SOUTHERN TALC COMPANY

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.

QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY

UNIVAR USA INC.

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O.Box 6169

Novoto, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

ROBINSON, RALPH WELLS

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2725

CAMPAGNE, INGRID A.

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

MURRAY, JAMES G.

Attorney at PRINDLE DECKER & AMARO LLP

310 Golden Shore, Fourth Floor, P.O. Box 22711

Long Beach, CA 90801-5511

ARMSTRONG, WILLIAM HENRY

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & ASSOCIATES, LLP

One Kaiser Plaza, Suite 625

Oakland, CA 94612

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

JACKSON, WARREN A

Attorney at KASOWITZ, BENSON, TORRES & FRIEDMAN LLP

101 California Street, Suite 2050

San Francisco, CA 94111

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

NUTTALL, NATALIE R

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID BROWN RAYSMAN & STEINER LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCLEOD, BRUCE EDWIN

Attorney at FILICE BROWN EASSA & MCLEOD LLPLAKE MERRITT PLAZA

1999 Harrison St., 18Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAAS, DONALD LEONARD BAAS, JANE AREY AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, G, H, I ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-18-2008 (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17799859) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO. (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Plant Insulation Companys Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17844408) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Cyprus Amax Minerals Companys Objection to Assignment to Commissioner for Trial

CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANYS OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 17984860) FILED BY DEFENDANT CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY

OBJECTION OF IMO INDUSTRIES INC. TO JUDGE PRO TEM AND OR COMMISSIONER ASSIGNMENT

OBJECTION OF IMO INDUSTRIES INC. TO JUDGE PRO TEM AND OR COMMISSIONER ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 18229909) FILED BY DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

OBJECTION OF IMO INDUSTRIES INC. TO JUDGE PRO TEM AND OR COMMISSIONER ASSIGNMENT

OBJECTION OF IMO INDUSTRIES INC. TO JUDGE PRO TEM AND OR COMMISSIONER ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 19804184) FILED BY DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

Defendant Leslie Controls, Inc.s Demand for Jury Trial

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 20010383) FILED BY DEFENDANT LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXISNEXIS FILE & SERVE

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXISNEXIS FILE SERVE ON NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ON GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 20146919) FILED BY DEFENDANT R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC.

DECLARATION OF OREN P. NOAH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC.?S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ON GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS

DECLARATION OF OREN P. NOAH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ON GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS (TRANSACTION ID # 20330781) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAAS, DONALD LEONARD BAAS, JANE AREY BAAS, JANE AREY, AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DONALD LEONARD BAAS, DECEASED

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20348839) FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

DECLARATION OF NATALIE R. NUTTALL IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY-APPEARING R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO R.T. VANDERBILT?S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ON GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS

DECLARATION OF NATALIE R. NUTTALL IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ON GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS (TRANSACTION ID # 20406951) FILED BY DEFENDANT R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC.

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Foster Wheeler LLC only, from the Third Cause of Action (False Representation) and Punitive Damages only.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT ONLY FROM THE THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION (FALSE REPRESENTATION) AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES. (TRANSACTION ID # 21202974) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

Request for Dismissal as to defendant CH Murphy Clark Ullman, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22833475) AS TO DEFENDANT C.H. MURPHY/CLARK-ULLMAN, INC.

Substitution of Attorney for R.T. Vanderbilt Company, Inc.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 23486514): GOLDBERG, SCOTT A SUBSTITUTED FOR NUTTALL, NATALIE R AS ATTORNEY FOR R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC.

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Company

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24412480) AS TO DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO. ONLY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS, FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 25253925) AS TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Request for Dismissal of Complaint With Prejudice - As to Defendant PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION Only

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25919684) AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE PERTAINING TO TRADE ORGANIZATIONS OF WHICH IT WAS NOT A MEMBER Motion in Limine No. 6

DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE SON, INC'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE PERTAINING TO TRADE ORGANIZATIONS OF WHICH IT WAS NOT A MEMBER MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 (TRANSACTION ID # 29880057) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

128 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2012
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-29-2012. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 43058521)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-01-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-29-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-29-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-01-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. NO APPEARANCE FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-25-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-29-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-26-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-25-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-26-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2011
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 RE 24236 FOR TRANSACTION W2109902J005 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON, DOC #1903431697, WARRANT #38200475, DATED FEB-03-2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-24-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-18-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
150 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 17799859) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR NOTICING AND TAKING PLAINTIFF'S VIDEOTAPED TRIAL PRESERVATION TESTIMONY (TRANSACTION ID # 17756101) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAAS, DONALD LEONARD BAAS, JANE AREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 17756101) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAAS, DONALD LEONARD BAAS, JANE AREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR NOTICING AND TAKING PLAINTIFF'S VIDEOTAPED TRIAL PRESERVATION TESTIMONY (TRANSACTION ID # 17756101) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAAS, DONALD LEONARD BAAS, JANE AREY (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17696103) FILED BY DEFENDANT SOUTHERN TALC COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17663406) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEVRON U.S.A INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17622967) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAAS, DONALD LEONARD BAAS, JANE AREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAAS, DONALD LEONARD BAAS, JANE AREY AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, G, H, I ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-18-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less