Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:49:38 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. RAFAEL D CAMACHO et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAFAEL D CAMACHO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8472

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendants

CAMACHO, RAFAEL D

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZIMMERMAN, HALLIE N.

PATTERSON, ERIN E.

Attorney at SUTTELL, HAMMER & WHITE, APC

P.O. Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

 

Court Documents

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT CAMACHO, RAFAEL D $9,939.78 PRINCIPAL, $304.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,244.28, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Notice of change of Firm Name

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 100013898) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $304.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT CAMACHO, RAFAEL D

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK SERVED FEB-27-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CAMACHO, RAFAEL D

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: OSTERMAN, PETER R SUBSTITUTED FOR ZIMMERMAN, HALLIE N. AS ATTORNEY FOR DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF THERESE S. HARRIS RE: WAIVER OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK

Memorandum of Costs

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $2,600.68 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100013898) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK AS TO DEFENDANT CAMACHO, RAFAEL D DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2016
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT CAMACHO, RAFAEL D (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $2,600.68 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100013898) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 100013898) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT CAMACHO, RAFAEL D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: OSTERMAN, PETER R SUBSTITUTED FOR ZIMMERMAN, HALLIE N. AS ATTORNEY FOR DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY ZIMMERMAN, HALLIE N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT CAMACHO, RAFAEL D (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $78.97 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT CAMACHO, RAFAEL D $9,939.78 PRINCIPAL, $304.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,244.28, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF THERESE S. HARRIS RE: WAIVER OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $304.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT CAMACHO, RAFAEL D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK AS TO DEFENDANT CAMACHO, RAFAEL D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK SERVED FEB-27-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CAMACHO, RAFAEL D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK AS TO DEFENDANT CAMACHO, RAFAEL D DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less