Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:48:51 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. KENICHIRO NIKAI et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KENICHIRO NIKAI. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8461

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendants

NIKAI, KENICHIRO

NIKAI, MARI

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIMMERMAN, HALLIE N.

Attorney at BISHOP, WHITE, MARSHALL & WEIBEL, P.S

901 Sunvalley Blvd., Suite 220

Concord, CA 94520

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF THERESE S. HARRIS RE: WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS' FEES. FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $489.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT NIKAI, KENICHIRO NIKAI, MARI

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK AS TO DEFENDANT NIKAI, KENICHIRO NIKAI, MARI DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:370.00)

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT NIKAI, KENICHIRO NIKAI, MARI $12,467.21 PRINCIPAL, $489.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $12,956.71, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK SERVED FEB-25-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT NIKAI, MARI

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK SERVED FEB-25-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT NIKAI, KENICHIRO

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT NIKAI, KENICHIRO NIKAI, MARI $12,467.21 PRINCIPAL, $489.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $12,956.71, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF THERESE S. HARRIS RE: WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS' FEES. FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $489.50 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT NIKAI, KENICHIRO NIKAI, MARI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK AS TO DEFENDANT NIKAI, KENICHIRO NIKAI, MARI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK SERVED FEB-25-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT NIKAI, MARI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK SERVED FEB-25-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT NIKAI, KENICHIRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK AS TO DEFENDANT NIKAI, KENICHIRO NIKAI, MARI DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less