This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/09/2020 at 01:37:34 (UTC).

DIRK NEYHART VS. PETER BRESLER ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 DIRK NEYHART filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against PETER BRESLER. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4339

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEYHART, DIRK , INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA L. SPAUGH

Defendants

THE LAW OFFICES OF BRESLER & LEE

BRESLER, PETER

LEE, FAYE

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABELSON, MARK B

Attorney at CAMPAGNOLI ABELSON & CAMPAGNOLI

465 California Street, Suite 222

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : B1020508F015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NEYHART, DIRK , INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA L. SPAUGH AS TO DEFENDANT BRESLER, PETER LEE, FAYE THE LAW OFFICES OF BRESLER & LEE DOES 1 THROUGH 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-30-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-30-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-08-2020 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4339
Case Title:DIRK NEYHART VS. PETER BRESLER ET AL
Court Date:MAY-20-2021 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Further Answers To Interrogatories And For Sanctions (Part 2 Of 2 For Purposes Of Entry Of Tentative Ruling)
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Thursday, May 20, 2021, Line 1, DEFENDANT PETER BRESLER's Motion To Compel Further Answers To Interrogatories And For Sanctions (Part 2 of 2 for purposes of entry of Tentative Ruling).As a result of the COVID-19 emergency, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to rkane1089@aol.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. (End of Tentative Ruling) =(302/JPT)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABELSON, MARK B.