This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/07/2020 at 04:04:50 (UTC).

DIANE HALL et al VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2007 DIANE HALL filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CYNTHIA M. LEE, TERI L. JACKSON, GARRETT L. WONG, JAMES J. MCBRIDE, CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD, DAVID BALLATI, HAROLD E. KAHN and PAUL H. ALVARADO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4358

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

CYNTHIA M. LEE

TERI L. JACKSON

GARRETT L. WONG

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD

DAVID BALLATI

HAROLD E. KAHN

PAUL H. ALVARADO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HALL, DIANE AS LEGAL HEIR OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED

TAYLOR, EDWARD , AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED

FROMM, LORI ,AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED

Defendants

FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC.

KAWASAKI MOTORS CORP., U.S.A

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

NISSAN FORKLIFT CORPORATION, NORTH AMERICA

SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS THE ALTERNATE ENTITY OF BROADWAY PLUMBING CO., INC. AND BROADWAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC.

SUGDEN ENGINEERING CO.

HARLEY-DAVIDSON, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS "HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY, INC."

DALZIEL SUPPLY COMPANY

ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC.

AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.

FIBRE & METAL PRODUCTS COMPANY

W.L. HICKEY SONS, INC.

NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.

WALDRON, DUFFY, INC.

DYNALECTRIC COMPANY

112 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O.Box 6169

Novoto, CA 949486169

Defendant Attorneys

CONWAY, PATRICIA KANTOR

Attorney at VASQUEZ ESTRADA & CONWAY LLPCOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth Street, Ste 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

KELLEY, SHEILA D

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St, Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

RHOADES, RALPH

Attorney at PARTON SELL

750 Lindaro Street, Suite 140

San Rafael, CA 94901

GILBERT, PETER RAY

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 946103614

LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

Attorney at STEEFEL, LEVITT & WEISS

1 Embarcadero Center, 30Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

VOGL, DAVID ROBERT

Attorney at VOGL AND MEREDITH

456 Montgomery St., 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

BRUNI, CHRISTOPHE B.

Attorney at SINUNU BRUNI,LLP

333 Pine Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

DITTOE, JOHN EDWARD

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 941053659

MROZ, SCOTT DAVID

Attorney at SEDGWICK LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

CATALDO, LORI A.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

HUGHES, DAVID WILLIAM

Attorney at LAUGHLIN, FALBO, LEVY & MORESI LLP

555 12Th Street, Suite 1900

Oakland, CA 94607

AMEELE, KEITH M.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

71 Stevenson St., 2Oth Flr

Sf, CA 941052981

26 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

amendment to complaint

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17442139) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC.

(partial) Request for Dismissal as to Nissan North America, Inc. only from 3rd Cause of Action and Punitive Damages only

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FROM THE THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION(TRANSACTION ID # 17484920) AS TO DEFENDANT NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Insulation Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22103385) FILED BY DEFENDANT INSULATION SPECIALTIES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.S OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL

DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.S OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 22279531) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

DECLARATION OF DAVID R. DONADIO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF OF DAVID R. DONADIO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22946521) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HALL, DIANE , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED MCEUIN, JAMES ALLEN ,AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED FROMM, LORI ,AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED TAYLOR, EDWARD , AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED

Defendant ACCO Engineered Systems, Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Survival, Wrongful Death - Asbestos

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23781701) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE ON ANSWER (TRANSACTION ID # 24385688) FILED BY DEFENDANT SWINERTON BUILDERS

DEFENDANT CAL-STEAM SUPPLY COMPANY ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25415765) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAL-STEAM SUPPLY COMPANY

DEFENDANT D.W. NICHOLSON CORPORATION?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH, PREMISES OWNER-CONTRACTOR LIABILITY AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL ? ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28453105) FILED BY DEFENDANT D.W. NICHOLSON CORPORATION

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT?S TRUE NAME FOR DOES 47 AND 1038

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOES 47 AND 1038 (TRANSACTION ID # 29944059) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HALL, DIANE , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED MCEUIN, JAMES ALLEN ,AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED FROMM, LORI ,AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED TAYLOR, EDWARD , AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED MCEUIN, JAMES ALLEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED HALL, DIANE AS LEGAL HEIR OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED (Fee:40.00)

DECLARATION OF BRENDAN D. WAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION

DECLARATION OF BRENDAN D. WAY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 31080347) FILED BY DEFENDANT TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT F.W. SPENCER & SON, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 34873848) FILED BY DEFENDANT F.W. SPENCER & SON, INC.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant FDCC California, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(TRANSACTION ID # 34877684) FILED BY DEFENDANT FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.

Ex B To DECLARATION OF KARIN KRATTLI SALAMEH IN SUPPORT OF SCOTT TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF EX B TO DECLARATION OF KARIN KRATTLI SALAMEH IN SUPPORT OF SCOTT TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 34901334) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

DEFENDANT ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANYS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOSUM (TRANSACTION ID # 34934619) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35507187) AS TO DEFENDANT BALLIET BROS. CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL [James Allen McEuin v. Asbestos Defendants (BP)]

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35572706) AS TO DEFENDANT AMERIGAS PROPANE, L.P.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY LEXIS-NEXIS E-SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY LEXIS-NEXIS E-SERVICE OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 36023587) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FROMM, LORI ,AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED TAYLOR, EDWARD , AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED MCEUIN, JAMES ALLEN AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED HALL, DIANE AS LEGAL HEIR OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED

372 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2017
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Dec-01-2017 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-07-2017. OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61206387)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Dec-01-2016 Continued To Dec-07-17 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-01-2016 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-07-2017 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. MICHAEL LEVINSON APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: GARRETT WONG; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-03-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-01-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, KIMBERLY CHU. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Dec-03-2015 Continued To Dec-01-16 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-04-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-03-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. GIL PURCELL APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Jun-04-2015 Continued To Dec-03-15 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-04-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
514 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17442139) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $335; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B7407B26F008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17337859) FILED BY DEFENDANT RILEY POWER, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS BABCOCK BORSIG POWER, INC.; DB RILEY, INC.; RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, BADENHAUSEN; UNION IRON WORKS; AND UNION IRON WORKS OF SPOKANE, WA (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2007
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $335; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5207B16F008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17093583) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAL-STEAM SUPPLY COMPANY (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DIANE HALL UNDER C.C.P. ?? 377.32 (TRANSACTION ID # 16585584) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HALL, DIANE , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED MCEUIN, JAMES ALLEN ,AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED FROMM, LORI ,AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED TAYLOR, EDWARD , AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2007
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF HALL, DIANE , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED MCEUIN, JAMES ALLEN ,AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED FROMM, LORI ,AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED TAYLOR, EDWARD , AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2007
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $335; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W3207822F017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HALL, DIANE , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED MCEUIN, JAMES ALLEN ,AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED FROMM, LORI ,AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED TAYLOR, EDWARD , AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JAMES ARNOLD MCEUIN, DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-21-2008 (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less