This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 21:40:12 (UTC).

DESIREE PETTAS et al VS. ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2007 DESIREE PETTAS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4246

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETTAS, NATHANIEL A MINOR, AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JERMY PETTAS, DECEASED.

Defendants

SQUARE D COMPANY

SUPERIOR BOILER WORKS, INC.

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.,FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL,INC. SII TO THE BENDIX CORP.

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

ERICSSON INC.

CONSOLIDATED ELECTRICAL DISTRIBUTORS, INC.

OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.

COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC, F/K/A COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO CROUSE-HINDS COMPANY

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY,INC.

ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.

AMERICAN STANDARD INC.

CLAYTON INDUSTRIES

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

DOES 1-820

CSK AUTO, INC.

GENERAL CABLE CORPORATION, ERRONEOUSLY NAMED HERIN AS GENERAL CABLE INDUSTIRS, INC.

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANLEY, DEAN A

Attorney at PAUL HANLEY & HARLEY LLP

1608 Fourth Street, Suite 300

Berkeley, CA 94710

Defendant Attorneys

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street,, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

TOBIAS, PAUL B.

Attorney at LINER YANKELEVITZ SUNSHINE & REGENSTREIF LLP

199 Fremont Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2255

CLAPP, JAMES BRENNAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JAMES B. CLAPP

1611 Telegraph Avenue, Suite 310

Oakland, CA 94612

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

Attorney at STEVENS DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

1910 Olympic Blvd #250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KEELE, CHRISTOPHER A.

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St., Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

Other Attorneys

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROWLAND, JOHN ARTHUR

Attorney at ROPERS, MAJESKI, KOHN & BENTLEY

201 Spear St Ste 1000

San Francisco, CA 94105

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

SCHRADER, DANIEL P

Attorney at FISCHER, NORRIS & SCHRADER, LLP

5 Harris Court Bldg. N, Ste. 2

Monterey, CA 93940

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

71 Stevenson St., 2Oth Flr

Sf, CA 94105-2981

GAMBINO, MARY ELLEN

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94105

VASQUEZ, MICHAEL ANTHONY

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth Street, Ste. 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

12 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15887744) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JEREMY PETTAS, DECEASED PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF DYLAN PETTAS, A MINOR PETTAS, NATHANIEL A MINOR, AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JERMY PETTAS, DECEASED. PETTAS, DESIREE AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR NATHANIEL PETTAS, MINOR (Fee:40.00)

DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL - WRONGFUL DEATH AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16236704) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CSK AUTO, INC.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16365357) FILED BY DEFENDANT CSK AUTO, INC. (Fee:335.00)

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 16379927) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT (TRANSACTION ID # 16379927) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16495106) FILED BY DEFENDANT OAKFABCO, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Rockwell Automation, Inc.s Substitution of Attorney

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 18237042): NELSON, EVAN CRAIG SUBSTITUTED FOR KEELE, CHRISTOPHER A. AS ATTORNEY FOR ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 18455649) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal, without prejudice, as to the defendant Asbestos Corporation, Ltd., only. Each party to bear its own costs.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32708782) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD

DECLARATION OF JON R. NUEMANN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF JON R. NUEMANN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15887744) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JEREMY PETTAS, DECEASED PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF DYLAN PETTAS, A MINOR PETTAS, NATHANIEL A MINOR, AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JERMY PETTAS, DECEASED. PETTAS, DESIREE AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR NATHANIEL PETTAS, MINOR

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16127450) FILED BY DEFENDANT ERICSSON INC.

Def. CLAYTON INDUSTRIES Demand for Trial by Jury and Estimate of Length of Time.

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TIME. (TRANSACTION ID # 16370072) FILED BY DEFENDANT CLAYTON INDUSTRIES

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16377828) FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, F/K/A GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16382481) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

Def. ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, formerly known as ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.s Objection to Stipulation of Hearing by Commissioner.

DEF. ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, FORMERLY KNOWN AS ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.S OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 16465754) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, FORMERLY KNOWN AS ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.,

OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 16560086) FILED BY DEFENDANT SUPERIOR BOILER WORKS, INC.

Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.s Answer to Complaint for Survival-Wrongful Death and Loss of Consortium-Asbestos; Notice of Request for Jury Trial

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16655383) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC. (Fee:335.00)

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANYS DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16908411) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 32907890) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32708782) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2008
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-18-2008. JUDGE: A.J. ROBERTSON; CLERK: DLOK/EBURA; REPORTER: SUSAN LEE CSR# 4280 (D206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 18455649) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT ; ENTIRE ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 18375398)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATED OFFICE OF LAW FIRM, FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (TRANSACTION ID # 18289742)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 18237042): NELSON, EVAN CRAIG SUBSTITUTED FOR KEELE, CHRISTOPHER A. AS ATTORNEY FOR ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • KENTILES OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16955791) FILED BY DEFENDANT KENTILE FLOORS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16908411) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION OF OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16882467) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JON R. NUEMANN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15887744) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JEREMY PETTAS, DECEASED PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF DYLAN PETTAS, A MINOR PETTAS, NATHANIEL A MINOR, AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JERMY PETTAS, DECEASED. PETTAS, DESIREE AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR NATHANIEL PETTAS, MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15887744) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JEREMY PETTAS, DECEASED PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF DYLAN PETTAS, A MINOR PETTAS, NATHANIEL A MINOR, AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JERMY PETTAS, DECEASED. PETTAS, DESIREE AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR NATHANIEL PETTAS, MINOR (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JEREMY PETTAS, DECEASED PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF DYLAN PETTAS, A MINOR PETTAS, NATHANIEL A MINOR, AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JERMY PETTAS, DECEASED. PETTAS, DESIREE AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR NATHANIEL PETTAS, MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY PLAINTIFF PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF DYLAN PETTAS, A MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY PLAINTIFF PETTAS, DESIREE AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR NATHANIEL PETTAS, MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • FEE PAID ON EX PARTE APPL & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL (NATHANIEL PETTAS) (TRANSACTION ID # 15534283) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JEREMY PETTAS, DECEASED (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • FEE PAID ON EX PARTE APPL & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL (DYLAN PETTAS) (TRANSACTION ID # 15534283) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF DYLAN PETTAS, A MINOR (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JEREMY PETTAS, DECEASED PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF DYLAN PETTAS, A MINOR PETTAS, NATHANIEL A MINOR, AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JERMY PETTAS, DECEASED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JEREMY PETTAS, DECEASED PETTAS, DESIREE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF DYLAN PETTAS, A MINOR PETTAS, NATHANIEL A MINOR, AS LEGAL HEIRS OF JERMY PETTAS, DECEASED. AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-820 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-18-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less