This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/15/2016 at 14:51:07 (UTC).

DEREK BENHAM VS. NORMAN A. BARNES ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/10/2015 DEREK BENHAM filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against NORMAN A BARNES. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4627

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENHAM, DEREK

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BARNES, NORMAN A. , AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

EVERETT, KENNETH , AN INDIVIDUAL

S.N. BARNES, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

SEILER LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNER SHIP

SN BARNES MANAGEMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SNB DEVELOPMENT HOLDINGS, LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SNB FINANCE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SNB TRACY LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SOUTH PARCEL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TG SPE 1 LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SN BARNES MANAGEMENT, LLC

SEILER LLP

SNB FINANCE HOLDINGS, LLC

TG SPE 1 LLC

SNB DEVELOPMENT HOLDINGS, LLC

PURPLE WINE COMPANY, LLC

SONOMA WINE COMPANY, LLC

PURPLE WINE PRODUCTION, INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

EVERETT, KENNETH , AN INDIVIDUAL

SEILER LLP

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNUDSEN, KIT L

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MARSHALL, DOUGLAS ANTON

FIFE, PAUL DAVID

PEARSON, ARTHUR VERN

COMMINS, DAVID HARALD

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FIFE, PAUL DAVID

PEARSON, ARTHUR VERN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK AS TO DEFENDANT BARNES, NORMAN A. , AN INDIVIDUAL SNB FINANCE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SNB DEVELOPMENT HOLDINGS, LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SN BARNES MANAGEMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY S.N. BARNES, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP SNB TRACY LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY TG SPE 1 LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SOUTH PARCEL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SEILER LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNER SHIP EVERETT, KENNETH , AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-12-2015 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-11-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-20-2015 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-11-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT EVERETT, KENNETH , AN INDIVIDUAL

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-12-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SEILER LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNER SHIP

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-12-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SNB FINANCE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-12-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT S.N. BARNES, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-12-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SOUTH PARCEL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-12-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SNB DEVELOPMENT HOLDINGS, LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-12-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SN BARNES MANAGEMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Cross-Complaint for Equitable Indemnity and Contribution

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58394383) FILED PER ORDER BY CROSS COMPLAINANT SEILER LLP AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE PURPLE WINE COMPANY, LLC PURPLE WINE SERVICES, INC. SONOMA WINE COMPANY, LLC PURPLE WINE PRODUCTION COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT EVERETT, KENNETH , AN INDIVIDUAL

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT SEILER LLP

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 58419440) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT EVERETT, KENNETH , AN INDIVIDUAL

Answer to Seiler LLP Cross-Complaint

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58552683) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT PURPLE WINE COMPANY, LLC SONOMA WINE COMPANY, LLC PURPLE WINE PRODUCTION, INC. (Fee:1350.00)

Answer to Kenneth Everett Cross-Complaint

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58552720) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT PURPLE WINE COMPANY, LLC SONOMA WINE COMPANY, LLC PURPLE WINE PRODUCTION, INC.

Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APR-21-2016 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPT. 212 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER MICHAEL MAU.

Notice of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APR-21-2016 IS RESCHEDULED TO MAY-03-2016 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 210. THIS MATTER IS ALSO REASSIGNED FOR CONFERENCE PURPOSES TO CONFERENCE OFFICER ARNOLD LEVINSON.

Notice of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-03-2016 IS RESCHEDULED TO MAY-04-2016 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 210 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER ARNOLD LEVINSON.

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/14/2016
View Court Documents

DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-03-2016 IS RESCHEDULED TO MAY-04-2016 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 210 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER ARNOLD LEVINSON.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2016

DocketJURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 58854925) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK (Fee:150.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2016
View Court Documents

DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APR-21-2016 IS RESCHEDULED TO MAY-03-2016 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 210. THIS MATTER IS ALSO REASSIGNED FOR CONFERENCE PURPOSES TO CONFERENCE OFFICER ARNOLD LEVINSON.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2016
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APR-21-2016 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPT. 212 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER MICHAEL MAU.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2016
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58552720) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT PURPLE WINE COMPANY, LLC SONOMA WINE COMPANY, LLC PURPLE WINE PRODUCTION, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2016
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58552683) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT PURPLE WINE COMPANY, LLC SONOMA WINE COMPANY, LLC PURPLE WINE PRODUCTION, INC. (Fee:1350.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2016
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 58419440) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT EVERETT, KENNETH , AN INDIVIDUAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2016
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT SEILER LLP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2016
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT EVERETT, KENNETH , AN INDIVIDUAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2016
View Court Documents

DocketCROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58394383) FILED PER ORDER BY CROSS COMPLAINANT SEILER LLP AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE PURPLE WINE COMPANY, LLC PURPLE WINE SERVICES, INC. SONOMA WINE COMPANY, LLC PURPLE WINE PRODUCTION COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
62 More Docket Entries
03/13/2015
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-12-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SNB TRACY LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2015
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-12-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SN BARNES MANAGEMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2015
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-12-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SNB DEVELOPMENT HOLDINGS, LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2015
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-12-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SOUTH PARCEL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2015
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-12-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT S.N. BARNES, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2015
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-12-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SNB FINANCE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2015
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-12-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SEILER LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNER SHIP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2015
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56919790), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK SERVED MAR-11-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT EVERETT, KENNETH , AN INDIVIDUAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2015
View Court Documents

DocketFRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENHAM, DEREK AS TO DEFENDANT BARNES, NORMAN A. , AN INDIVIDUAL SNB FINANCE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SNB DEVELOPMENT HOLDINGS, LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SN BARNES MANAGEMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY S.N. BARNES, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP SNB TRACY LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY TG SPE 1 LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SOUTH PARCEL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SEILER LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNER SHIP EVERETT, KENNETH , AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-12-2015 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-11-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-20-2015 (Fee:450.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4627
Case Title:DEREK BENHAM VS. NORMAN A. BARNES ET AL
Court Date:JAN-05-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of And Motion For Leave To File Cross-Complaint
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, January 5, 2016, Line 14, DEFENDANT KENNETH EVERETT'S Motion For Leave To File Cross-ComplaintOff calendar. Improper service. =302/eg


Case Number:*******4627
Case Title:DEREK BENHAM VS. NORMAN A. BARNES ET AL
Court Date:DEC-29-2015 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiff Notice Of Motion To Compel Discovery Responses From Defendants Norman A. Barnes, South Parcel Partners And Sn Barnes
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, December 29, 2015, Line 4, PLAINTIFF DEREK BENHAM'S Motion To Compel Discovery Responses From Defendants Norman A. Barnes, South Parcel Partners And SN Barnes.Pro Tem Judge Steven B. Stein, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Motion to compel discovery responses is granted. The three defendants shall serve code complaint responses to all outstanding discovery within twenty days from the date of service of this Order with Notice of Entry. Sanctions are awarded against the three defendants in the sum of $1,790.00 to be paid within said twenty days.Any party who contests this tentative ruling must send an email to sbs@knoxricksen.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm the court day prior to the hearing stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem Judge hearing the motion and the Pro Tem Judge will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. =(302/JPT)