Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/25/2021 at 02:05:25 (UTC).

DEPARTEMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK VS. SEYDI Y LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 DEPARTEMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEYDI Y LOPEZ. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1011

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

LOPEZ, SEYDI Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERRILL, DONALD

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES ATTORNEYS AT LAW

7017 Realm Dr.

San Jose, CA 95119

Defendant Attorney

JACOBS, LYNDA

Attorney at AMERICAN DEBT LAW

2522 Chambers Road, Suite 100

Tustin, CA 92780

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; PROOF OF SERVICE. (TRANSACTION ID # 100131914) FILED BY DEFENDANT LOPEZ, SEYDI Y

Answer

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100131914) FILED BY DEFENDANT LOPEZ, SEYDI Y

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200030858), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK SERVED MAY-18-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT LOPEZ, SEYDI Y

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 66510778) TO PLAINTIFF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Civil Case Cover Sheet

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (TRANSACTION ID # 66510778) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Complaint - Contract

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66510778) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK AS TO DEFENDANT LOPEZ, SEYDI Y NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-12-2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialPayment : FIRST PAPER RESPONSE/PLEADING $2,500 - $10,000; Amount : $225; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W2221521F047

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; PROOF OF SERVICE. (TRANSACTION ID # 100131914) FILED BY DEFENDANT LOPEZ, SEYDI Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100131914) FILED BY DEFENDANT LOPEZ, SEYDI Y (Fee:$225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200030858), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK SERVED MAY-18-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT LOPEZ, SEYDI Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 66510778) TO PLAINTIFF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • FinancialPayment : COMPLAINT/PETITION/FIRST PAPER; Amount : $225; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : C5021423F007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (TRANSACTION ID # 66510778) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66510778) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK AS TO DEFENDANT LOPEZ, SEYDI Y NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-12-2021 (Fee:$225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBS, LYNDA