This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/20/2018 at 12:00:38 (UTC).

DENNIS SONG VS. MICHAEL RABBITT

Case Summary

On 05/24/2016 DENNIS SONG filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL RABBITT. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN, JOHN K. STEWART, TERI L. JACKSON, RICHARD B. ULMER and SUZANNE R. BOLANOS. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2210

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

JOHN K. STEWART

TERI L. JACKSON

RICHARD B. ULMER

SUZANNE R. BOLANOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SONG, DENNIS

LIN-SONG, DORIS

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

H.J. RABBITT & SONS INC. AKA HENRY J. RABBITT & SONS INC.

MULLIGAN, MARGARET

RABBITT, MICHAEL

EARTH MECHANICS INC.

THYSSEN KRUPP

AMPLEX ELECTRICAL

PENINSULA DRYWALL

AUS DECKING, INC.

SANTOS AND URRUTIA STRUCTURAL ENGINEERS INC.

SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS

WHITEHEAD, PHILIP DBA P. WHITEHEAD AND ASSOCIATES CONSULTING ENGINEERS (FORMERLY ROE 13)

671 Rockdale Drive

San Francisco, CA 94127

CAUSOR & SONS, INC. DBA PENINSULA DRYWALL

MOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

DOUBLE-D ENGINEERING, INC.

DOES 1 - 10

SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.

EARTH MECHANICS CONSULTING ENGINEERS

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTHY, KEVIN PATRICK

Attorney at OLES MORRISON RINKER & BAKER LLP

492 Ninth St Ste 220

Oakland, CA 94607

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHELEY, LLOYD THEODORE

Attorney at CLAPP, MORONEY, VUCINICH, BEEMAN AND SCHELEY

1111 Bayhill Drive, Suite 300

San Bruno, CA 94066

CROWLEY, DANIEL FRANCIS

Attorney at DANIEL CROWLEY & ASSOCIATES

3558 Round Barn Blvd., Suite 201

Santa Rosa, CA 95403

MILLER, MICHAEL CHARLES

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL C.MILLER

530 Oak Grove Ave.,Ste 106

Menlo Park, CA 94025

KENNEDY, KEVIN P.

Attorney at KENNEDY & SOUZA, APC

1230 Columbia Street, Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101

SHAPIRO, MEGAN A.

Attorney at RADOSLOVICH SHAPIRO, PC

701 Univeristy Avenue, Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

MAKASIAN, ROSS B.

Attorney at MAKASIAN LAW, P.C.

1979 Oak Street, #1

San Francisco, CA 94117

SACKS, STEVEN M.

Attorney at STEVEN SACKS LAW

1112 De Haro Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

GUNN, BRIAN H.

Attorney at WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

2175 N California Blvd Ste 645

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

O'BRIEN, PATRICK K

Attorney at O'BRIEN & ASSOCIATES

755 Baywood Drive, Suite 185

Petaluma, CA 94954

MCELROY, JULIE D

Attorney at JACOBSEN & MCELROY

2401 American River Drive, Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

Other Attorneys

CUSTER, CHARLES STEPHEN

Attorney at GORDON & REES, LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Batter Streetm Ste,2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

CATALANOTTI, PETER C.

Attorney at FREEMAN, MATHIS & GARY, LLP

44 Montgomery St., Ste 2080

San Francisco, CA 94104

HARRIS, DAVID ANDREW

Attorney at SANTANA, VIERRA & SYMONDS

71 Stevenson Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

CARROLL, BRYCE

Attorney at GORDON & REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI LLP

275 Battery St, Ste 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Rabbitt Request for Dismissal as to First Amended Cross-Complaint

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY RABBITT, MICHAEL, MULLIGAN, MARGARET, H.J. RABBITT & SONS INC. AKA HENRY J. RABBITT & EACH PARTY TO BEAR OWN FEES AND COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 62617028)

Stipulation and Proposed Order for Determination That The Settlement B

STIPULATION FOR DETERMINATION THAT THE SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS DENNIS SONG AND DORIS LIN-SONG AND CROSS-DEFENDANT KEVIN BURKE TILE IS IN GOOD FAITH PER CCP877.6 (TRANSACTION ID # 62281858) FILED BY SONG, DENNIS LIN-SONG, DORIS

Rabbitts First ROE Amendment to First Amended Cross Complaint (PENINSU

AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT PER ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 62178283) CROSS DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS ROE 1 TO BE PENINSULA DRYWALL

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Cross-defendant Sur

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 62032094) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.

Substitution of Attorney

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 62008248): MAKASIAN, ROSS B. SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR WHITEHEAD, PHILIP DBA P. WHITEHEAD AND ASSOCIATES CONSULTING ENGINEERS (FORMERLY ROE 13)

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA FILE AND SERVEXPRESS OF CROSS-DEFENDANT SURE ROOF

PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE VIA FILE AND SERVEXPRESS OF CROSS-DEFENDANT SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 61993915) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.

DECLARATION OF PATRICK K. OBRIEN IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT SURE RO

DECLARATION OF PATRICK K. OBRIEN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE BASED ON STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 61987485) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.

Notice of Entry of Order on Plaintiffs Motion for Good Faith Settlemen

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION (TRANSACTION ID # 61981130) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SONG, DENNIS LIN-SONG, DORIS

Declaration of Liam K. Malone ISO Motion for Good Faith Settlement Det

DECLARATION OF LIAM K. MALONE ISO MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION / NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF COURT REPORTER'S FEE (TRANSACTION ID # 61943684) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SONG, DENNIS LIN-SONG, DORIS

Declaration of Caleb W Mariani in Support of Reply to Causor and Sons

DECLARATION OF CALEB W MARIANI IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO CAUSOR AND SONS INC DBA PENINSULA DRYWALL OPPOSITION TO RABBITTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61924255) FILED BY DEFENDANT RABBITT, MICHAEL MULLIGAN, MARGARET H.J. RABBITT & SONS INC. AKA HENRY J. RABBITT & SONS INC.

Reply to Donald T David dba Double-D Engineering Opposition to Rabbitt

REPLY TO DONALD T DAVID DBA DOUBLE-D ENGINEERING OPPOSITION TO RABBITTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61924255) FILED BY DEFENDANT RABBITT, MICHAEL MULLIGAN, MARGARET H.J. RABBITT & SONS INC. AKA HENRY J. RABBITT & SONS INC.

Declaration of Leyla Razavi

DECLARATION OF LEYLA RAZAVI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PHILIP WHITEHEAD DBA P. WHITEHEAD AND ASSOCIATES CONSULTING ENGINEERS MOTION TO STRIKE THE CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60938711) FILED BY DEFENDANT RABBITT, MICHAEL MULLIGAN, MARGARET H.J. RABBITT & SONS INC. AKA HENRY J. RABBITT & SONS INC.

Answer of Sure Roofing Systems, Inc. to Cross-Complaint of Michael Rab

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100016058) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SURE ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60389678) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CAUSOR & SONS, INC. DBA PENINSULA DRYWALL

Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order to Vacate Trial Date or in Al

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO VACATE TRIAL DATE OR IN ALTERNATIVE TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE/ NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 60243646) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT RABBITT, MICHAEL MULLIGAN, MARGARET H.J. RABBITT & SONS INC. AKA HENRY J. RABBITT & SONS INC.

Request for Dismissal - as to Earth Mechanics Inc. (ROE 8)

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY RABBITT, MICHAEL, MULLIGAN, MARGARET, H.J. RABBITT & SONS INC. AKA HENRY J. RABBITT & (TRANSACTION ID # 60156663)(ROE 8) EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN FEES AND COSTS. AS TO DEFENDANT EARTH MECHANICS INC.

Proof of Service of Summons - Kevin Burke Tile (ROE 3)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 60116746), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT RABBITT, MICHAEL MULLIGAN, MARGARET H.J. RABBITT & SONS INC. AKA HENRY J. RABBITT & SONS INC. SERVED JAN-13-2017, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT KEVIN BURKE TILE

Plaintiffs Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 59684504) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SONG, DENNIS LIN-SONG, DORIS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

196 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1418907C001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Payment : EX PARTE MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B4918905E001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W1518731F002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B4918709S004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B5218705S014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B5218622M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : Y0118515M007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4918509J005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1418507M017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W1618504M002

    Read MoreRead Less
254 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 59684504) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SONG, DENNIS LIN-SONG, DORIS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AND STIPULATION OF REFERENCE TO SPECIAL MASTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON X-COMPLAINT TO CROSS COMPLAINANT RABBITT, MICHAEL MULLIGAN, MARGARET H.J. RABBITT & SONS INC. AKA HENRY J. RABBITT & SONS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59427047) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT RABBITT, MICHAEL MULLIGAN, MARGARET H.J. RABBITT & SONS INC. AKA HENRY J. RABBITT & SONS INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ROES 1 - 100, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59427047) FILED BY DEFENDANT RABBITT, MICHAEL MULLIGAN, MARGARET H.J. RABBITT & SONS INC. AKA HENRY J. RABBITT & SONS INC. (Fee:$1350.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100021924), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SONG, DENNIS LIN-SONG, DORIS SERVED JUN-07-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT H.J. RABBITT & SONS INC. AKA HENRY J. RABBITT & SONS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100021924), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SONG, DENNIS LIN-SONG, DORIS SERVED JUN-03-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MULLIGAN, MARGARET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100021924), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SONG, DENNIS LIN-SONG, DORIS SERVED JUN-07-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RABBITT, MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SONG, DENNIS LIN-SONG, DORIS AS TO DEFENDANT RABBITT, MICHAEL MULLIGAN, MARGARET H.J. RABBITT & SONS INC. AKA HENRY J. RABBITT & SONS INC. DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-26-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-25-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-03-2016 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUS Decking Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUSTER, CHARLES S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS, DAVID A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CATALANOTTI PETER C.