Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:53:24 (UTC).

DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS. LUIS RUBEN HERRERA

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUIS RUBEN HERRERA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3087

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

171 Constitution Dr

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Defendant

HERRERA, LUIS RUBEN

San Francisco, CA 94080

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (FEE FOR SERVICE:$55.00) SERVED FEB-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT HERRERA, LUIS RUBEN

Small Claims Order of Dismissal of Entire Action L.R. 18.0

THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, PER PLAINTIFF. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY CLAUDIA BARDALES--LEGAL SERVICES SUPERVISOR. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $817.24 FILED BY DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. AS TO DEFENDANT HERRERA, LUIS RUBEN ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-19-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:100.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2013
  • RETURN MAIL - SMALL CLAIMS ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION- SENT TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, PER PLAINTIFF. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY CLAUDIA BARDALES--LEGAL SERVICES SUPERVISOR. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (FEE FOR SERVICE:$55.00) SERVED FEB-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT HERRERA, LUIS RUBEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $817.24 FILED BY DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. AS TO DEFENDANT HERRERA, LUIS RUBEN ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-19-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:100.00)

    Read MoreRead Less