Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:53:17 (UTC).

DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS. EDIBERTO HERNANDEZ VAZQUEZ

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDIBERTO HERNANDEZ VAZQUEZ. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3085

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

171 Constitution Dr.

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Defendant

VAZQUEZ, EDIBERTO HERNANDEZ

San Francisco, CA 94110

 

Court Documents

Small Claims - Continue Order

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-19-2013 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF TO MAY-28-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 506. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY CLAUDIA BARDALES--LEGAL SERVICES SUPERVISOR. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $661.03 FILED BY DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. AS TO DEFENDANT VAZQUEZ, EDIBERTO HERNANDEZ ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-19-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:100.00)

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (FEE FOR SERVICE:$55.00) SERVED FEB-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT VAZQUEZ, EDIBERTO HERNANDEZ

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT VAZQUEZ, EDIBERTO HERNANDEZ $661.03 PRINCIPAL, $85.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $746.03 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT VAZQUEZ, EDIBERTO HERNANDEZ $661.03 PRINCIPAL, $85.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $746.03 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAY-28-2013 - JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF MAY-28-2013 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF MAY-28-2013 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY LENIA ROGRIGUEZ--LEGAL ASSISANT/COLLECTION DEPT. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-19-2013 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF TO MAY-28-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 506. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY CLAUDIA BARDALES--LEGAL SERVICES SUPERVISOR. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (FEE FOR SERVICE:$55.00) SERVED FEB-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT VAZQUEZ, EDIBERTO HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $661.03 FILED BY DELAWARE PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. AS TO DEFENDANT VAZQUEZ, EDIBERTO HERNANDEZ ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-19-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:100.00)

    Read MoreRead Less