Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:53:04 (UTC).

DELAWARE PROGESS FINANCIAL COPR. VS. CECILIA JIMENEZ VAZQUEZ

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 DELAWARE PROGESS FINANCIAL COPR filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against CECILIA JIMENEZ VAZQUEZ. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3082

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELAWARE PROGESS FINANCIAL COPR.

171 Constitution Dr.

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Defendant

VAZQUEZ, CECILIA JIMENEZ

San Francisco, CA 94130

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (FEE FOR SERVICE:$55.00) SERVED FEB-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT VAZQUEZ, CECILIA JIMENEZ

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $1,007.07 FILED BY DELAWARE PROGESS FINANCIAL COPR. AS TO DEFENDANT VAZQUEZ, CECILIA JIMENEZ ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-19-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:100.00)

Small Claims - Continue Order

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-19-2013 - CONTINUED FOR PROGRESS REPORT TO AUG-13-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 506. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

Small Claims Order of Dismissal of Entire Action

THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, PER PLAINTIFF. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY LENIA RODRIGUEZ-LEGAL ASSISTANT/COLLECTION DEPT. PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: QUEENA C. HO. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

Small Claims - Continue Order

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF AUG-13-2013 - CONTINUED FOR PROGRESS REPORT TO NOV-20-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 506. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY CLAUDIA BARDALES--LEGAL SERVICES SUPERVISOR. PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: DAVID LAVINE. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE, PER PLAINTIFF. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY LENIA RODRIGUEZ-LEGAL ASSISTANT/COLLECTION DEPT. PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: QUEENA C. HO. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DELAWARE PROGESS FINANCIAL COPR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF AUG-13-2013 - CONTINUED FOR PROGRESS REPORT TO NOV-20-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 506. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY CLAUDIA BARDALES--LEGAL SERVICES SUPERVISOR. PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: DAVID LAVINE. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DELAWARE PROGESS FINANCIAL COPR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-19-2013 - CONTINUED FOR PROGRESS REPORT TO AUG-13-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 506. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DELAWARE PROGESS FINANCIAL COPR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (FEE FOR SERVICE:$55.00) SERVED FEB-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT VAZQUEZ, CECILIA JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $1,007.07 FILED BY DELAWARE PROGESS FINANCIAL COPR. AS TO DEFENDANT VAZQUEZ, CECILIA JIMENEZ ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-19-2013 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:100.00)

    Read MoreRead Less