This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 18:26:51 (UTC).

DEBORA SILVERMAN VS. MURPHY SAN FRANCISCO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2012 DEBORA SILVERMAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MURPHY SAN FRANCISCO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1405

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVERMAN, DEBORA

Defendants

DOES 1 THRU 50, INCL

MURPHY INVESTMENTS, INC

MURPHY SAN FRANCISCO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

MURPHY, DENIS T.

MURPHY, BART

DOES 1 THRU 50, INCL.

MURPHY INVESTMENTS, INC.

MURPHY, BARTHOLOMEW (INCORRECTLY SUED AS BART MURPHY)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIFSCHITZ, ERIC

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ERIC L. LIFSCHITZ

345 Franklin Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

ALIOTO, JOSEPHINE

Attorney at ALIOTO & KEENAN

201 Spear St Ste 1100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorneys

WASSERMAN, DAVID

Attorney at WASSERMAN-STERN

2960 Van Ness Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94109-1020

FRANKLIN, BRIAN WILLAIM

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St Ste 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (DENYING DEF'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA

MOTIONS IN LIMINE

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PRIOR BAD ACTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF AARON H. DARSKY IN SUPPORT OF PLTF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF MARC WILSON FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA

MINUTES FOR AUG-14-2013 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR AUG-14-2013 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR SEP-26-2013 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR SEP-26-2013 9:00 AM

JUDGMENT ON VERDICT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ON VERDICT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MURPHY SAN FRANCISCO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP MURPHY INVESTMENTS, INC. MURPHY, BARTHOLOMEW (INCORRECTLY SUED AS BART MURPHY) $1,195.00 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,195.00, SAID VERDICT ENTITLED PLAINTIFF TO JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS ON COUNT 13 (BREACH OF STATUTORY DUTY UNDER CCP SEC. 1950.5 IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,195.00. THIS JUDGMENT MAY BE AMENDED TO INCLUDE AWARDS, IF ANY, OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS RESULTING FROM POST JUDGMENT PROCEEDINGS. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

ORDER

ORDER ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT (DOUGLASS-D608)

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA AS TO DEFENDANT MURPHY SAN FRANCISCO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP MURPHY INVESTMENTS, INC. MURPHY, BARTHOLOMEW (INCORRECTLY SUED AS BART MURPHY)

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MURPHY, DENIS T.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT MURPHY SAN FRANCISCO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP MURPHY INVESTMENTS, INC. MURPHY, BARTHOLOMEW (INCORRECTLY SUED AS BART MURPHY) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 14.0 DAYS

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF BRIAN FRANKLIN IN SUPPORT OF MTN IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE SPECULATIVE EVIDENCE OF FINANCIAL HARM AND/OR LOST PROFITS FILED BY DEFENDANT MURPHY SAN FRANCISCO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP MURPHY INVESTMENTS, INC. MURPHY, BARTHOLOMEW (INCORRECTLY SUED AS BART MURPHY)

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 15-16 AND 18 FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF AARON H. DARSKY IN SUPPORT OF PLTF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

(PROPOSED) JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICES TO DEFENDANTS' MURPHY SAN FRANCISCO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, MURPHY INVESTMENTS, INC., AND BARTHOLOMEW MURPHY TO APPEAR AT TRIAL AND TO BRING DOCUMENTS FILED BY DEFENDANT MURPHY SAN FRANCISCO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP MURPHY INVESTMENTS, INC. MURPHY, BARTHOLOMEW (INCORRECTLY SUED AS BART MURPHY)

MINUTES FOR AUG-02-2013 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR AUG-02-2013 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR AUG-20-2013 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR AUG-20-2013 9:00 AM

186 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA AS TO DEFENDANT MURPHY SAN FRANCISCO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP MURPHY INVESTMENTS, INC. MURPHY, BARTHOLOMEW (INCORRECTLY SUED AS BART MURPHY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RE: MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX PLAINTIFF'S COSTS MEMORANDUM (DOUGLASS-D608)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON JAN-10-2014 IN DEPT. 608, NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE PLTF'S COSTS MEMORANDUM GRANTED, IN PART, PURSUANT TO WRITTEN ORDER. VJ WALLACE P. DOUGLASS, CLERK: V. MACK, REPORTER: KRISHANNA DERITA CSR 11945

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FOR JAN-10-2014 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES (DOUGLASS-D608)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS (DOUGLASS-D608)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DECLARATION OF BARTHOLOMEW MURPHY ISO MTN TO STRK PLTF'S COSTS MEMORANDUM FILED BY DEFENDANT MURPHY SAN FRANCISCO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP MURPHY INVESTMENTS, INC. MURPHY, BARTHOLOMEW (INCORRECTLY SUED AS BART MURPHY)

    Read MoreRead Less
444 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2012
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR DOE IDENTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MURPHY, DENIS T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-07-2012 CONTINUED TO JAN-09-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING APP FOR DOE ID FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR DOE IDENTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE MURPHY, DENIS T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FOR DOE 1; MEMO OF P & A AND DEC FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILVERMAN, DEBORA AS TO DEFENDANT MURPHY SAN FRANCISCO LIMITED PARTNERSHIP MURPHY INVESTMENTS, INC. DOES 1 THRU 50, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-07-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-06-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-23-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less