This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/12/2016 at 02:26:50 (UTC).

DAWN R. ROSS VS. REALOGY CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2012 DAWN R ROSS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against REALOGY CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3221

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSS, DAWN R.

Defendants

NRT LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

REALOGY CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NRT LLC

REALOGY GROUP LLC (F.K.A. REALOGY CORPORATION)

DOES 1 TO 20, INCL.

VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMAN, MICHAEL

Attorney at ARENA HOFFMAN LLP

44 Montgomery St, Ste 3520

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorney

MILLER, MICHELE BALLARD

Attorney at MILLER LAW GROUP, P.C.

111 Sutter Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSS, DAWN R. AS TO DEFENDANT REALOGY CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION NRT LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 20, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-16-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-15-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-02-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF ROSS, DAWN R.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSS, DAWN R. SERVED SEP-12-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSS, DAWN R. SERVED SEP-12-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NRT LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSS, DAWN R. SERVED SEP-17-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT REALOGY CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT REALOGY GROUP LLC (F.K.A. REALOGY CORPORATION) NRT LLC VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA, INC. (Fee:1350.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSS, DAWN R. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT REALOGY GROUP LLC (F.K.A. REALOGY CORPORATION) NRT LLC VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-15-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-16-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER RE TREATMENT AND USE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT REALOGY GROUP LLC (F.K.A. REALOGY CORPORATION) NRT LLC VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA, INC. (Fee:60.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT REALOGY GROUP LLC (F.K.A. REALOGY CORPORATION) NRT LLC VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

ORDER

ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY DEFENDANT REALOGY GROUP LLC (F.K.A. REALOGY CORPORATION) NRT LLC VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSS, DAWN R.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2013
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-18-2013 VACATED. DISMISSAL FILED ON 9/16/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT REALOGY GROUP LLC (F.K.A. REALOGY CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • CASE NOT ASSIGNED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • DISCOVERY 302, PLAINTIFF DAWN ROSS NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DOCUMENT REQUESTS, AND MOTION FOR AWARD OF SANCTIONS IS OFF CALENDAR PER MOVING PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSS, DAWN R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY DEFENDANT REALOGY GROUP LLC (F.K.A. REALOGY CORPORATION) NRT LLC VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-15-2013 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON NOV-18-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 PURSUANT TO STIPULATED EX PARTE ORDER FILED 7/3/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY REALOGY GROUP LLC (F.K.A. REALOGY CORPORATION) VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-15-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-16-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT REALOGY GROUP LLC (F.K.A. REALOGY CORPORATION) NRT LLC VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSS, DAWN R. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT REALOGY GROUP LLC (F.K.A. REALOGY CORPORATION) NRT LLC VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA, INC. (Fee:1350.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSS, DAWN R. SERVED SEP-17-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT REALOGY CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSS, DAWN R. SERVED SEP-12-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NRT LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSS, DAWN R. SERVED SEP-12-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF ROSS, DAWN R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSS, DAWN R. AS TO DEFENDANT REALOGY CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION NRT LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION VALLEY OF CALIFORNIA INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 20, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-16-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-15-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-02-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less