This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 02:03:55 (UTC).

DAVID STEVENS VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 DAVID STEVENS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2788

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVENS, DAVID

Defendants

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

PRESIDIO TRUST, A FEDERAL GOVERNMENT CORPORATION

UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, A FEDERAL AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KANG, SUSAN Y.

LAGOS, PANOS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68360711) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68360711) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-12-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-06-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-20-2023

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 68360711) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68360711) TO PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 68486995) FILED BY ATTORNEY LAGOS, PANOS

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100187247) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID SERVED JAN-06-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

POS SF MUNI

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100189102) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID SERVED JAN-10-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (Negligence COA)

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ONLY AS TO NEGLIGENCE CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (TRANSACTION ID # 100189444)

First Amended Complaint

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100192996) (TRANSACTION ID # 100192996) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, A FEDERAL AGENCY PRESIDIO TRUST, A FEDERAL GOVERNMENT CORPORATION

First Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet

FIRST AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (TRANSACTION ID # 100192996) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID

First Amended Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100192996) TO PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-12-2023 CONTINUED TO JUN-14-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

Proof of Service (Proof of Service)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210035110), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID SERVED APR-14-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, A FEDERAL AGENCY

Proof of Service (Proof of Service)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210035281) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID SERVED APR-14-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT PRESIDIO TRUST, A FEDERAL GOVERNMENT CORPORATION

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED MAY-02-2023, SERVED APR-12-2023 (TRANSACTION ID # 100198698) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED MAY-02-2023, SERVED APR-12-2023 (TRANSACTION ID # 100198698) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210035281) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID SERVED APR-14-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT PRESIDIO TRUST, A FEDERAL GOVERNMENT CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210035110), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID SERVED APR-14-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT UNITED STATES NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, A FEDERAL AGENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Mar-20-2023 Continued To Jun-14-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-12-2023 CONTINUED TO JUN-14-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2023
  • FinancialPayment: EX PARTE MOTION; Amount: $60; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C5423319E009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketFEE PAID ON AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT - DOE 1 (TRANSACTION ID # 100193685) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID; Fee: $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100192996) TO PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketFEE PAID FOR AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT - DOE 1 (TRANSACTION ID # 100189444) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID; Fee: $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100189102) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID SERVED JAN-10-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100187247) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID SERVED JAN-06-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 68486995) FILED BY ATTORNEY LAGOS, PANOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68360711) TO PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R4122B10F030

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 68360711) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68360711) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO MUNICIPAL TRANSPORTATION AGENCY DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-12-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-06-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-20-2023; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 68360711) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEVENS, DAVID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less