This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 16:44:32 (UTC).

DAVID D CANON VS. NORRIS DAN WALTER DELANY AKA DAN W. DELANY AKA et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2012 DAVID D CANON filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against NORRIS DAN WALTER DELANY AKA DAN W DELANY AKA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN K. STEWART, RONALD E. QUIDACHAY, CYNTHIA M. LEE, PETER J. BUSCH, MARLA J. MILLER and A. JAMES ROBERTSON II. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4741

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOHN K. STEWART

RONALD E. QUIDACHAY

CYNTHIA M. LEE

PETER J. BUSCH

MARLA J. MILLER

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

CANON, DAVID D

CANNON, DAVID D.

EHAB ABDULLA ELBATNIGI D/B/A E B CONSTRUCTION

HANSON, AIDEN

WILSON, JAMES

ROES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

COOK, JOSHUA

Defendants

NORRIS DAN WALTER DELANY AKA DAN W. DELANY AKA NORRIS W. DELANY

DELANY, DAN W.

Eureka, CA 95501

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

DELANY, DAN W

Eureka, CA 95501

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

DELANY, DAN W.

Eureka, CA 95501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

MCDONALD, STEVEN J.

Attorney at GREENSTEIN & MCDONALD

300 Montgomery Street, Suite 621

San Francisco, CA 94104

EBEY, AMANDA LOUISE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF AMANDA L. EBEY, P.C.

870 Market Street, Suite 782

San Francisco, CA 94102

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

CLAPP, FRITZ-HOWA R

P.O.Box 2517

Beverly Hills, CA 90213

GAMINO, GUADALUPE

1169 Howard Street #204

San Francisco, CA 941030000

MACDONALD, STEVEN ADAIR

Attorney at STEVEN ADAIR MACDONALD & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

870 Market Street, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff Ex Parte App for OST on Motion to Allow Discovery Motion Aft

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR OST ON MOTION TO ALLOW DISCOVERY MOTION AFTER CUT-OFF AND TO COMPEL DEFENDANT DEPO. AND DOCS AS WELL AS SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 15033089) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON, DAVID D (Fee:60.00)

Memo of Pts. & Auths. ISO Plaintiffs Motion to Continue Jury Trial

MEMO OF PTS. AUTHS. ISO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 56658535) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON, DAVID D

Sagisi Decl. ISO Plaintiff Ex Parte App for OST on Motion to Allow Dis

DECLARATION OF ISO PLAINTIFF EX PARTE APP FOR OST ON MOTION TO ALLOW DISCOVERY MOTION AFTER CUT-OFF AND TO COMPEL DEFENDANT DEPO. AND DOCS AS WELL AS SANCTIONS WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS (TRANSACTION ID # 15033089) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON, DAVID D

ORDER

ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Notice of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR DEC-15-2015 IS RESCHEDULED TO JAN-06-2016 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 212 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER MICHAEL MARX. (0.5)

ORDER

ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES, PURSUANT TO THE PARTIES' STIPULATION

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR MACDONALD, STEVEN ADAIR AS ATTORNEY FOR DELANY, DAN W.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: GAMINO, GUADALUPE SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR DELANY, DAN W.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR CLAPP, FRITZ-HOWA R AS ATTORNEY FOR DELANY, DAN W.

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2016
  • HearingMatter(s): CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Jan-13-2016 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: JOHN K. STEWART

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • FinancialPayment: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Amount: $25; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W2216115A011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CANON, DAVID D; Fee: $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-15-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: BASED ON STIPULATION OF PARTIES (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR JUDGE TO SIGN JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO THE PARTIES STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • FinancialPayment: MOTION; Amount: $60; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: W2216111M019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR JUDGE TO SIGN JUDGEMENT, PURSUANT TO THE PARTIES STIPULATED JUDGEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16010034) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON, DAVID D; Fee: $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SAGISI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APP. FOR JUDGE TO SIGN JUDGEMENT, PURSUANT TO THE PARTIES STIPULATED JUDGEMENT, WITH ATTACHED EXHIBIT (TRANSACTION ID # 16010034) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON, DAVID D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY Off Calendar Jan-08-2016 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: JOHN K. STEWART

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
157 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2013
  • HearingMatter(s): MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT Off Calendar Jan-23-2013 Off Calendar MINI MINUTES: No appearance on this matter. The Court adopted its tentative ruling. DEFENDANT DAN DELANY's MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT is Off calendar. A First Amended Complaint was filed on January 7, 2013. Judge: Marla J. Miller; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Court Reporter: Anthony C. Vaughn, CSR # 6185; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: MARLA J. MILLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION, 302, NO APPEARANCE ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. DEFENDANT DAN DELANY'S MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT IS OFF CALENDAR. A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WAS FILED ON JANUARY 7, 2013. JUDGE: MARLA J. MILLER; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; COURT REPORTER: ANTHONY C. VAUGHN, CSR # 6185

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON, DAVID D AS TO DEFENDANT NORRIS DAN WALTER DELANY AKA DAN W. DELANY AKA NORRIS W. DELANY DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • FinancialPayment: COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount: $30; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W2112C19R033

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • DocketCOURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT DELANY, DAN W.; Fee: $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $450; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W2112C19F032

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DELANY, DAN W. HEARING SET FOR JAN-23-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302; Fee: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $450; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W1012926F030

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINJUNCTIVE RELIEF, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON, DAVID D AS TO DEFENDANT NORRIS DAN WALTER DELANY AKA DAN W. DELANY AKA NORRIS W. DELANY DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-27-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-26-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-13-2013; Fee: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

400 MCALLISTER STREET, SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94102-4514

DAVID D CANON Case Management Department 610 Case Management Order

PLAINTIFF (S)

VS. NO. CGC-12-524741

NORRIS DAN WALTER DELANY AKA DAN W.

DELANY AKA et al Order Dismissing Cross

Complaint as to Cross Defendant EHAB ABDULLA

DEFENDANT (S) ELBATNIGI D/B/AE B CONSTRUCTION

TO: ALL COUNSEL AND SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANTS

An order to show cause for failure of Cross-Complainant to comply with court orders and rules was called for hearing on Mar-18-2014 at 10:30 am in Department 610.

There was an appearance by Plaintiff's counsel. There was no appearance nor objection filed by Cross Complainant.

Having reviewed the file,

IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Cross Complaint is dismissed as to Cross Defendant EHAB ABDULLA ELBATNIGI D/B/A E B CONSTRUCTION.

DATED: MAR-20-2014 CYNTHIA M. LEE

JUDGE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT

Order Dismissing Cross Complaint as to Cross Defendant EHAB ABDULLA ELBATNIGI D/B/A E B CONSTRUCTION Form 000001

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4741
Case Title:DAVID D CANON VS. NORRIS DAN WALTER DELANY AKA DAN W. DELANY AKA et al
Court Date:APR-02-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Defendants Deposition And Production Of Documents, And Sanctions
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for, Thursday, April 2, 2015, line 2.PLAINTIFF DAVID CANON's Motion to Compel Deposition and for Sanctions is GRANTED pursuant to CCP 2025.450(a). The Court imposes sanctions of $1,875 against Defendant. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******4741
Case Title:DAVID D CANON VS. NORRIS DAN WALTER DELANY AKA DAN W. DELANY AKA et al
Court Date:SEP-17-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Deft To Respond To Discovery Adn To Procude Documents Pursuant To Dissocveyr Requests (Set One) And Request For Sanctions
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, September 17, 2013, line 5.-PLAINTIFF DAVID CANON'S Motion To Compel Defendant To Respond To Discovery And To Procude Documents Pursuant To Dissocvey Requests (Set One) And Request For Sanctions.Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant to Respond to Discovery and for Sanctions is GRANTED as follows: (1) Defendant shall provide responses to outstanding discovery, without objections, to be received by Plaintiff's counsel no later than October 4, 2013; (2) Defendant and his counsel shall pay Plaintiff's counsel $1,160 within 10 days of Notice of Entry of Order. = (501/PJB)


Case Number:*******4741
Case Title:DAVID D CANON VS. NORRIS DAN WALTER DELANY AKA DAN W. DELANY AKA et al
Court Date:JUL-25-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Thursday, July 25, 2013, Line 12, CROSS DEFENDANTs AIDEN HANSON and JOSHUA COOK's DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT.This motion is off calendar per the dismissal filed July 23, 2013. =(302/MJM)


Case Number:*******4741
Case Title:DAVID D CANON VS. NORRIS DAN WALTER DELANY AKA DAN W. DELANY AKA et al
Court Date:APR-11-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, April 11, 2013, line 4 - DEFENDANT DAN DELANY's DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT.Defendant's Demurrer to First Amended Complaint is OVERRULED. To the extent causes of action are alleged as personal injury, allegations are sufficient; to the extent causes of action are subject to CCP 425.10(a), damages are limited to $150,000 as explained in Plaintiff's opposition. =(501/AJR)


Case Number:*******4741
Case Title:DAVID D CANON VS. NORRIS DAN WALTER DELANY AKA DAN W. DELANY AKA et al
Court Date:MAR-11-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Monday, March 11, 2013, Line 17, DEFENDANT DAN DELANY's MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT.Transferred to Department 501, the Housing Court, to be heard on April 11, 2013 at 9:30 am. Moving party shall provide courtesy copies of the operative pleading per Local Rule 2.6C and the parties shall provide courtesy copies of all papers filed in support and opposition of the motion to Department 501, with a cover letter stating the new hearing date, no later than March 11, 2013 at 4:00 pm. =(302/AJR)


Case Number:*******4741
Case Title:DAVID D CANON VS. NORRIS DAN WALTER DELANY AKA DAN W. DELANY AKA et al
Court Date:FEB-20-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Rulings:Set for hearing on Wednesday, February 20, 2013, Line 19, DEFENDANT DAN DELANY MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORDOff calendar. Insufficient notice under CCP u00A7 1005(b). Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. = (302/PJB)


Case Number:*******4741
Case Title:DAVID D CANON VS. NORRIS DAN WALTER DELANY AKA DAN W. DELANY AKA et al
Court Date:JAN-23-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, January 23, 2013, Line 25, DEFENDANT DAN DELANY's MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT.Off calendar. A First Amended Complaint was filed on January 7, 2013. =(302/MJM)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GAMINO, GUADALUPE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACDONALD, STEVEN ADAIR