This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/06/2016 at 05:26:07 (UTC).

DAVID BAYLY VS. WESTERN MARINE SERVICES et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2009 DAVID BAYLY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WESTERN MARINE SERVICES. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4628

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYLY, DAVID

Defendants

WESTAR MARINE SERVICES

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXANDER, MARY

Attorney at MARY ALEXANDER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

44 Montgomery St. Ste 1303

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorney

WOOTTON, RICHARD CRAIG

Attorney at COX, WOOTTON, GRIFFIN, HANSEN & POULOS, LLP

190 The Embarcadero

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

ORDER

ORDER DENYING WESTAR MARINE SERVICE'S MOTION TO COMPEL (FURTHER RESPONSES TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS)

Notice of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference

SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR DEC-30-2010 CONTINUED TO JUL-29-2011 AT 3:30 PM IN 505. (206)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING WESTAR'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PHYSICAL EXAMINATION

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PHYSICAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-30-2010 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 505. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-18-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-23-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTAR MARINE SERVICES (Fee:370.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND OF THE COMPLAINT CIVIL CASE C OVER SHEET , NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF, ADR PACKAGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAYLY, DAVID SERVED JAN-04-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE JAN-15-2010 ON DEFENDANT WESTAR MARINE SERVICES

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAYLY, DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE WESTAR MARINE SERVICES

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAYLY, DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE WESTAR MARINE SERVICES SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-23-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-19-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-08-2010 (Fee:370.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2011
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-15-2011 VACATED. A DISMISSAL WAS FILED ON 6/28/11. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-29-2011 - DISMISSAL ON FILE. (505)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF WOOTTON, RICHARD CRAIG ON MAY-23-2011 THROUGH JUL-08-2011 FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTAR MARINE SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER DENYING DEFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAYLY, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING WESTAR MARINE SERVICE'S MOTION TO COMPEL (FURTHER RESPONSES TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR JAN-19-2011 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DISCOVERY 302, PLAINTIFF DAVID BAYLY'S MOTION TO QUASH, LIMIT OR MODIFY SUBPOENAS ISSUED BY DEFENDANT WESTAR MARINE SERVICES FOR RELEASE OF PLAINTIFF'S INSURANCE RECORDS - MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS IS DENIED. MOTION TO LIMIT OR MODIFY IS GRANTED. SUBPOENAS ARE MODIFIED. (SEE MINUTES FOR DETAILS) JUDGE: LORETTA M. GIORGI; NOT REPORTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR JAN-03-2011 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • DISCOVERY 302, PLAINTIFF DAVID BAYLY'S MOTION TO QUASH, LIMIT OR MODIFY SUBPOENAS ISSUED BY DEFENDANT WESTAR MARINE SERVICES FOR RELEASE OF PLAINTIFF'S INSURANCE RECORDS. NO APPEARANCE ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING - CONTINUED TO JANUARY 19, 2011. DEFENDANT WESTAR MARINE SERVICES TO PROVIDE COURTESY COPY OF OPPOSITION TO DEPARTMENT 302, WITH A COVER LETTER REFLECTING THE NEW HEARING DATE. SEE SFLR 2.6B. JUDGE: CHARLOTTE WALTER WOOLARD; NOT REPORTED

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2010
  • WESTAR MARIN SERVICES, INC.'S OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTAR MARINE SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-30-2010 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 505. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-18-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-23-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTAR MARINE SERVICES JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAYLY, DAVID JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTAR MARINE SERVICES (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAYLY, DAVID SERVED JAN-12-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT ON DEFENDANT WESTAR MARINE SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND OF THE COMPLAINT CIVIL CASE C OVER SHEET , NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF, ADR PACKAGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAYLY, DAVID SERVED JAN-04-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE JAN-15-2010 ON DEFENDANT WESTAR MARINE SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAYLY, DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE WESTAR MARINE SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BAYLY, DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE WESTAR MARINE SERVICES SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-23-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-19-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-08-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4628
Case Title:DAVID BAYLY VS. WESTERN MARINE SERVICES et al
Court Date:JAN-19-2011 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion To Quash, Limit Or Modify Subpoenas Issued By Deft For Release Of Pltf'S Insurance Records
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, January 19, 2011, line 3. PLAINTIFF DAVID BAYLY's Motion To Quash, Limit Or Modify Subpoenas Issued By Defendant For Release Of Plaintiff's Insurance Records. Motion to Quash Subpoenas denied. Motion to limit or modify granted. Subpoenas modified as follows: Records to be produced in indicated claims. 1) That contain or reflect non-privileged statements by David Bayly related to facts surrounding those specific claims. 2) Non-privileged statements made about David Bayly or on his behalf related to those specific claims. 3) That contain or reflect injuries suffered by David Bayly similar to the injuries claimed in this current matter. 4) That contain or reflect any pre-existing injuries suffered by David Bayly prior to the claims designated with the aforementioned claim number that are similar to the injuries claimed in this matter. 5) Any settlement received by David Bayly; 6) Any settlement demand made by David Bayly. = (302/LMG)


Case Number:*******4628
Case Title:DAVID BAYLY VS. WESTERN MARINE SERVICES et al
Court Date:JAN-03-2011 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion To Quash, Limit Or Modify Subpoenas Issued By Deft For Release Of Pltf'S Insurance Records
Rulings:Set for hearing on Monday, January 3, 2011, line 3. PLAINTIFF DAVID BAYLY'S Motion To Quash, Limit Or Modify Subpoenas Issued By Defendant For Release Of Plaintiff's Insurance Records.CONTINUED TO January 19, 2011. Defendant Westar Marine Services to provide courtesy copy of opposition to Department 302, WITH A COVER LETTER REFLECTING THE NEW HEARING DATE. SEE SFLR 2.6B. =(302/CWW)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOOTTON RICHARD C.