Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/04/2016 at 06:29:23 (UTC).

DAVID ATKINSON VS. PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2009 DAVID ATKINSON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9255

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATKINSON, DAVID

Defendants

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

DOES 1 THRU 20, INCL.

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILLAM, CAROL L.

Attorney at THE GILLAM LAW FIRM

1801 Century Park East, Ste 1560

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

SCHIRLE, STEPHEN LEWIS

Attorney at STEPHEN L. SCHIRLE

77 Beale Street, B30A

San Francisco, CA 94015-0000

ROACH, DARREN P

P.O. Box 7442

San Francisco, CA 94120

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATKINSON, DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THRU 20, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-06-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-10-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-22-2009 (Fee:365.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATKINSON, DAVID SERVED JUN-17-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:365.00)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-06-2009 CONTINUED TO DEC-31-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF DAVID ATKINSON'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-31-2009 CONTINUED TO FEB-19-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER NOV-03-09 ORDER.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-29-2010 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER NOV-3-09 ORDER. THE FEB-19-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATKINSON, DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THRU 20, INCL.

Order Setting Case Management Conference from Order to Show Cause

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APR-30-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. THE MAR-29-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MEDIATION SET FOR JUL-14-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-06-2010 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 504. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR DEC-20-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-30-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR FEB-14-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-28-2011 AT 2:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 604. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-14-2010 CONTINUED TO NOV-10-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

Case Ordered Off Calendar

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-10-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-09-495321, CGC-09-489255, CGC-09-490551, CGC-09-484299, CGC-10-503396 WITH CASE CGC-08-477790, ORDER; ALL FURTHER ENTRIES UNDER CASE CGC-08-477790

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2011
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-14-2011 VACATED - DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED (604)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-28-2011 - DISMISSAL ON FILE (604)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS, ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-10-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-14-2010 CONTINUED TO NOV-10-2010 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR FEB-14-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-28-2011 AT 2:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 604. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR DEC-06-2010 - BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • OBJECTION TO THE NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-06-2010 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 504. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR DEC-20-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-30-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-06-2009 CONTINUED TO DEC-31-2009 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATKINSON, DAVID JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR OCT-15-2009 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • LAW AND MOTION 301, PLAINTIFF DAVID ATKINSON'S MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. NO OPPOSITION FILED. MOVING PARTY IS TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER. JUDGE: PETER J. BUSCH, REPORTER: CAROL KAREN CSR # 8189

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • NTC OF MTN AND UNOPPOSED MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATKINSON, DAVID HEARING SET FOR OCT-15-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATKINSON, DAVID SERVED JUN-17-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATKINSON, DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THRU 20, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-06-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-10-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-22-2009 (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Gas and Electric Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHIRLE, STEPHEN LEWIS