Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/16/2016 at 15:02:51 (UTC).

DARYLE WASHINGTON VS. RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

Case Summary

On 09/21/2015 DARYLE WASHINGTON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8072

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WASHINGTON, DARYLE

Defendants

RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

DOES 1-50

JAMESON, KATHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOFF, STANLEY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STANLEY GOFF

15 Boardman Place Suite 2

San Francisco, CA 94103

Defendant Attorney

FLIEGEL, ROD M

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, PC

333 Bush Street, 34Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON, DARYLE AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-24-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-20-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-01-2016 (Fee:IFP)

STATEMENT OF DEMURRER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS

STATEMENT OF DEMURRER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58284743) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

DECLARATION OF AURELIO J PEREZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PL

DECLARATION OF AURELIO J PEREZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58284743) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAIN

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58284743) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58363954) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

DECLARATION OF STANLEY GOFF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF STANLEY GOFF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 472 (TRANSACTION ID # 100011791) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON, DARYLE

Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Defendants Motion T

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (TRANSACTION ID # 58396063) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58471996) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON, DARYLE TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO DEFENDANT SHALL RECOVER FROM PLAINTIFF ITS COSTS OF SUIT AND ATTORNEYS' FEES. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58284743) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO HEARING SET FOR JAN-08-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:450.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58284743) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROC

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100011791) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON, DARYLE AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO JAMESON, KATHY DOES 1-50

Defendants Notice Of Motion And Defendants Motion To Compel Responses

NOTICE OF MOTION AND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58396063) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO HEARING SET FOR FEB-01-2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

Declaration Of Rod M. Fliegel In Support Of Defendants Motion To Compe

DECLARATION OF ROD M. FLIEGEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 58396063) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

Proof Of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58396457) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

Notice of Entry of Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 58471996) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-17-2016 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) KATHY JAMESON AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE APR-06-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-17-2016 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) KATHY JAMESON AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE APR-06-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 58659830) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 58659830) FILED BY ATTORNEY FLIEGEL, ROD M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON, DARYLE TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO DEFENDANT SHALL RECOVER FROM PLAINTIFF ITS COSTS OF SUIT AND ATTORNEYS' FEES. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-24-2016 CONTINUED TO APR-06-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DISCOVERY 302, DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS OFF CALENDAR AT THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY. JUDGE PRO TEM; DOUGLAS ROBBINS CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; NOT REPORTED. =(302/JPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-01-2016 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58471996) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 58471996) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2015
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 58284743) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58284743) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58284743) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF AURELIO J PEREZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58284743) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF DEMURRER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58284743) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58284743) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58284743) FILED BY DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO HEARING SET FOR JAN-08-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON, DARYLE ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WASHINGTON, DARYLE AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-24-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-20-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-01-2016 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less