This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:15:09 (UTC).

DARRELL HOOD VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2007 DARRELL HOOD filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4334

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOOD, DARRELL

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

MOORE BROS.

BERT WILLIAMS $ SONS, INC.

BAILEY BROTHERS PERFORMANCE AUTO

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY

BERT WILLIAMS & SONS

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

GROENIGER & COMPANY

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

DOES 1-8500

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

MUELLER CO. LTD., L.P.

ADVOCATE MINES, LTD.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

MOUNTAIN ROADS INC.

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN & BROOKE, LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Ste 700

Gardena, CA 90247-7468

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other Attorneys

POLLACK, DEAN

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119 (Zip Code 94604), 1901 Harrison St, 11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94612

LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

OSTERTAG, JAMES J

Attorney at THELEN LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

BRUNI, CHRISTOPHE B.

Attorney at SINUNU BRUNI,LLP

333 Pine Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

MCCAFFERY, TIMOTHY J

Attorney at LOMBARDI, LOPER & CONANT, LLPLAKE MERRITT PLAZA

1999 Harrison Street, Ste.2600

Oakland, CA 94612-3541

HILLYARD, MARY KIRK

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, ITT CORPORATION FKA ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16370715) FILED BY DEFENDANT ITT CORPORATION FKA ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY- ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16376293) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

answer to complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16418843) FILED BY DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ABEX CORPORATION ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS PNEUMO ABEX LLC (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal as to Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC from the Third Cause of Action (False Representation) and Punitive Damages only

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT FROM THE 3RD CAUSE OF ACTION (FALSE REPRESENTATION) AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES (TRANSACTION ID # 16566254) AS TO DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC

DEFENDANT FRED AND SAM BAILEY DBA BAILEY BROTHERS??? AS DOE #2 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY-ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17516553) FILED BY DEFENDANT FRED AND SAM BAILEY DBA BAILEY BROTHERS (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal (Def. Jacuzzi, Inc.)

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24380513) AS TO DEFENDANT JACUZZI, INC.

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25670519) FILED BY DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. (Fee:365.00)

Request for Dismissal with prejudice AS TO COMPLT as to defendant Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC and Coltec Industries, Inc. only

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27359512) AS TO DEFENDANT COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

Request for Dismissal, as to Complaint only, With Prejudice, as to Defendant ITT Corporation, fka ITT Industries, Inc. only.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27367091) AS TO DEFENDANT ITT CORPORATION FKA ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.

DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANYS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16405950) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16490578) FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO. (Fee:335.00)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16522110) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20098629), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOOD, DARRELL SERVED MAR-19-2008, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MOUNTAIN ROADS INC.

Amendment to Complaint

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21795284) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 13 TO BE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 14 TO BE COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 15 TO BE BERT WILLIAMS & SONS

Notice of Stay of Proceedings

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (TRANSACTION ID # 25142579) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHRYSLER LLC FKA DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY, LLC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS, FILED. (TRANSACTION ID # 25364394) AS TO DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

DEFENDANT CAL-STEAM SUPPLY COMPANY?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 25861412) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAL-STEAM SUPPLY COMPANY HEARING SET FOR SEP-11-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:200.00)

Request for Dismissal and Proof of Service

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36821177) AS TO DEFENDANT MUELLER CO. LTD., L.P.

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2016
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-04-2016 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, PER REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. PATRICK CAMPBELL APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF WILL PROCEED TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. JUDGE: GARRETT WONG; CLERK: JIROQUE; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-01-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. TIFFANY VIVEROS APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-07-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-01-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-07-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-06-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, BRENDA POSADA. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2014 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON NOV-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: CINDY GARIS, CSR#9402 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO FEB-04-2016 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOOD, DARRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO REPORT TO THE COURT HOW MUCH TIME TOLLED AND DATES IN WHICH THE 5-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATION HAS BEEN EXTENDED. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16405950) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16390993) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16376293) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16370715) FILED BY DEFENDANT ITT CORPORATION FKA ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16370715) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16308082) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHRYSLER LLC FKA DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY, LLC (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16235473) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOOD, DARRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOOD, DARRELL AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MUELLER CO. LTD. L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant