This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 18:22:04 (UTC).

DARLA RIVERA et al VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2007 DARLA RIVERA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4046

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

INDIANA PLUMBING SUPPLY CO., INC.

AMERICAN WATER HEATER COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

HONDA NORTH AMERICA, INC.

GRINNELL CORP.

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.

RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

DOES 1-8500

BELLA PIPE & SUPPLY CO., INC.

WISCONSIN MOTORS LLC

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

GRINNELL LCC

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

COWPERTHWAITE, JOHN GRAHAM

Attorney at BENNETT, SAMUELSEN, REYNOLDS & ALLARD, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

1301 Marina Village Parkway, Ste 300

Alameda, CA 94501

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

LYMAN, ROBERT JOSEPH

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119

Oakland, CA 94604

STANLEY, J. KEITH

Attorney at CRIVELLO CARLSON, S.C.

2425 West Loop South,, Suite 885

Houston, TX 77027

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

ESTRADA, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at VASQUEZ ESTRADA & DUMONT LLPCOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth Street, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

ISLER, CURTISS L.

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

515 South Flower Street, 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth St, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

Other Attorneys

MA, LILLIAN C

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

One Market Street, Steuart Tower, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94105

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

Attorney at STEEFEL, LEVITT & WEISS

1 Embarcadero Center, 30Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

CORDERY, THEODORE THOMAS

Attorney at IMAI, TADLOCK, KEENEY & CORDERY, LLP

100 Bush Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94104

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

GAMBINO, MARY ELLEN

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94105

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Ctr., # 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

BLAIR, LYNNE PATRICIA

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California Street, 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14481680) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 14614747) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16193288) AS TO DEFENDANT WISCONSIN MOTORS LLC

DECLARATION OF FERLIN P. RUIZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (EXHIBITS 1 THROUGH 9)

DECLARATION OF FERLIN P. RUIZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (EXHIBITS 1 THROUGH 9) (TRANSACTION ID # 20696832) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal ? As to Defendant United Technologies Corporation Only, With a Mutual Waiver of Costs

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20768928) AS TO DEFENDANT UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal with prejudice as to Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC and Coltec Industries Inc. only

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22026736) AS TO DEFENDANT GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

Request for Dismissal of Complaint Without Prejudice - As to Defendant PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION Only

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24966198) AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

MOTION IN LIMINE TO BIFURCATE TRIAL ON PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND TO DENY JURY DEMAND AS TO PUNITIVE DAMAGES [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO BIFURCATE TRIAL ON PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND TO DENY JURY DEMAND AS TO PUNITIVE DAMAGES [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13] (TRANSACTION ID # 26863615) FILED BY DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY

MINUTES FOR AUG-31-2009 11:30 AM

MINUTES FOR AUG-31-2009 11:30 AM

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Answer of Westburne Supply Inc. to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14570275) FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTBURNE SUPPLY INC. (Fee:335.00)

COMPENDIUM OF NON-STATE AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

COMPENDIUM OF NON-STATE AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 20696832) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION (TRANSACTION ID # 20696832) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

DEFENDANT JOHN CRANE, INC.?S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 20749965) FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHN CRANE INC. HEARING SET FOR OCT-10-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:200.00)

Defendant Indiana Plumbing Supply Co., Inc.s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 20790121) FILED BY DEFENDANT INDIANA PLUMBING SUPPLY CO., INC.

EXHIBITS R-U IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF ARLENE C. BARTON IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBITS R-U IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF ARLENE C. BARTON IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 20793147) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21795874) FILED BY DEFENDANT BELLA PIPE & SUPPLY CO., INC.

ORDER

ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES IN BRAYTON GROUP 481 FOR TRIAL (TRANS# 26059745)

183 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2010
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 RE 22144 FOR TRANSACTION R0908A30J011 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON, DOC #1902611463, WARRANT #38003768, DATED FEB-10-2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28911479) AS TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28737810) AS TO DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2009
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL CALENDAR ON NOV-04-2009 IN DEPT. 606 - PER MR. HEALY, PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL, CASE RESOLVED AS OF 9/4/09. NOT REPORTED - D606.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL SET FOR NOV-04-2009 AT 9:30AM IS NOW CONTINUED TO NOV-04-2009 AT 11:30AM. PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL TO SEND NOTICES TO ALL PARTIES. NOT REPORTED - D606.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL SET FOR NOV-03-2009 CONTINUED TO NOV-04-2009 AT 9:30 AM IN 606 FOR STATUS REPORT/TRIAL PROCEEDINGS. JUDGE TOMAR MASON, CLERK MARIA OLOPERNES-PENA, NOT REPORTED - D606.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL SET FOR NOV-02-2009 CONTINUED TO NOV-03-2009 AT 9:30 AM IN 606 PER ORDER OF THE COURT. NOT REPORTED - D606.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-20-2009 - SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE NOT HELD (THIS CASE WAS PART OF BR481). MATTER HAS SETTLED PER COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2009
  • ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR OCT-19-2009 CONTINUED TO OCT-20-2009 AT 10:30 AM IN 502. BR481 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. [IN TRIAL WITH JUDGE MASON] MATTER CONTINUED FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. JUDGE ROBERTSON; CLERK: L. FISCELLA; NOT REPORTED (502)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR OCT-16-2009 CONTINUED TO OCT-19-2009 AT 10:30 AM IN 502. BR481 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. [IN TRIAL WITH JUDGE MASON] MATTER CONTINUED FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. JUDGE ROBERTSON; CLERK: L. FISCELLA; NOT REPORTED (502)

    Read MoreRead Less
256 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14194531) FILED BY DEFENDANT CARRIER CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14172445) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON ANSWER (TRANSACTION ID # 14142253) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO USE OF COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 14142253) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 14142253) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14142253) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DARLA RIVERA UNDER C.C.P. 377.32 (TRANSACTION ID # 13818353) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RIVERA, DARLA , INDIVIDUALLY, AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ERICK RIVERA, DECEASED RIVERA, TRAVIS AS LEGAL HEIR OF ERICK RIVERA, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF RIVERA, DARLA , INDIVIDUALLY, AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ERICK RIVERA, DECEASED RIVERA, TRAVIS AS LEGAL HEIR OF ERICK RIVERA, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RIVERA, DARLA , INDIVIDUALLY, AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ERICK RIVERA, DECEASED RIVERA, TRAVIS AS LEGAL HEIR OF ERICK RIVERA, DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less