This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 19:05:19 (UTC).

DAPHNE CHONG VS. ALEXANDER CHONG

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by DAPHNE CHONG against ALEXANDER CHONG in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9211

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

RICHARD C. DARWIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHONG, DAPHNE

Respondent

CHONG, ALEXANDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • OSC RE 18 MONTH REVIEW B ON JUL-08-2019 OFF CALENDAR - PARTY REFERRED TO ACCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-08-2019 10:45 AM FOR DEPT 404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • STIPULATION RE MEDIATION *FILED PURSUANT TO LITIGANTS REQUEST* FILED BY CHONG, DAPHNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER CHONG, DAPHNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING FAMILY CENTERED CASE RESOLUION (FCCR) HEARING SET FOR JUL-08-2019 AT 10:45 AM IN DEPT 404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • CASE RESOLUTION NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER CHONG, DAPHNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SERVICE DATE: MAR-01-2018 FILED BY PETITIONER CHONG, DAPHNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF NATURE OF AVAILABILITY OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION METHODS IN FAMILY LAW MATTERS FILED BY PETITIONER CHONG, DAPHNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • FAMILY CENTERED CASE RESOLUTION NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER CHONG, DAPHNE AS TO RESPONDENT CHONG, ALEXANDER SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less