This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 18:41:10 (UTC).

DANIEL MURPHY et al VS. A.W.CHESTERTON COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2007 DANIEL MURPHY filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4060

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURPHY, VICKI A

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

YARWAY CORPORATION

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

DOES 1-800

GRINNELL LLC

A.W.CHESTERTON COMPANY

GRINNELL, LLC AND ITT GRINNELL

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

CRANE CO.

WISMER & BECKER CONTRACTING ENGINEERS

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

BECK/ARNLEY WORLDPARTS CORPORATION

ALLIS CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

3M COMPANY SUED HEREIN AS MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY

WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY (WESTGLAS)

37 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANLEY, DEAN A

Attorney at PAUL HANLEY & HARLEY LLP

1608 Fourth Street, Suite 300

Berkeley, CA 94710

Defendant Attorneys

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street,, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

SUGERMAN, JEREMY JOSEPH

Attorney at GORDON-CREED, KELLEY, HOLL & SUGERMAN

222 Kearny Street, Suite 650

San Francisco, CA 94108

MROZ, SCOTT DAVID

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD LLPSTEUART TOWER

One Market Plaza, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MORONEY, LINDA M.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

ZACHER, PAUL GERHARDT

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

FARM, LINDALEE K.

1099 Alakea Street, 18Th Floor

Honolulu, HI 96813

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at ESKANOS & ADLER

2325 Clayton Road

Concord, CA 94520

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

RASMUSSEN, KURT

Attorney at RASMUSSEN, WILLIS, DICKEY & MOORE

9200 Ward Parkway, Suite 310

Kansas City, MO 64114

MODLIN, PETER S

Attorney at FARELLAN BRAUN & MARTEL LLPRUSS BUILDING, 30TH FLOOR

235 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

SHARP, GARY D

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1333 North California Blvd., Suite 690

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

STORM, LUCINDA L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM

610A Third Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St., Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

17 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.???S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF DANIEL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14138633) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY???S POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SETS ONE AND TWO) AND REQUEST FOR DOCUMENT PRODUCTION (SET ONE) AND AN AWARD OF SANCTIONS

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 15882187) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

EXHIBITS P- Q IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF D. PAUL BIRD II IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

EXHIBITS P- Q IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF D. PAUL BIRD II IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES (TRANSACTION ID # 15894880) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER DENYNG DEFENDANT GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERS

DEFENDANT 3M COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14: TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OF, OR REFERENCE TO, DEFENDANTS??? INSURANCE COVERAGE

MOTION IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 16200073) FILED BY DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY SUED HEREIN AS MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY

Motion In Limine No. 14 To Preclude Reference To Non Original Equipment Friction Exposures By Vehicle Maker Or Vehicle Model

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO NON ORIGINAL EQUIPMENT FRICTION EXPOSURES BY VEHICLE MAKER OR VEHICLE MODEL (TRANSACTION ID # 16455000) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Defendants Motion In Limine No. 17 Requiring Plaintiff To Update Its General Order 154 Summary Of Prior Settlements

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17 REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO UPDATE ITS GENERAL ORDER 154 SUMMARY OF PRIOR SETTLEMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 16455000) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION FORD MOTOR COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXIS NEXIS FILE AND SERVE RE MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT PAUL MULVIHILL; DECLARATION OF ERIC D. BERGSTROM AND PROPOSED ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE VIA LEXIS NEXIS FILE AND SERVE RE MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT PAUL MULVIHILL; DECL OF ERIC D. BERGSTROM AND PROPOSED ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 16483317) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Request for Dismissal, without prejudice, as to the Defendant Asbestos Corporation, Ltd., only. Each party to bear its own costs.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32707528) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD

SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.???S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14065710) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC. (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15387597) AS TO DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION

DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15894880) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR AUG-24-2007 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:200.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY???S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 15908426) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

Motion in Limine No. 33

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 33 (TRANSACTION ID # 16253047) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST???S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT???S FINANCIAL CONDITION

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S FINANCIAL CONDITION (TRANSACTION ID # 16361073) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

Exhibits A and B to Defendant A.W. Chesterton Companys Motion in Limine to Preclude Expert Testimony Concerning Fiber Release from Clothing, Cloth or Surface Dust; Proof of Service

EXHIBITS A AND B TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY CONCERNING FIBER RELEASE FROM CLOTHING, CLOTH OR SURFACE DUST; PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16391240) FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W.CHESTERTON COMPANY

PLAINTIFFS??? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS??? MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM UTILIZING THE CONSUMER EXPECTATION TEST TO PROVE A DESIGN DEFECT

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS' MO IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLTFS FROM UTILIZING THE CONSUMER EXPECTATION TEST TO PROVE A DESIGN DEFECT (TRANSACTION ID # 16424960) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, DANIEL MURPHY, VICKI A

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 32908416) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD

560 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33741508) AS TO DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 32908416) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32707528) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT ONLY, EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS.(TRANSACTION ID # 30952146) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER USA CORPORATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION R0907817J003 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W1407814J010 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION R0907814J006 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25102214) AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23447156) AS TO DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY (WESTGLAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 20767846) FILED BY DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY, FKA MINNESOTA MINING & MFG CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
668 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14031542) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWR VIA E-SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 13962500) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 13962500) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13962500) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13931269) FILED BY DEFENDANT RILEY POWER, INC. FKA DB RILEY, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13907766) FILED BY DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13895801) FILED BY DEFENDANT SYD CARPENTER, MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, DANIEL MURPHY, VICKI A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, DANIEL MURPHY, VICKI A AS TO DEFENDANT A.W.CHESTERTON COMPANY ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD BECK/ARNLEY WORLDPARTS CORPORATION DOES 1-800 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS-SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-20-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less