This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 20:26:17 (UTC).

DANIEL MONTOYA VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2007 DANIEL MONTOYA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4132

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTOYA, DANIEL

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

AUTOZONE WEST. INC.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

CRANE CO.

PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

DOES 1-8500

VIACOM CORPORATION SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

CHRYSLER LLC

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY (WESTGLAS)

QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

HARNETT, CHRISTOPHE MAURICE

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, Po Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

VACCHINA, LEONARDO J

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Ave.

Oakland, CA 94610

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center,, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

Four Embarcadero, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

BASSI, MARTE JOSEPH

Attorney at BASSI,MARTINI,EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID BROWN RAYSMAN & STEINER LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

LOVE, MARK A

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

STONE, MICHAEL TERRY

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15037111) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

ANSWER OF FOSTER WHEELER LLC TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ??? ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17691736) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (Fee:335.00)

DECLARATION OF JUSTIN S. FISH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE AND JACK OF CALIFORNIA?S PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AND CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

DECLARATION OF JUSTIN S. FISH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE AND JACK OF CALIFORNIAS PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AND CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 20311628) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTOYA, DANIEL

PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE AND JACK OF CALIFORNIA?S PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AND CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 20311628) IN SUPP OF MO TO COMPEL FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTOYA, DANIEL

DECLARATION OF FRED H. MERRICK IN SUPPORT OF CRANE CO.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF FRED H. MERRICK IN SUPPORT OF CRANE CO.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 20865409) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Chrysler LLC

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21674252) AS TO DEFENDANT CHRYSLER LLC

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.?S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF?S EVIDENCE OFFERED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE OFFERED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 21935877) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING DEFENDANT?S ALLEGED LIABILITY FOR OTHER MANUFACTURERS? PRODUCTS

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING DEFENDANT'S ALLEGED LIABILITY FOR OTHER MANUFACTURERS' PRODUCTS (TRANSACTION ID # 26793026) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

DECLARATION OF ROSEANNA M. CASTILLO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO REQUIRE PLAINTIFF TO MAKE AN OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING HIS CLAIM FOR MEDICAL EXPENSES

DECLARATION OF ROSEANNA M. CASTILLO IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE TO REQUIRE PLAINTIFF TO MAKE AN OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING HIS CLAIM FOR MEDICAL EXPENSES (TRANSACTION ID # 26793026) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

DaimlerChryslers Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14781749) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY, LLC (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Plant Insulation Companys Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14803366) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT THORPE INSULATION COMPANY???S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF???S COMPLA

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14957387) FILED BY DEFENDANT THORPE INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15029755) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

ANSWER OF ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST TO COMPLA

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15054594) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

Objection To Offer To Compromise

OBJECTION TO OFFER TO COMPROMISE (TRANSACTION ID # 16688499) FILED BY DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

ORDER

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT CRANE CO.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO PUNITIVE DAMAGES ONLY

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Quintec Industries, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25164534) AS TO DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY (WESTGLAS) WESTERN FIBERGLAS SUPPLY COMPANY

DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY REGARDING LIABILITY FOR AFFIXED AND OR REPLACEMENT PARTS

DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUSTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY REGARDING LIABILITY FOR AFFIXED AND OR REPLACEMENT PARTS (TRANSACTION ID # 26797728) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 30238757) AS TO DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29554596) AS TO DEFENDANT VIACOM CORPORATION SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29550726) AS TO DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28456136) AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27712013) AS TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27515805) AS TO DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS, FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 27231569) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL CALENDAR ON SEP-28-2009 IN DEPT. 505 - THE COURT IS INFORMED THAT THIS MATTER HAS RESOLVED AS OF 9/16/09. (505)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-22-2009 - NO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. THIS CASE IS IN BR456. NO FURTHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS IS NECESSARY PER PLAINTIFF COUNSEL. JUDGE ROBERTSON; CLERK: V. MU; NOT REPORTED (502)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR SEP-21-2009 CONTINUED TO SEP-22-2009 AT 10:30 AM IN 502. BR456 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. [IN TRIAL WITH JUDGE STEWART] MATTER CONTINUED FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. JUDGE ROBERTSON; CLERK: V. MU; NOT REPORTED (502)

    Read MoreRead Less
136 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15037111) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15029755) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15029755) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14957387) FILED BY DEFENDANT THORPE INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14955398) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14803366) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14781749) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY, LLC (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTOYA, DANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MONTOYA, DANIEL AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,B-1,C,H,I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less